Almada v. Krieger Law Firm, A.P.C.
Plaintiff: Jeffrey A. Almada
Defendant: Krieger Law Firm, A.P.C.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02109
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Referring Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by Alston Lawrence Lew on behalf of Krieger Law Firm, A.P.C. (Lew, Alston)Attorney Alston Lawrence Lew added to party Krieger Law Firm, A.P.C.(pty:dft) (rmc).
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 1/31/2020 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Confidential Early Neutral Evaluation briefs shall be submitted to Judge Dembin's Chambers by 1/22/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 12/8/2019. (jah)
December 4, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Krieger Law Firm, A.P.C..(Girarde, John). Attorney John P. Girarde added to party Krieger Law Firm, A.P.C. (pty:dft). Modified on 12/5/2019 - Removed duplicate text (jah).
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (sxa)(jrd)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against Krieger Law Firm, A.P.C. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13124663.), filed by Jeffrey A. Almada. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-02109-BAS-MDD. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case. (Hart, Yana)(sxa)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Almada v. Krieger Law Firm, A.P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey A. Almada
Represented By: Yana A. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Krieger Law Firm, A.P.C.
Represented By: Alston Lawrence Lew
Represented By: John P. Girarde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?