Rosas v. Masjedi et al
Plaintiff: Sergio Mata Rosas and Sergio Mata Rosas an individual doing business as Romas Produce
Defendant: Shannon Masjedi, Eddie Masjedi, Royalty Foods Partners, LLC, Shannon Masjedi an individual doing business as San Diego Farmers Outlet and Eddie Masjedi an individual doing business as San Diego Farmers Outlet
Case Number: 3:2019cv02130
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison H Goddard
Referring Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 0499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. The Court SETS an Early Neutral Evaluation for 1/15/2020 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 12/16/2019.(aef)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule. Defendant will respond to Plaintiffs December 12, 2019 response by December 19, 2019 at 12:00 p.m. Plaintiff may file a sur-reply by December 24, 2019 at 12:00 p.m. If Defendant chooses to file a Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b) motion, it must do so by January 10, 2019 at 4:30 p.m. Within 30 days of this order, the parties must schedule an Early Neutral Evaluation with Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/13/2019.(mme)
December 13, 2019 Filing 15 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 12/13/2019. All appearances were telephonic. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Mitch Wallis). (Defendant Attorney Bo Solis). (no document attached) (jak)
December 12, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Sergio Mata Rosas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Plaintiff, #2 Exhibit Statement of Information)(Wallis, Mitch) (aef).
December 11, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #8 MOTION for Entry of Default , #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #6 MOTION for Entry of Default filed by Shannon Masjedi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert J. Solis, Esq., Regarding Entry of Default, #2 Declaration of Shannon Masjedi in Opposition to Application for Temporary Restraining Order)(Solis, Robert) (aef).
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule. (Re ECF #9 ) The Court requests a response from Defendants to Plaintiff's motion for a TRO on or before December 11, 2019 at 4:30 p.m. In particular, the Court invites Defendant to respond to both Plaintiff's TRO and entry of default. The Court will address these issues at the informal status conference scheduled for December 13, 2019. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/9/2019.(aef)
December 7, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Errata by Sergio Mata Rosas re #9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Wallis, Mitch) Modified on 12/9/2019 QC mailer sent re improper withdrawal of document (aef).
December 7, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Sergio Mata Rosas. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Mitch Wallis, #3 Notice of hearing, #4 Proof of Service)(Wallis, Mitch) (aef).
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Status Conference. A telephonic Status Conference is set for 12/13/2019 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 12/6/2109.(aef)
December 5, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Entry of Default by Sergio Mata Rosas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mitch Wallis)(Wallis, Mitch) (aef).
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 ***DEFAULT SET ASIDE PER ECF #16 *** - Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Royalty Foods Partners, LLC. (aef) Modified on 12/19/2019 to set aside default (aef).
December 3, 2019 Filing 6 Request for Entry of Clerk's Default filed as - MOTION for Entry of Default by Sergio Mata Rosas. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mitch Wallis)(Wallis, Mitch) Modified on 12/3/2019 to match document title; term motion (aef).
November 14, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sergio Mata Rosas. Eddie Masjedi served. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of mailing)(Wallis, Mitch) (aef).
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sergio Mata Rosas. Shannon Masjedi served. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of mailing)(Wallis, Mitch) (aef).
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sergio Mata Rosas. Royalty Foods Partners, LLC served. (Wallis, Mitch) (aef).
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (sxa)(jrd)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Against Eddie Masjedi, Shannon Masjedi, Royalty Foods Partners, LLC (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13133450.), filed by Sergio Mata Rosas. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)The new case number is 3:19-cv-2130-DMS-AHG. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case. (Wallis, Mitch)(sxa)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rosas v. Masjedi et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Masjedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Masjedi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royalty Foods Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shannon Masjedi an individual doing business as San Diego Farmers Outlet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Masjedi an individual doing business as San Diego Farmers Outlet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Mata Rosas
Represented By: Mitch C Wallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sergio Mata Rosas an individual doing business as Romas Produce
Represented By: Mitch C Wallis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?