Lima v. Zoom Adventures, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Angelo Lima
Defendant: Kevin Smith, XYZ Partnerships I-X, DOES I-X, Zoom Adventures, Inc., ABC Corporations I-X and Skyline Ziplines, Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02160
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE to Withdraw Document 4 by Angelo Lima (Peagler, Jordan) (jrm).
December 12, 2019 Filing 5 Amended Summons Issued re Dkt. No. #3 . Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jrm)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 **Document Withdrawn per Dkt. No. #6 ** AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Angelo Lima.New Summons Requested. (Peagler, Jordan) Mailer sent re duplicate entry (jrm). Modified to withdraw on 12/17/2019 (jrm).
December 11, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT by Angelo Lima. Amendment to #1 Complaint, First Amended Complaint. (Peagler, Jordan) Modified docket text on 12/12/2019 (jrm).
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmo) (dsn)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against ABC Corporations I-X, DOES I-X, Kevin Smith, XYZ Partnerships I-X, Zoom Adventures, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13152664.), filed by Angelo Lima. (Attachments: #1 Civil cover sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-02160-AJB-BLM. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major are assigned to the case. (Peagler, Jordan)(jmo) (dsn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lima v. Zoom Adventures, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Partnerships I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zoom Adventures, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corporations I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Skyline Ziplines, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angelo Lima
Represented By: Jordan W. Peagler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?