Jones v. Nisleit et al
Plaintiff: Marlo Q. Jones
Defendant: Officer Cairesdon, Chief David Nisleit and Officer Dudley
Case Number: 3:2019cv01800
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael M Anello
Referring Judge: William V Gallo
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #5 ORDER Granting #2 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; Dismissing Complaint for Failing to State a Claim Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b). Mail sent to Marlo Q. Jones. (tcf)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #2 Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis; Dismissing Complaint for Failing to State a Claim Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and 28 U.S.C. 1915A(b). The Court directs the Watch Commander of the SDCJ, or his designee, to collect from Plaintiff's inmate trust account the $350 filing fee owed in this case by garnishing monthly payments in an amount equal to twenty percent (20%) of the preceding month's income and forwarding those payments to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in the account exceeds $10 pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). The Court directs the Clerk of the Court to serve a copy of this Order on Watch Commander, San Diego Central Jail, 1173 Front Street, San Diego, California, 92101. The Court dismisses Plaintiff's Complaint for failing to state a claim upon which relief may be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and 1915A(b), and grants him 30 days leave from the date of this Order in which to file an Amended Complaint which cures all the deficiencies of pleading noted. Plaintiff's Amended Complaint must be complete by itself without reference to his original pleading. Defendants not named and any claim not re-alleged in his Amended Complaint will be considered waived. If Plaintiff fails to file an Amended Complaint within the time provided, the Court will enter a final Order dismissing this civil action based both on Plaintiff's failure to state a claim upon which relief can be granted pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2)(B) and 1915A(b), and his failure to prosecute in compliance with a court order requiring amendment. The Court directs the Clerk of Court to mail Plaintiff a court approved civil rights complaint form for his use in amending. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 10/8/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; blank Amended Complaint formed mailed to Plaintiff)(rmc)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re Docket Sheet. Mail sent to Marlo Q. Jones. (jms)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 Additional Pages re #1 Complaint by Marlo Q. Jones. (jms)
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Marlo Q. Jones. (jms)
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Cairesdon, Dudley, David Nisleit, filed by Marlo Q. Jones.($400 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-1800-MMA-WVG. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case.[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (jms) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Nisleit et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marlo Q. Jones
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Cairesdon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chief David Nisleit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Dudley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?