G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Ruiz et al
Plaintiff: G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC
Defendant: Veronica Ruiz, The Righteous Business Group and Bersadbee Preciado
Case Number: 3:2019cv01735
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:0553
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint [Doc. No. #7 ] (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
November 1, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and complaint Civil cover sheet and certification served on The Righteous Business Group on 10/10/2019, filed by G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Riley, Thomas) (anh).
November 1, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and complaint Civil cover sheet and certification served on Bersabee Preciado on 10/10/2019, filed by G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Riley, Thomas) (anh).
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and complaint Civil cover sheet and certification served on Veronica D. Ruiz on 10/10/2019, filed by G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Riley, Thomas) (anh).
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time by Veronica Ruiz. (anh)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and complaint Civil cover sheet and certification served on Veronica D. Ruiz, Bersabee Preciado and The Righteous Business Group on 10/10/2019, filed by G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Riley, Thomas) (anh).
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and complaint Civil cover sheet and certification served on Veronica D. Ruiz, Bersabee Preciado and The Righteous Business Group on 10/10/2019, filed by G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Riley, Thomas) (anh).
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (smd) (Main Document 3 replaced on 9/10/2019) (smd). (jao).
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE as to Interested Parties by G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. No Parties With Financial Interest. (smd) (jao).
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bersabee Preciado, Veronica Ruiz, The Righteous Business Group (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12925418) filed by G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Coversheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1735-CAB-LL. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case. (Riley, Thomas)(smd) (jao). Modified on 9/12/2019 to correct party name (smd).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Ruiz et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Veronica Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Righteous Business Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bersadbee Preciado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC
Represented By: Thomas P. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?