U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee For Harborview Mortgage Loan Trust 05-00008 et al v. Somo et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Defendant: DOES 1-10 and Salem Somo
Case Number: 3:2019cv01938
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Sua Sponte Remanding the Case Back to San Diego Superior Court. Because Defendant cannot establish federal jurisdiction or diversity jurisdiction, removal was improper. The Court, sua sponte, remands this case back to the San Diego Superior Court for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 10/16/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service; certified copy of order sent to Superior Court)(jrm) (sjt). Modified docket text on 10/17/2019 (jrm).
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 11/8/2019 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major. Joint Discovery Plan due 10/29/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major on 10/08/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jrm) Modified docket text on 10/9/2019 (jrm).(jao).
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Salem Somo re #1 Notice of Removal. No Parties With Financial Interest. (sxa)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California County of San Diego, case number 37-2018-00051776-CL-UD-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CAS115900.), filed by Salem Somo, DOES 1-10. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint)The new case number is 3:19-cv-01938-AJB-BLM. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case.(sxa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee For Harborview Mortgage Loan Trust 05-00008 et al v. Somo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Salem Somo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?