G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Wilson
Plaintiff: G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC
Defendant: Orisco Lucille Wilson
Case Number: 3:2019cv01744
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: William V Gallo
Referring Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:0553
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Orisco Lucille Wilson. (aef)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against Orisco Lucille Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support, #2 Proof of Service)(Riley, Thomas) (aef).
October 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF DOCUMENT by G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC re #4 Affidavit of Service, filed by G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC . (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Riley, Thomas) (aef).
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and complaint Civil cover sheet and certification served on Orisco Lucille Wilson on 10/07/2019, filed by G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Riley, Thomas) (aef).
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 ***DOCUMENT WITHDRAWN PER ECF #6 *** - AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and complaint Civil cover sheet and certification served on Orisco Lucille Wilson on 10/07/2019, filed by G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Riley, Thomas) Modified on 10/22/2019 QC email sent re incorrect pdf; must file withdrawal of document (aef). Modified on 10/31/2019 to withdraw document (aef).
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cdw) (jao).
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC re #1 Complaint. No Parties With Financial Interest. (cdw) (jao).
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Orisco Lucille Wilson ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12928681), filed by G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01744-DMS-WVG. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Riley, Thomas)(cdw) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orisco Lucille Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC
Represented By: Thomas P. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?