Matsuda v. Koga et al
Plaintiff: Yuki Matsuda
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, Hiroki Koga and Oishii Farm Corporation
Case Number: 3:2019cv02476
Filed: December 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen S Crawford
Referring Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28:1367
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Hiroki Koga, Oishii Farm Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Dylan Savage)(Henderson, Katherine) (aef).
February 14, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer filed by Yuki Matsuda. (Wong, Edward) (aef).
February 5, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Hiroki Koga. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit)(Henderson, Katherine) (aef).
February 5, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Dylan Grace Savage on behalf of Hiroki Koga (Savage, Dylan)Attorney Dylan Grace Savage added to party Hiroki Koga(pty:dft) (aef).
February 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Leigh Henderson on behalf of Hiroki Koga (Henderson, Katherine)Attorney Katherine Leigh Henderson added to party Hiroki Koga(pty:dft)(aef).
January 31, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, filed by Yuki Matsuda. (Wong, Edward) (aef).
January 28, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Oishii Farm Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration)(Henderson, Katherine) (aef).
January 28, 2020 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Oishii Farm Corporation identifying Other Affiliate Chubb North American Claims for Oishii Farm Corporation. (Henderson, Katherine) (aef).
January 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Dylan Grace Savage on behalf of Oishii Farm Corporation (Savage, Dylan)Attorney Dylan Grace Savage added to party Oishii Farm Corporation(pty:dft) (aef).
January 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine Leigh Henderson on behalf of Oishii Farm Corporation (Henderson, Katherine)Attorney Katherine Leigh Henderson added to party Oishii Farm Corporation(pty:dft) (aef).
December 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jxv)
December 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Does 1 through 50, Hiroki Koga, Oishii Farm Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13304966.), filed by Yuki Matsuda. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-02476-DMS-KSC. Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Wong, Edward)(jxv)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Matsuda v. Koga et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hiroki Koga
Represented By: Katherine Leigh Henderson
Represented By: Dylan Grace Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oishii Farm Corporation
Represented By: Katherine Leigh Henderson
Represented By: Dylan Grace Savage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yuki Matsuda
Represented By: Edward G Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?