Spy Optic Inc. v. AreaTrend, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Spy Optic Inc.
Defendant: AreaTrend, LLC and DOES 1-10
Case Number: 3:2019cv01770
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: William Q Hayes
2 Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Kubik on behalf of AreaTrend, LLC (Kubik, Andrew)Attorney Andrew Kubik added to party AreaTrend, LLC(pty:dft) (mme).
October 29, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Document by AreaTrend, LLC re #9 Notice of Appearance, (Ludwig, Frederic) (mme).
October 25, 2019 Filing 9 *WITHDRAWN PER ECF #10* NOTICE of Appearance of Andrew J. Kubik by Frederic G. Ludwig, III on behalf of AreaTrend, LLC (Ludwig, Frederic). Modified on 10/28/2019 - QC email: Atty filing on behalf of other counsel; incorrect format. Instructed to w/d and refile (jdt). Modified on 10/30/2019 to reflect document withdrawn (mme).
October 24, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by AreaTrend, LLC . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Ludwig, Frederic) Identifying Kasper Holdings, LLC, as Corporate Parent (jdt).
October 24, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by AreaTrend, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of E. Kasper)(Ludwig, Frederic)Attorney Frederic G. Ludwig, III added to party AreaTrend, LLC(pty:dft) (ag).
October 4, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Spy Optic Inc.. AreaTrend, LLC served. (Covington, Jessica) (ag).
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge William Q. Hayes for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19cv1770-WQH-BLM.(no document attached) (mme)
September 16, 2019 Filing 4 REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *1,981,513*, *3,700,605*, *3,750,166*, *3,218,701*, *3,648,121*, *3,468,936*, *2,157,268* cc:USPTO (jmo)
September 16, 2019 Filing 3 **Docketed in error** REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding patent and/or trademark number(s) *1,981,513*, *3,700,605*, *3,218,701*, *3,648,121*, *3,468,936*, *2,157,268* cc:USPTO (jmo)
September 16, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmo)
September 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Areatrend, LLC, DOES 1-10 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12944569.), filed by Spy Optic Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01770-BEN-BLM. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Covington, Jessica)(jmo) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Spy Optic Inc. v. AreaTrend, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AreaTrend, LLC
Represented By: Andrew Kubik
Represented By: Frederic G. Ludwig, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Spy Optic Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Chelsea Covington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?