Olmsted et al v. San Diego Family Housing, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Olmsted, Porter Olmsted, Cannon Olmsted and Avery Olmsted
Defendant: Lincoln Military Property Management, LP, LMH Military Property Management Tempco, LLC, DOES 1 through 100, LMH Manager, Inc., San Diego Family Housing, LLC, Lincoln Military Housing Holdings, LLC, Lincoln/Clark San Diego, LLC and Lincoln Property Company Southwest, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02011
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael M Anello
Referring Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 19 Notice, Consent and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. The new case number is 19-cv-2011-JLB. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 12/10/2019.(tcf)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Plaintiffs shall file their motion for approval of a minor's settlement or compromise pursuant to Local Civil Rule 17.1 no later than 1/10/2020. (cxe)
December 9, 2019 Filing 17 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference held on 12/9/2019. Case settled. Order to follow. (Plaintiff Attorney John C. Miller, Jr.). (Defendant Attorney Kristin N. Reyna, Robert J. Olson). (Thomas Olmsted, Avery Olmsted, Justin Clancy, Justin Whedbee). (no document attached) (cxe)
November 26, 2019 Filing 16 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Lincoln Military Property Management, LP, San Diego Family Housing, LLC (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Reyna, Kristin) (jms).
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #14 Joint Motion to Dismiss Certain Defendants. The Court GRANTS the joint motion, approves the stipulation, and DISMISSES this action with prejudice as to the following defendants (Moving Defendants) only: Lincoln Military Housing Holdings, LLC, Lincoln/Clark San Diego, LLC, Lincoln Property Company Southwest, Inc., LMH Military Housing Holdings Tempco, LLC, and LMH Manager, Inc. The Court DIRECTS the Clerk of Court to terminate this action, including any pending motions, deadlines, or hearings, as to the Moving Defendants only. Signed by Judge Michael M. Anello on 11/25/2019. (tcf)
November 25, 2019 Filing 14 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Stipulation by Plaintiffs and Defendants by LMH Manager, Inc., LMH Military Property Management Tempco, LLC, Lincoln Military Housing Holdings, LLC, Lincoln Property Company Southwest, Inc., Lincoln/Clark San Diego, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Reyna, Kristin) (tcf).
November 6, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (tcf)
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE AND ORDER: (1) For Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, (2) Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation will be held on 12/9/2019, at 1:45 p.m. in the Chambers of Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. In the event the case does not settle at the ENE Conference, a Case Management Conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) is set for 12/9/2019, and will be held at the conclusion of the ENE Conference. A Joint Discovery Plan shall be filed on the CM/ECF system as well as lodged with Magistrate Judge Burkhardt on or before 11/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 10/29/2019. (tcf)
October 28, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LMH Military Property Management Tempco, LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Reyna, Kristin) (tcf).
October 28, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by LMH Manager, Inc. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Reyna, Kristin) (tcf).
October 28, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lincoln Property Company Southwest, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Reyna, Kristin) (tcf).
October 28, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lincoln Military Property Management, LP. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Reyna, Kristin) (tcf).
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lincoln Military Housing Holdings, LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Reyna, Kristin) (tcf).
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lincoln/Clark San Diego, LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Reyna, Kristin) (tcf).
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by San Diego Family Housing, LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Reyna, Kristin) (tcf).
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and Defects in the Form of Summons and Manner of Service, MOTION by LMH Manager, Inc., LMH Military Property Management Tempco, LLC, Lincoln Military Housing Holdings, LLC, Lincoln Property Company Southwest, Inc., Lincoln/Clark San Diego, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Lincoln/Clark San Diego, LLC, #6 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Lincoln Property Company Southwest, Inc., #7 Corporate Disclosure Statement of LMH Manager, Inc., #8 Corporate Disclosure Statement of Lincoln Military Housing Holdings, LLC, #9 Corporate Disclosure Statement of LMH Military Property Management Tempco, LLC)(Reyna, Kristin) QC mailer sent re: Corporate Disclosure Statements to be filed separately (tcf).
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Lincoln Military Property Management, LP, San Diego Family Housing, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Corporate Disclosure Statement by San Diego Family Housing, LLC, #2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Lincoln Military Property Management, LP)(Reyna, Kristin) QC mailer sent re: Corporate Disclosure Statements to be filed separately (tcf).
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CONFIRMATION OF NOTIFICATION TO STATE COURT OF REMOVAL by LMH Manager, Inc., LMH Military Property Management Tempco, LLC, Lincoln Military Housing Holdings, LLC, Lincoln Military Property Management, LP, Lincoln Property Company Southwest, Inc., Lincoln/Clark San Diego, LLC, San Diego Family Housing, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal (Reyna, Kristin) (tcf).
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from San Diego Superior Court, case number 37-2018-00064261-CU-OR-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13071777.), filed by Lincoln Military Housing Holdings, LLC, LMH Manager, Inc., San Diego Family Housing, LLC, Lincoln Property Company Southwest, Inc., Lincoln/Clark San Diego, LLC, LMH Military Property Management Tempco, LLC, Lincoln Military Property Management, LP. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A part 1, #3 Exhibit A part 2, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Proof of Service, #7 Declaration of Kristin Ryna Dehart in support)The new case number is 3:19-cv-02011-MMA-JLB. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.(jmo) (jao).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olmsted et al v. San Diego Family Housing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Military Property Management, LP
Represented By: Kristin Nell Reyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LMH Military Property Management Tempco, LLC
Represented By: Kristin Nell Reyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LMH Manager, Inc.
Represented By: Kristin Nell Reyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego Family Housing, LLC
Represented By: Kristin Nell Reyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Military Housing Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Kristin Nell Reyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln/Clark San Diego, LLC
Represented By: Kristin Nell Reyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Property Company Southwest, Inc.
Represented By: Kristin Nell Reyna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Olmsted
Represented By: John C. Miller, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Porter Olmsted
Represented By: John C. Miller, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cannon Olmsted
Represented By: John C. Miller, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Avery Olmsted
Represented By: John C. Miller, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?