NAACP San Diego Branch et al v. San Diego Housing Commission et al
Plaintiff: Darlisa McDowell, San Diego Tenant Union and NAACP San Diego Branch
Defendant: San Diego Housing Commission and DOES 1-20
Case Number: 3:2020cv00183
Filed: January 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
2 Judge: Barbara Lynn Major
3 Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2020 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION to Strike filed by San Diego Housing Commission. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration, #3 Proof of Service)(Garcia, Jose) (jrm).
March 12, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by San Diego Housing Commission. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service)(Garcia, Jose) (jrm).
March 12, 2020 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to Motion re #11 MOTION to Remand filed by Darlisa McDowell, NAACP San Diego Branch, San Diego Tenant Union. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice)(Ijadi-Maghsoodi, Parisa) (jrm).
March 9, 2020 Filing 24 Withdrawal of Objection by Darlisa McDowell, NAACP San Diego Branch, San Diego Tenant Union re #23 Response in Opposition to Motion, #22 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Pease, Bryan) (jrm).
March 5, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION to Strike filed by Darlisa McDowell, NAACP San Diego Branch, San Diego Tenant Union. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Ijadi, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Supplement Evidentiary Objection)(Ijadi-Maghsoodi, Parisa) (jrm).
March 5, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Darlisa McDowell, NAACP San Diego Branch, San Diego Tenant Union. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Ijadi, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Supplement Evidentiary Objection)(Ijadi-Maghsoodi, Parisa) (jrm).
March 5, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Remand filed by San Diego Housing Commission. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Declaration, #3 Proof of Service)(Garcia, Jose) (jrm).
March 5, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Change of Address by Parisa Ijadi-Maghsoodi (Ijadi-Maghsoodi, Parisa)(jrm).
March 5, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance by Navneet Kaur Grewal on behalf of Darlisa McDowell (Grewal, Navneet)Attorney Navneet Kaur Grewal added to party Darlisa McDowell(pty:pla) (jrm).
March 5, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Nichole Marie Mendoza on behalf of Darlisa McDowell (Mendoza, Nichole)Attorney Nichole Marie Mendoza added to party Darlisa McDowell(pty:pla) (jrm).
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE MOTION TO STAY RULE 12 MOTIONS UNTIL AFTERPETITIONERS REMAND MOTION IS HEARD re #10 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue (opposed and unopposed) by Darlisa McDowell, NAACP San Diego Branch, San Diego Tenant Union. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 2/25/2020. (sjm)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia Rejecting re #14 Objection, from Plaintiffs Darlisa McDowell, NAACP San Diego Branch, San Diego Tenant Union. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Replies will not be accepted per Dkt. No. 12 - Order Setting Briefing Schedule. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. Signed by the Chambers of Judge Anthony J. Battaglia.(jrm) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/14/2020: #1 Stricken Document) (jrm).
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA, ORDER Granting a continuance of the briefing schedule re: #6 MOTION for More Definite Statement; MOTION to Strike, #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim and MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and setting briefing schedule re: #11 MOTION to Remand :Responses due by 3/5/2020; Replies due by 3/12/2020; sur-replies will not be accepted. (no document attached) (sc)
February 13, 2020 Filing 14 Modified to Strike per Order #16 ** OBJECTION by Darlisa McDowell, NAACP San Diego Branch, San Diego Tenant Union re #13 Response in Opposition to Motion . (Pease, Bryan) (jrm). Modified to Strike on 2/14/2020 (jrm). (Main Document 14 replaced on 2/14/2020) (jrm).
February 13, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue (opposed and unopposed) filed by San Diego Housing Commission. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proof of Service)(Garcia, Jose) (jrm).
February 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER BY JUDGE ANTHONY J. BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re #10 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue (opposed and unopposed) : Responses due by 2/13/2020; replies will not be accepted. (no document attached) (mar)
February 10, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Remand by Darlisa McDowell, NAACP San Diego Branch, San Diego Tenant Union. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration James Crosby, #3 Declaration Parisa Ijadi-Maghsoodi, #4 Declaration Bryan Pease)(Pease, Bryan) (jrm).
February 10, 2020 Filing 10 Ex Parte MOTION to Continue (opposed and unopposed) by Darlisa McDowell, NAACP San Diego Branch, San Diego Tenant Union. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jim Crosby, #2 Declaration Parisa Ijadi-Maghsoodi)(Pease, Bryan)Attorney Bryan W. Pease added to party Darlisa McDowell(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan W. Pease added to party NAACP San Diego Branch(pty:pla), Attorney Bryan W. Pease added to party San Diego Tenant Union(pty:pla)(jrm).
February 6, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE Amended by San Diego Housing Commission re #6 MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION to Strike (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Garcia, Jose) (jrm).
February 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE Amended by San Diego Housing Commission re #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Garcia, Jose) (jrm).
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule. This case has been low numbered to Judge Battaglia. The Court therefore, schedules the following briefing schedule re: #6 MOTION for More Definite Statement MOTION to Strike , #5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction : Responses due by 2/20/2020, Replies due by 2/27/2020, sur-replies will not be accepted. Motion Hearing is set before Judge Battaglia on 4/9/2020 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 4A.(no document attached) (sc)
February 5, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for More Definite Statement , MOTION to Strike by San Diego Housing Commission. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Declaration, #4 Proof of Service)(Garcia, Jose) (jrm).
February 5, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by San Diego Housing Commission. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Declaration, #4 Proof of Service)(Garcia, Jose) (jrm).
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Barbara Lynn Major for all further proceedings. Judge Janis L. Sammartino, Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:19-cv-01013-AJB-BLM. The new case number is 20CR0183-AJB(BLM).. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 2/03/2020. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 1/31/2020.(jpp)
January 29, 2020 Filing 3 DECLARATION OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL IN STATE COURT by Defendant San Diego Housing Commission. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Garcia, Jose)
January 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTIES OF FILING OF NOTICE OF REMOVAL by San Diego Housing Commission (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Garcia, Jose) (jpp).
January 29, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Diego County Superior Court, case number 37-2019-00012582-CU-WM-CTL ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13421587.), filed by San Diego Housing Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1)The new case number is 3:20-cv-183-JLS-JLB. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: NAACP San Diego Branch et al v. San Diego Housing Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darlisa McDowell
Represented By: Parisa Ijadi-Maghsoodi
Represented By: Nichole Marie Mendoza
Represented By: Bryan W. Pease
Represented By: Navneet Kaur Grewal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Diego Tenant Union
Represented By: Parisa Ijadi-Maghsoodi
Represented By: Bryan W. Pease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NAACP San Diego Branch
Represented By: Parisa Ijadi-Maghsoodi
Represented By: Bryan W. Pease
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego Housing Commission
Represented By: Jose A. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?