Hucul v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
Plaintiff: Michael Hucul
Defendant: Administration for Children and Families, Office of Child Support Enforcement and United States Department of Health and Human Services
Case Number: 3:2020cv00035
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Referring Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:0552fi
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 4, 2020 Filing 12 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Administration for Children and Families, Office of Child Support Enforcement, United States Department of Health and Human Services re 11 Set Hearings,, (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Church, Rebecca) (dlg).
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER (AGS): On March 11, 2020, at 1:00 p.m., the Court will hold a telephonic Case Management Conference. At that hearing, the parties must be prepared to address whether an Early Neutral Evaluation may be beneficial in this case. Defendants' counsel is responsible for initiating the joint call to chambers with all parties or their counsel on the line. By March 4, 2020, the parties must file a joint discovery plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler on 02/21/2020.(no document attached) (mxa)
February 15, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Hucul. Office of Child Support Enforcement served. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Receipt, #2 Exhibit Confirmation of delivery., #3 Exhibit Email to file service separately.)(Hucul, Michael)
February 15, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Hucul. Administration for Children and Families served. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Receipt, #2 Exhibit Confirmation of delivery., #3 Exhibit Email to file service separately.)(Hucul, Michael)
February 15, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Hucul. United States Department of Health and Human Services served. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Receipt, #2 Exhibit Confirmation of delivery, #3 Exhibit Email to file service separately)(Hucul, Michael)
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Administration for Children and Families, Office of Child Support Enforcement, United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Church, Rebecca)Attorney Rebecca Grace Church added to party Administration for Children and Families(pty:dft), Attorney Rebecca Grace Church added to party Office of Child Support Enforcement(pty:dft), Attorney Rebecca Grace Church added to party United States Department of Health and Human Services(pty:dft) (dlg).
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Michael Hucul. All Defendants served. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Attorney General, #2 Affidavit Declaration of Service, #3 Exhibit Receipt, #4 Exhibit Certidief mail receipt, #5 Exhibit Confirmation of delivery, #6 Exhibit Confirmation of delivery, #7 Exhibit Confirmation of delivery, #8 Exhibit Confirmation of delivery)(Hucul, Michael) QC email to file each summons returned executed separately (dlg).
January 10, 2020 Filing 5 Amended Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (rmc)
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's #2 Motion for Leave to Electronically File Documents. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/9/20. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
January 7, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons has been provided to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically. (jmr) (rmc).
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Electronically File Documents by Michael Hucul. (jmr) (rmc).
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Administration for Children and Families, Office of Child Support Enforcement, United States Department of Health and Human Services ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CAS118287.), filed by Michael Hucul. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibits)The new case number is 3:20-cv-00035-GPC-AGS. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case.(jmr) (rmc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hucul v. United States Department of Health and Human Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administration for Children and Families
Represented By: Rebecca Grace Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of Child Support Enforcement
Represented By: Rebecca Grace Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Health and Human Services
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Rebecca Grace Church
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Hucul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?