Bird Rock Home Mortgage, LLC v. Damiano et al
Plaintiff: Bird Rock Home Mortgage, LLC
Defendant: DOES 1-10, Daniel Damiano and Margaret Damiano
Case Number: 3:2019cv02310
Filed: December 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Houston
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 12:2601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: 1. Granting #3 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand; and 2. Denying #2 Defendant's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. It is hereby ordered that: 1. Plaintiff's Motion to Remand is GRANTED; 2. The Clerk of Court shall remand the action to the Superior Court of California, County of San Diego; 3. Petitioner's request to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED as MOOT. 4. Plaintiff shall file supplemental briefing by February 10, 2020 detailing actual expenses, costs and fees incurred as a result of removal by Defendant; 5. Defendant may respond to Plaintiff's supplemental brief by February 18, 2020. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 1/30/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tcf)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Vacating Hearing Date re #3 MOTION to Remand. Plaintiff's motion is taken under submission without oral argument and the hearing set for January 27, 2020, is VACATED. The Court will issue an order in due course. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 1/21/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(tcf)
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand by Bird Rock Home Mortgage, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Proof of Service)(Callahan, Rachael) (tcf).
December 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Daniel Damiano. (sxa)(jrd)
December 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL From Superior Court of CA, County of San Diego, case number 37-2019-00052880-CL-UD-CTL., IFP Filed, filed by Daniel Damiano. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Complaint)The new case number is 3:19-cv-02310-JAH-LL. Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case.(sxa)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bird Rock Home Mortgage, LLC v. Damiano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Damiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margaret Damiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bird Rock Home Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: Rachael Callahan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?