Jones v. Accredited Debt Relief, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Stanley Jones
Defendant: Accredited Debt Relief, LLC and Beyond Finance, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02144
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Referring Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0151
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 1, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Stanley Jones (Benedict, Amanda)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/28/20. (dlg)
February 26, 2020 Filing 9 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, (Corrected Filing) by Accredited Debt Relief, LLC, Beyond Finance, Inc.. (Haule, Kristin) (dlg).
February 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Withdrawal and Corrected Filing by Accredited Debt Relief, LLC, Beyond Finance, Inc. re #7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, (Haule, Kristin) (dlg).
February 26, 2020 Filing 7 *** WITHDRAWN PER ECF 8 *** MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 Complaint, by Accredited Debt Relief, LLC, Beyond Finance, Inc.. (Haule, Kristin) Modified on 2/27/2020 (dlg).
January 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 Motion Extending Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to March 2, 2020. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/23/20. (dlg)
January 22, 2020 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Accredited Debt Relief, LLC, Beyond Finance, Inc.. (Haule, Kristin)Attorney Kristin Emily Haule added to party Accredited Debt Relief, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Kristin Emily Haule added to party Beyond Finance, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
December 3, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stanley Jones, as to Beyond Finance, Inc.. (Benedict, Amanda)
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stanley Jones, as to Accredited Debt Relief, LLC. (Benedict, Amanda)
November 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (sxa)(jrd)
November 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Accredited Debt Relief, LLC, Beyond Finance, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13143195.), filed by Stanley Jones. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-2144-GPC-MDD. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case. (Benedict, Amanda)(sxa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Accredited Debt Relief, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accredited Debt Relief, LLC
Represented By: Kristin Emily Haule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beyond Finance, Inc.
Represented By: Kristin Emily Haule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Jones
Represented By: Amanda Fay Benedict
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?