Fonseca v. Hewlett-Packard Company et al
Plaintiff: Bryant Fonseca
Defendant: HP Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company, ., HP Enterprise Services, LLC and Does 1-100
Case Number: 3:2019cv01748
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael S Berg
Referring Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Withdrawal by HP Enterprise Services, LLC, HP Inc. re #6 Notice of Appearance, (Maneker, Meryl) (dlg).
October 25, 2019 Filing 13 REPLY to Response to Motion re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Counts Five, Six and Eight of Second Amended Complaint filed by HP Enterprise Services, LLC, HP Inc.. (Maneker, Meryl) (dlg).
October 18, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Counts Five, Six and Eight of Second Amended Complaint filed by Bryant Fonseca. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Counts Five, Six, and Eight of the Second Amended Complaint, #2 Declaration of Jeffrey L. Hogue in Support of Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Counts Five, Six, and Eight of the Second Amended Complaint, #3 Proof of Service)(Hogue, Jeffrey) (dlg).
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #10 MOTION to Dismiss Counts Five, Six and Eight of Second Amended Complaint : Any response shall be filed on or before October 18, 2019. Any reply shall be filed on or before October 25, 2019. A hearing on this matter is scheduled for November 22, 2019 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/20/19.(dlg)
September 18, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss Counts Five, Six and Eight of Second Amended Complaint by HP Enterprise Services, LLC, HP Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Maneker, Meryl) (dlg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by HP Enterprise Services, LLC, HP Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company re #1 Notice of Removal Amended Declaration of Service (Maneker, Meryl) (dlg).
September 16, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by HP Enterprise Services, LLC, HP Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company re #1 Notice of Removal (Maneker, Meryl) (dlg).
September 13, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Valerie Phan on behalf of HP Enterprise Services, LLC, HP Inc. (Phan, Valerie)Attorney Valerie Phan added to party HP Enterprise Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Valerie Phan added to party HP Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
September 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Alan Rein on behalf of HP Enterprise Services, LLC, HP Inc. (Rein, Mark)Attorney Mark Alan Rein added to party HP Enterprise Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Mark Alan Rein added to party HP Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
September 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Camille Kwoka Semmer on behalf of HP Enterprise Services, LLC, HP Inc. (Semmer, Christina)Attorney Christina Camille Kwoka Semmer added to party HP Enterprise Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Christina Camille Kwoka Semmer added to party HP Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Claudette G Wilson on behalf of HP Enterprise Services, LLC, HP Inc. (Wilson, Claudette)Attorney Claudette G Wilson added to party HP Enterprise Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Claudette G Wilson added to party HP Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by HP Enterprise Services, LLC, HP Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company re #1 Notice of Removal. (sxa)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by HP Enterprise Services, LLC, HP Inc., Hewlett-Packard Company re #1 Notice of Removal. Identifying Other Affiliate Perspecta Inc for HP Enterprise Services, LLC. (sxa)
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California County of San Diego, case number 37-2017-00045630-CU-WT-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12929537.), filed by Hewlett-Packard Company, HP Inc., HP Enterprise Services, LLC,Does 1-100. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Second Amended State Court Complaint, #3 Declaration of Kim Ortolani, #4 Declaration of Meryl C. Maneker, #5 Exhibit A Part 1 to Appendix of Process, Pleadings and Orders, #6 Exhibit A Part 2 to Appendix of Process, Pleadings and Orders, #7 Exhibit A Part 3 to Appendix of Process, Pleadings and Orders, #8 Exhibit A Part 4 to Appendix of Process, Pleadings and Orders, #9 Exhibit A Part 5 to Appendix of Process, Pleadings and Orders, #10 Exhibit A Part 6 to Appendix of Process, Pleadings and Orders, #11 Exhibit A Part 7 to Appendix of Process, Pleadings and Orders, #12 Exhibit A Part 8 to Appendix of Process, Pleadings and Orders, #13 Exhibit A Part 9 to Appendix of Process, Pleadings and Orders, #14 Exhibit A Part 10 to Appendix of Process, Pleadings and Orders, #15 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal, #16 Exhibit B Part 1 to Appendix of Process, Pleadings and Orders, #17 Exhibit B Part 2 to Appendix of Process, Pleadings and Orders, #18 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal, #19 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal, #20 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal, #21 Exhibit F to Notice of Removal, #22 Exhibit G to Notice of Removal, #23 Exhibit H to Notice of Removal)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1748-GPC-MSB. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case. (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/11/2019: # 25 Appendix of Process, Pleadings and Orders) (sxa). (Attachment 24 replaced on 9/11/2019) (sxa).(sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fonseca v. Hewlett-Packard Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryant Fonseca
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Hogue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HP Inc.
Represented By: Meryl C Maneker
Represented By: Valerie Phan
Represented By: Mark Alan Rein
Represented By: Claudette G Wilson
Represented By: Christina Camille Kwoka Semmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hewlett-Packard Company, .
Represented By: Meryl C Maneker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HP Enterprise Services, LLC
Represented By: Meryl C Maneker
Represented By: Valerie Phan
Represented By: Mark Alan Rein
Represented By: Claudette G Wilson
Represented By: Christina Camille Kwoka Semmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?