Himes v. Hadjadj
Plaintiff: Roderick Himes
Defendant: Fabrice Hadjadj
Case Number: 3:2019cv02216
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael S Berg
Referring Judge: John A Houston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (Attachments: #1 IFP Letter)[IFP packet mailed to Plaintiff] (tcf)
January 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: 1) Granting #2 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. 2) Directing U.S. Marshal to Effect Service of Complaint and Summons Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3). The Court DIRECTS the Secretary of the CDCR, or his designee, to collect from Plaintiff's trust account the $10.89 initial filing fee assessed, if those funds are available at the time this Order is executed, and to forward whatever balance remains of the full $350 owed in monthly payments in an amount equal to twenty percent (20%) of the preceding month's income to the Clerk of the Court each time the amount in Plaintiff's account exceeds $10. (Order electronically transmitted to Secretary of CDCR). Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 12/20/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service) (tcf)
November 27, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #1 Complaint by Roderick Himes (jms)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge John A. Houston Accepting, from Plaintiff Roderick Himes. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Initial case filings (42 U.S.C. 1983 Complaint, Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, etc.) exceed the page limitations set by S.D. Cal. CivLR 8.2(a) and S.D. Cal. General Order 653A, and are not accompanied by a properly supported Motion to Exceed page limitations or Motion for Emergency Relief from General Order 653A.;. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is accepted despite the discrepancy noted above. Any further non-compliant documents may be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 11/21/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jms)
November 21, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Roderick Himes. (jms)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Roderick Himes. (jms)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Fabrice Hadjadj, filed by Roderick Himes.($400 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 CDCR Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-2216-JAH-MSB. Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case.[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (jms)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Himes v. Hadjadj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roderick Himes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fabrice Hadjadj
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?