3578 Bayside Walk, LLC v. Flinn et al
Plaintiff: 3578 Bayside Walk, LLC
Defendant: Kenneth B. Flinn and DOES 1 to 10
Case Number: 3:2019cv01729
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison H Goddard
Referring Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1446nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #3 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand. The Court GRANTS Plaintiff's motion to remand this action to the Superior Court of California, County of San Diego. The Court DENIES Plaintiff's request for costs and attorney's fees incurred as a result of Defendant's removal. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 11/1/2019.(cc: Superior Court of California, County of San Diego) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Re: Oral Argument. (ECF #3 ) Plaintiff's motion to remand is currently scheduled for hearing on October 11, 2019. The Court finds this matter suitable for decision without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1(d)(1). Accordingly, the October 11, 2019 hearing is vacated. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 10/7/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(aef)
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand by 3578 Bayside Walk, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proof of Service)(Callahan, Rachael) (aef).
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kenneth B. Flinn. (sxa)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California County of San Diego, case number 37-02019-0037511-CL-UD-CTL., IFP Filed, filed by Kenneth B. Flinn, DOES 1 to 10. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01729-DMS-AHG. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case.(sxa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 3578 Bayside Walk, LLC v. Flinn et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth B. Flinn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 3578 Bayside Walk, LLC
Represented By: Rachael Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?