Haynes v. Chau et al
Plaintiff: Earl Eugene Haynes
Defendant: Sgt. M. Artega, Dr. D. Roberts and Dr. John Chau
Case Number: 3:2019cv02257
Filed: November 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen S Crawford
Referring Judge: John A Houston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983pr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Earl Eugene Haynes. Nunc Pro Tunc 12/6/2019 (jms)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge John A. Houston Accepting Document: Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, from Plaintiff Earl Eugene Haynes. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document, OTHER: IFP Motion [ECF No. #2 ] pending; Complaint submitted for initial screening per 28 U.S.C. 1915(e) & 1915A. Nunc Pro Tunc 12/6/2019. Signed by the Chambers of Judge John A. Houston on 12/9/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jms)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge John A. Houston Accepting Complaint, from Plaintiff Earl Eugene Haynes. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Initial case filings (42 U.S.C. 1983 Complaint, Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, etc.) exceed the page limitations set by S.D. Cal. CivLR 8.2(a) and S.D. Cal. General Order 653A, and are not accompanied by a properly supported Motion to Exceed page limitations or Motion for Emergency Relief from General Order 653A.;. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is accepted despite the discrepancy noted above. Any further non-compliant documents may be stricken from the record. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 12/2/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jms)
November 26, 2019 Filing 3 Prisoner Trust Fund Account Statement by Earl Eugene Haynes. (jms)
November 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Earl Eugene Haynes. (jms)
November 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against M. Artega, John Chau, D. Roberts, filed by Earl Eugene Haynes.($400 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-2257-JAH-KSC. Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (jms)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haynes v. Chau et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl Eugene Haynes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. M. Artega
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. D. Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. John Chau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?