Scheuerman et al v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Geoffrey Scheuerman and Kathleen Scheuerman
Defendant: DOES 1-10, Western Progressive, LLC, U.S. Bank National Association and PHH Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv02396
Filed: December 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: William V Gallo
Referring Judge: Allison H Goddard
2 Judge: William Q Hayes
3 Judge: Jeffrey T Miller
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 12 MINUTE ENTRY: Vacating oral argument set for 1/27/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 5D before Judge Jeffrey T. Miller. (no document attached) (ag)
January 17, 2020 Filing 11 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Dismiss, #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by PHH Mortgage Corporation, U.S. Bank National Association. (Wright, Kinga) (ag).
January 13, 2020 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Geoffrey Scheuerman, Kathleen Scheuerman. (Cara, Tony) (ag).
December 30, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Kinga L Wright on behalf of PHH Mortgage Corporation, U.S. Bank National Association, Western Progressive, LLC (Wright, Kinga)Attorney Kinga L Wright added to party Western Progressive, LLC(pty:dft) (ag).
December 30, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE Amended Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint by PHH Mortgage Corporation, U.S. Bank National Association re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Wright, Kinga) (ag).
December 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard for all further proceedings. Judge Jeffrey T. Miller, Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo no longer assigned to case. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge(s) have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge(s). Create association to 3:19-cv-00921-WQH-AHG. The new case number is 19cv2396-WQH-AHG. Signed by Judge Jeffrey T. Miller on 12/23/2019. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 12/18/2019.(sjt)
December 20, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by PHH Mortgage Corporation, U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Appendix, #4 Exhibit Exhibits 1-11)(Wright, Kinga) (sjt). Modified on 12/31/2019 to term motion; an amended motion was filed (ag).
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by PHH Mortgage Corporation, U.S. Bank National Association re #2 Notice of Related Case, #1 Notice of Removal, #3 Notice of Party With Financial Interest, #4 Notice of Appearance, (Wright, Kinga) (sjt).
December 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Regina Jill McClendon on behalf of PHH Mortgage Corporation, U.S. Bank National Association (McClendon, Regina)Attorney Regina Jill McClendon added to party PHH Mortgage Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Regina Jill McClendon added to party U.S. Bank National Association(pty:dft) (sjt).
December 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by PHH Mortgage Corporation, U.S. Bank National Association. Identifying Other Affiliate Ocwen Financial Corporation, Other Affiliate PHH Corporation for PHH Mortgage Corporation. (smd)
December 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by PHH Mortgage Corporation, U.S. Bank National Association of case(s) 19cv921-WQH-AHG.(smd)
December 13, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Diego County Superior Court, case number 37-2019-00060156-CU-OR-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13267667.), filed by U.S. Bank National Association, PHH Mortgage Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix, #3 Exhibit - State Court Complaint)The new case number is 3:19-cv-2396-JM-WVG. Judge Jeffrey T. Miller and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo are assigned to the case.(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scheuerman et al v. PHH Mortgage Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Progressive, LLC
Represented By: Kinga L Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon
Represented By: Kinga L Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PHH Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: Regina Jill McClendon
Represented By: Kinga L Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geoffrey Scheuerman
Represented By: Tony Cara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Scheuerman
Represented By: Tony Cara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?