United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Just Construction, Inc. v. K.O.O. Construction, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Just Construction, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1 Through 10, K.O.O. Construction, Inc. and Great American Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01753
Filed: September 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen S Crawford
Referring Judge: Jeffrey T Miller
Nature of Suit: Miller Act
Cause of Action: 40:3131
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 18 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Just Construction, Inc. (Floyd, Kelly) (sjm).
October 23, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #8 Counterclaim by United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Just Construction, Inc..(Floyd, Kelly) (sjm).
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Compliance; and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 11/19/2019 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 10/21/2019.(mme)
October 11, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Louis James Blum on behalf of United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Just Construction, Inc. (Blum, Louis)Attorney Louis James Blum added to party United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Just Construction, Inc.(pty:cd), Attorney Louis James Blum added to party United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Just Construction, Inc.(pty:pla) (mme).
October 10, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Lauren Brittney Stec on behalf of Great American Insurance Company, K.O.O. Construction, Inc. (Stec, Lauren)Attorney Lauren Brittney Stec added to party Great American Insurance Company(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Brittney Stec added to party K.O.O. Construction, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Lauren Brittney Stec added to party K.O.O. Construction, Inc.(pty:cc) (jdt).
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Great American Insurance Company . Identifying Other Affiliate American Financial Group, Inc. for Great American Insurance Company. (McCarthy, Colin) (sjm).
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Great American Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent American Financial Group, Inc. for Great American Insurance Company.. (McCarthy, Colin) (sjm).
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Great American Insurance Company.(McCarthy, Colin)Attorney Colin McCarthy added to party Great American Insurance Company(pty:dft) (sjm).
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by K.O.O. Construction, Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (McCarthy, Colin) (sjm).
October 2, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by K.O.O. Construction, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (McCarthy, Colin) (sjm).
October 2, 2019 Filing 8 COUNTERCLAIM against United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Just Construction, Inc., filed by K.O.O. Construction, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (McCarthy, Colin) (sjm).
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by K.O.O. Construction, Inc..(McCarthy, Colin)Attorney Colin McCarthy added to party K.O.O. Construction, Inc.(pty:dft) (sjm).
September 19, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Just Construction, Inc.. K.O.O. Construction, Inc. served. (Floyd, Kelly) (sjm).
September 19, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Just Construction, Inc.. Great American Insurance Company served. (Floyd, Kelly) (sjm).
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey T. Miller for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19cv1753-JM-KSC.(no document attached) (mme)
September 12, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (cdw) (jao).
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Just Construction, Inc. re #1 Complaint. No Parties With Financial Interest. (cdw) (jao).
September 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Does 1 Through 10, Great American Insurance Company, K.O.O. Construction, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12931665), filed by United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Just Construction, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01753-BEN-KSC. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Floyd, Kelly)(cdw) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Just Construction, Inc. v. K.O.O. Construction, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 Through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K.O.O. Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Colin McCarthy
Represented By: Lauren Brittney Stec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Represented By: Colin McCarthy
Represented By: Lauren Brittney Stec
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America for the Use and Benefit of Just Construction, Inc.
Represented By: Kelly Andrew Floyd
Represented By: Louis James Blum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?