Espinoza v. MPP Fullerton et al
Plaintiff: Luis Ramirez Espinoza
Defendant: MPP Fullerton, Does 1 Through 10 and Orora Packaging Solutions
Case Number: 3:2019cv01805
Filed: September 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael M Anello
Referring Judge: Roger T Benitez
2 Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 21, 2019 Filing 13 Transfer Letter Received from CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. Case number in other court is 8:19-cv-01979 (mme)
October 15, 2019 Filing 12 Case transferred to Central District of California, Southern Division. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Central District of California, Southern Division*.*411 West 4th Street, Room 1053**Santa Ana, CA 92701-4516*. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 10/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Transfer Venue) (rmc) (jao).
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Minute Order Taking Motion Under Submission: Upon review of Defendants' #4 MOTION to Change Venue and Plaintiff's response thereto, the Court finds Defendants' #4 MOTION to Change Venue suitable for determination on the papers and without oral argument pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1.d.1. The Undersigned will issue a written ruling in due course. SO ORDERED by Judge Michael M. Anello on October 1, 2019. (no document attached) (jgc)
September 27, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION to Change Venue filed by Luis Ramirez Espinoza. (Donahue, Timothy) NEFS for entries #9 and #10 regenerated to fix attorney noticing issue (rmc).
September 27, 2019 Filing 9 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Luis Ramirez Espinoza. (Donahue, Timothy) (rmc).
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Minute Order Setting Briefing Schedule: The Court SETS the following briefing schedule regarding Defendants' #4 MOTION To Change Venue: Plaintiff's response, if any, must be filed on or before Monday, September 30, 2019. Thereafter, the Undersigned will take the matter under submission on the briefs and issue a written ruling in due course. SO ORDERED by Judge Michael M. Anello on 9/23/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (jgc)
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Michael M. Anello for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge The new case number is 19CV1805-MMA-BLM.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (mme)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 11/7/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Joint Discovery Plan due 10/28/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 09/20/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(mme)
September 20, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by MPP Fullerton, Orora Packaging Solutions re #4 MOTION to Change Venue Amending [Doc. 4-3] (Ahmadi, Pantea) (mme).
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Change Venue by MPP Fullerton, Orora Packaging Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Pantea Lili Ahmadi in support, #2 Declaration of Ever Flores in support, #3 Proof of Service)(Ahmadi, Pantea) (mme).
September 19, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE and Certificate of Interested Parties by MPP Fullerton, Orora Packaging Solutions re #1 Notice of Removal,, (Ahmadi, Pantea) (mme).
September 18, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by MPP Fullerton, Orora Packaging Solutions. (cdw) (jao).
September 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of the State of CA, County of Orange, case number 30-02019-01088849-CU-WT-CJC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-12959721), filed by MPP Fullerton, Orora Packaging Solutions. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits A-C, #3 Declaration of Pantea Lili Ahmadi, #4 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01805-BEN-BLM. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case.(cdw) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Espinoza v. MPP Fullerton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MPP Fullerton
Represented By: Pantea Lili Ahmadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 Through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Orora Packaging Solutions
Represented By: Pantea Lili Ahmadi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Ramirez Espinoza
Represented By: Timothy J. Donahue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?