Jackson v. Covello et.al.
Plaintiff: Ricardo Jackson
Defendant: Correctional Officer Martinez, `J. Juarez, Garcia, A. Canedo, unknown, P Covello, A Taylor, Sergeant Anderson and R Flores
Case Number: 3:2019cv02444
Filed: December 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
Referring Judge: John A Houston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 pr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Change of Address by Ricardo Jackson (jms)
January 16, 2020 Filing 21 Letter by Ricardo Jackson. Nunc Pro Tunc 1/15/2020.(jms)
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge John A. Houston Accepting Document: Letter, from Plaintiff Ricardo Jackson. Non-compliance with local rule(s): Civ.L.Rule 83.9 Parties to an action must refrain from writing ex parte letters to the judge. Nunc Pro Tunc 1/15/2020. Signed by the Chambers of Judge John A. Houston on 1/16/2020.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jms)
December 19, 2019 Filing 19 Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin assigned to transfer case from from California Northern District. (no document attached) (jms)
December 19, 2019 Filing 18 Case transferred in from District of California Northern; Case Number 5:19-cv-05763. Original file received electronically
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDERVACATING JUDGMENT AND REOPENING CASE; OF TRANSFER. The Judgment entered on 11/8/2019 (Dkt. #9 ) is VACATED. The Clerk shall reopen the file. The Clerk shall terminate all pending motions and transfer the entire file to the Southern District of California. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 12/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2019.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Ricardo Jackson. (Attachments: #1 certificate)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2019.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Appoint Counsel filed by Ricardo Jackson. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2019.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Order to Show Cause for an Preliminary Injunction, MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Ricardo Jackson. Responses due by 1/3/2020. Replies due by 1/17/2020. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2019.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 13 Proposed Summons. (cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2019.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 12 COMPLAINT against P Covello, J. Juarez, Anderson, Martinez, A. Canedo, A. Taylor, Garcia, R. Flores. Filed byRicardo Jackson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Envelope)(cv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2019.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Ricardo Jackson. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2019.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 Letter from Ricardo Jackson dated 12/2/19. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(cvS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2019.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 9 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2019.]
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. THE CLERK IS INSTRUCTED TO TERMINATE ALL PENDING MOTIONS AND CLOSE THE FILE. Signed by Judge Edward J. Davila on 11/8/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(amkS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2019.]
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned using a proportionate, random, and blind system pursuant to General Order No. 44 to Judge Edward J. Davila for all further proceedings. Notice: The assigned judge participates in the Cameras in the Courtroom Pilot Project. See General Order No. 65 and http://cand.uscourts.gov/cameras. Magistrate Judge Nathanael M. Cousins no longer assigned to case, (Attachments: #1 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording, #2 Notice of Eligibility for Video Recording)(bwS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2019.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge and CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2019.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 5 Letter from Ricardo Jackson. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2019.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Assignment of Prisoner Case to Magistrate Judge (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2019.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE re completion of In Forma Pauperis affidavit or payment of filing fee due within 28 days. IFP Form due by 10/21/2019. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2019.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE Complaint on Form due by 10/21/2019. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2019.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 Letter Request from Ricardo Jackson. (sfbS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2019) [Transferred from California Northern on 12/19/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Covello et.al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: `J. Juarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Canedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P Covello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeant Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R Flores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricardo Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?