Levine et al v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Adelaide Levine, Barry Levine and Allie Levine
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., DOES 1 through 25, Quality Loan Service Corporation and Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2019cv02196
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cathy Ann Bencivengo
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting Unopposed Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint [Doc. No. #4 ]. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo on 1/3/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(anh)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 NON Opposition re #4 MOTION to Dismiss And Reply In Support filed by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Goldstein, Aaron) (anh).
November 26, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. re #4 MOTION to Dismiss (Goldstein, Aaron) (anh).
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Dismiss by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Goldstein, Aaron) (anh).
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Goldstein, Aaron) (anh).
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Caliber Home Loans, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. No Parties With Financial Interest. (smd) (sjt).
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from San Diego County Superior Court, case number 37-2019-00053919-CU-OR-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13178542.), filed by U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., Caliber Home Loans, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-2196-CAB-LL. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case.(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levine et al v. Caliber Home Loans, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adelaide Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barry Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allie Levine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Aaron R Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 25
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caliber Home Loans, Inc.
Represented By: Aaron R Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?