Omega Liner Company, Inc. v. The Monte Vista Group, LLC et al
Case Number: 3:2019cv01771
Filed: September 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 33 Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler assigned to transfer case from District of South Dakota. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (mme)
September 16, 2019 Filing 32 Case transferred in from District of South Dakota; Case Number 4:18-cv-04105. Original file received electronically
September 16, 2019 Filing 31 MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting defendant's #23 MOTION to Transfer Venue pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) and defendant's MOTION to Dismiss and Motion for More Definite Statement are dismissed without prejudice. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) this case is transferred to the Southern District of California. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/16/2019. (SLT) [Transferred from South Dakota on 9/16/2019.]
May 7, 2019 Filing 30 Notice of Substitution of Counsel by Omega Liner Company, Inc.. (Fox, Aaron) Modified text to Notice on 5/7/2019 (JLS). [Transferred from South Dakota on 9/16/2019.]
November 30, 2018 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Transfer, and Motion for More Definite Statement MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Richard Montemarano, Rene Quitter, The Monte Vista Group, LLC. (Morehead, Sander) [Transferred from South Dakota on 9/16/2019.]
November 16, 2018 Filing 28 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #23 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Transfer, and Motion for More Definite Statement MOTION for More Definite Statement of Gary Strom filed by Omega Liner Company, Inc.. (Hoier, Adam) [Transferred from South Dakota on 9/16/2019.]
November 16, 2018 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #23 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim Motion to Transfer, and Motion for More Definite Statement MOTION for More Definite Statement filed by Omega Liner Company, Inc.. (Hoier, Adam) [Transferred from South Dakota on 9/16/2019.]
November 16, 2018 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT, with Jury Demand filed by Omega Liner Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Copy of the Purchase and License Agreement) (Hoier, Adam) [Transferred from South Dakota on 9/16/2019.]
October 26, 2018 Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT in Support re #23 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Transfer, and Motion for More Definite Statement filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Purchase and License Agreement) (Morehead, Sander) Modified on 10/29/2018 (DJP). [Transferred from South Dakota on 9/16/2019.]
October 26, 2018 Filing 24 MEMORANDUM in Support re #23 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Transfer, and Motion for More Definite Statement filed by All Defendants. (Morehead, Sander) Modified on 10/29/2018 (DJP). [Transferred from South Dakota on 9/16/2019.]
October 26, 2018 Filing 23 MOTION to DISMISS for Failure to State a Claim, Motion to Transfer, and Motion for More Definite Statement by Richard Montemarano, Rene Quitter, The Monte Vista Group, LLC. (Morehead, Sander). [Transferred from South Dakota on 9/16/2019.]
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #19 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Kyle E. Hart. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 10/2/18. (DJP) [Transferred from South Dakota on 9/16/2019.]
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Nathan R. Sellers. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 10/2/18. (DJP) [Transferred from South Dakota on 9/16/2019.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION for Attorney NATHAN R. SELLERS to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2870793) by Omega Liner Company, Inc.. (Hoier, Adam) Modified to update receipt info, paid in doc 6 on 10/1/2018 (JLS). [Transferred from South Dakota on 9/16/2019.]
October 1, 2018 Filing 19 MOTION for Attorney KYLE E. HART to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2870785) by Omega Liner Company, Inc.. (Hoier, Adam) Modified to update receipt info, paid in doc 5 on 10/1/2018 (JLS). [Transferred from South Dakota on 9/16/2019.]
October 1, 2018 NOTICE of Filing Error: #6 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #5 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice was filed in error and should be disregarded. (Hoier, Adam) [Transferred from South Dakota on 9/16/2019.]
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Michael T. Lane for Richard Montemarano,Michael T. Lane for Rene Quitter,Michael T. Lane for The Monte Vista Group, LLC. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/28/18. (SLW) [Transferred from South Dakota on 9/16/2019.]
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney David M. Kohn for Richard Montemarano,David M. Kohn for Rene Quitter,David M. Kohn for The Monte Vista Group, LLC. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/28/18. (SLW) [Transferred from South Dakota on 9/16/2019.]
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kent M. Walker for Richard Montemarano,Kent M. Walker for Rene Quitter,Kent M. Walker for The Monte Vista Group, LLC. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/28/18. (SLW) [Transferred from South Dakota on 9/16/2019.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 15 MOTION for Attorney David M. Kohn to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2886173) by Richard Montemarano, Rene Quitter, The Monte Vista Group, LLC. (Morehead, Sander) [Transferred from South Dakota on 9/16/2019.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 14 MOTION for Attorney Michael T. Lane to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2886170) by Richard Montemarano, Rene Quitter, The Monte Vista Group, LLC. (Morehead, Sander) [Transferred from South Dakota on 9/16/2019.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Attorney Kent M. Walker to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2886167) by Richard Montemarano, Rene Quitter, The Monte Vista Group, LLC. (Morehead, Sander) [Transferred from South Dakota on 9/16/2019.]
September 21, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Timothy R. Shattuck on behalf of Richard Montemarano, Rene Quitter, The Monte Vista Group, LLC. (Shattuck, Timothy) [Transferred from South Dakota on 9/16/2019.]
September 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Motion to Extend Deadlines. Signed by U.S. District Judge Lawrence L. Piersol on 9/19/18. (DJP) [Transferred from South Dakota on 9/16/2019.]
September 14, 2018 Filing 10 PROPOSED ORDER by Richard Montemarano, Rene Quitter, The Monte Vista Group, LLC re #8 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines CORRECTED (Morehead, Sander) [Transferred from South Dakota on 9/16/2019.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Sander J. Morehead on behalf of Richard Montemarano, Rene Quitter, The Monte Vista Group, LLC. (Morehead, Sander) [Transferred from South Dakota on 9/16/2019.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Extend Deadlines by Richard Montemarano, Rene Quitter, The Monte Vista Group, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Morehead, Sander) [Transferred from South Dakota on 9/16/2019.]
September 13, 2018 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Omega Liner Company, Inc.. The Monte Vista Group, LLC waiver sent on 9/6/2018, answer due 11/5/2018. (Hoier, Adam) [Transferred from South Dakota on 9/16/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 6 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION for Attorney NATHAN R. SELLERS to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2870793) by Omega Liner Company, Inc.. (Hoier, Adam) Modified text on 10/1/2018 (JLS). [Transferred from South Dakota on 9/16/2019.]
September 7, 2018 Filing 5 (FILED IN ERROR) MOTION for Attorney KYLE E. HART to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $100 PHV fee; receipt number 0869-2870785) by Omega Liner Company, Inc.. (Hoier, Adam) Modified text on 10/1/2018 (JLS). [Transferred from South Dakota on 9/16/2019.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Richard Montemarano, Rene Quitter, The Monte Vista Group, LLC. Three electronic summons, one A085 form, and one Rule 73 memo delivered to Plaintiff's counsel via electronic delivery. (Attachments: #1 The Monte Vista Group, LLC Summons, #2 Richard Montemarano Summons, #3 Rene Quitter Summons, #4 AO85)(DJP) [Transferred from South Dakota on 9/16/2019.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 3 Filing Fee Received from Omega Liner Company, Inc.. Fee Amount: $400.00, Receipt No.: #0869-2859752. (DJP) [Transferred from South Dakota on 9/16/2019.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET. (DJP) [Transferred from South Dakota on 9/16/2019.]
August 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Omega Liner Company, Inc. in shell case on 8/23/18. (DJP) [Transferred from South Dakota on 9/16/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Omega Liner Company, Inc. v. The Monte Vista Group, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?