Carpenter v. Petsmart, Inc.
Plaintiff: Todd Carpenter
Defendant: Petsmart, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv01731
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd Carpenter. Petsmart, Inc. served. (Moon, Kevin) (anh).
November 5, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd Carpenter. Petsmart, Inc. served. (Moon, Kevin) (anh).
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Defendant's Deadline to Respond to Plaintiff's First Amended Class Action Complaint [Doc. No. #5 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 10/28/2019. (anh)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #4 Amended Complaint by Petsmart, Inc.. (Sheridan, Stephanie)Attorney Stephanie A. Sheridan added to party Petsmart, Inc.(pty:dft) (mme).
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Petsmart, Inc., filed by Todd Carpenter. (Moon, Christopher) (anh).
September 17, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Todd Carpenter. Petsmart, Inc. served. (Moon, Kevin) (anh).
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd) (jao).
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Petsmart, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12924882.), filed by Todd Carpenter. (Attachments: #1 Coversheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1731-CAB-LL. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case. (Moon, Christopher)(smd) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carpenter v. Petsmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Petsmart, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Carpenter
Represented By: Christopher Decker Moon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?