G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Corona et al
Plaintiff: G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC
Defendant: Mariscos Los Cuates, LLC and Silvia Corona
Case Number: 3:2019cv01751
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: William V Gallo
Referring Judge: Thomas J Whelan
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:0151
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 14 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo: Status Conference set for November 7, 2019 at 11:30 A.M. is hereby vacated following Parties' filing of Joint Motion to Enter Judgment (Doc. No. 11).(no document attached) (djk)
November 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J. Deddeh on behalf of Mariscos Los Cuates, LLC (Deddeh, Andrew)Attorney Andrew J. Deddeh added to party Mariscos Los Cuates, LLC(pty:dft) (jdt).
November 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas P. Riley on behalf of G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Riley, Thomas) (jdt).
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Judgment by G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Riley, Thomas) (jdt).
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER setting joint status conference for Thursday, November 7, 2019 at 11:30 A.M. following Plaintiff's acceptance of Defendants' Offer of Judgment. Counsel to lodge their appearances and telephone numbers for the telephonic conference no later than 5:00 P.M. on Wednesday, November 5, 2019. (djk)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Resetting Time of Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. The Court resets the time of the ENE and CMC to 2:00 P.M. on 12/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/31/2019. (jdt)
October 31, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC (Riley, Thomas). Modified on 11/1/2019 - QC email: s/ by nonregistered user. No refile (jdt).
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, Case Management Conference, and Telephonic Status Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 12/18/2019 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. If the case does not settle at the ENE, the parties shall be prepared for an in-person Case Management Conference immediately upon completion of the ENE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 12/9/2019 08:15 AM before Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo. Joint Discovery Plan due 12/2/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo on 10/30/2019.(jao)
October 29, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Silvia Corona.(Deddeh, Andrew)Attorney Andrew J. Deddeh added to party Silvia Corona(pty:dft) (jao).
October 18, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and complaint Civil cover sheet and certification served on Silvia Corona and Mariscos Los Cuates, LLC on 10/08/2019, filed by G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Riley, Thomas) (jao).
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and complaint Civil cover sheet and certification served on Silvia Corona and Mariscos Los Cuates, LLC on 10/08/2019, filed by G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Riley, Thomas) (jao).
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (sxa) (jao).
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC re #1 Complaint. No Parties With Financial Interest. (sxa) (jao).
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Silvia Corona, Mariscos Los Cuates, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12930129.), filed by G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01751-W-WVG. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case. (Riley, Thomas)(sxa) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Corona et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mariscos Los Cuates, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silvia Corona
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G & G Closed Circuit Events, LLC
Represented By: Thomas P. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?