Sanders v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tara Sanders
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10 and Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Case Number: 3:2019cv02080
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Larry Alan Burns
2 Judge: Karen S Crawford
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Due to the recent filing of the Notice of Settlement, the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference on 12/18/2019 at 2:00 p.m. are vacated. A telephonic Settlement Disposition Conference ("SDC") is set for 3/6/2020 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the conference call. If a Joint Motion for Dismissal is filed prior to the SDC, the SDC will be vacated. (no document attached) (kxb)
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Settlement by Tara Sanders (Romano, Mark) (jdt).
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Tara Sanders (Romano, Mark) (jdt).
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford: Due to a conflict involving the Court's calendar, the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference set for 12/12/2019 at 2:00 p.m. is continued to 12/18/2019 at 2:00 p.m. The Joint Discovery Plan shall be lodged by 12/11/2019.(no document attached) (kxb)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; Rule 26 Compliance; and Case Management Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 12/12/2019 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. In the event the case does not settle at the ENE Conference, a Case Management Conference will be held immediately following the conclusion of the ENE Conference. A Joint Discovery Plan is due 12/5/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 11/1/2019. (jdt)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Tara Sanders. (Romano, Mark) (jdt).
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns for all further proceedings. The new case number is 19cv2080-LAB-KSC.(no document attached) (mme)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (smd)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. Identifying Other Affiliate Daimler North America Corporation (DNAC) for Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (smd)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (smd)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from San Diego County Superior Court, case number 37-2019-00050251-CU-BC-NC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13113200.), filed by Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #3 Sale Contract, #4 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:19-cv-2080-BEN-KSC. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10
Represented By: Michael Charles Mashburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mercedes-Benz USA, LLC
Represented By: Michael Charles Mashburn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tara Sanders
Represented By: Mark Romano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?