Marvin Vernardes v. DHS et al
Petitioner: Marvin Vernardes
Respondent: Geo, ICE, DHS and USA
Case Number: 3:2020cv00220
Filed: February 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison H Goddard
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainees
Cause of Action: 28:2241fd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2020 Filing 15 Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard assigned to transfer case from Central District of California. (no document attached) (jms)
February 4, 2020 Filing 14 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 5:19-cv-02037. Original file received electronically
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that the Clerk of this Court transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the Southern District of California. The Clerk of this Court is further directed to update Petitioner's address of record to: The Otay Mesa Detention Center, 7488 Calzada De La Fuente, San Diego, CA 92154. (see document for further details) Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (hr) [Transferred from California Central on 2/4/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Filing 12 Mail Returned addressed to Marvin Vernardes re Minutes of In Chambers Order #11 . Released. (hr) [Transferred from California Central on 2/4/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. On January 13, 2020, the Court received Respondent's Opposition where it further informs the Court that there has been a typographical error in Petitioner's name. The Clerk is directed to update the Court's docket and records to the correct spelling of Petitioner's name from "Manvim Venmandes" to "Marvin Vernardes." (see document for further details) (hr) [Transferred from California Central on 2/4/2020.]
January 13, 2020 Filing 10 OPPOSITION filed by Respondent USA re: Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (2241) #1 (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jose Barrios, #2 Exhibit for the declaration of Jose Barrios; A-H, #3 Declaration Juanita Quinones, #4 Proof of Service)(Burrelle, Hillary) [Transferred from California Central on 2/4/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned addressed to Manvim Venmandes (erroneous name) re Minutes of In Chambers Order #8 . Released/Damaged/Refused. (hr) Modified on 1/14/2020 (hr). [Transferred from California Central on 2/4/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS ORDER RE RESPONSE FROM RESPONDENTSTHAT PETTIONER HAS BEEN RELEASED FROM IMMIGRATION CUSTODY BASED ON RETURNEDMAIL [ECF No. 7] by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: If Respondents contend that the Petition is now moot because Petitioner has alreadybeen released from ICE custody then Respondent is to file a Notice of Respondents that Petitioner has been released from ICE Custody no later than December 17, 2019. Otherwise, this matter will proceed accordingly to the Order Requiring Answer. (dc) [Transferred from California Central on 2/4/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Filing 7 Mail Returned addressed to Manvim Venmandes (erroneous name) re Order on Request for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fees (CV60P) #6 . Released. (hr) Modified on 1/14/2020 (hr). [Transferred from California Central on 2/4/2020.]
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani: granting #5 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee. (iva) [Transferred from California Central on 2/4/2020.]
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by petitioner Marvin Vernardes. (iva) Modified on 1/14/2020 (hr). [Transferred from California Central on 2/4/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Hillary Morgan Burrelle counsel for Respondent USA. Adding Hillary Burrelle as counsel of record for U.S. Department of Homeland Security; U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement; United States of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by defendants United States of America. (Attorney Hillary Morgan Burrelle added to party USA(pty:res))(Burrelle, Hillary) [Transferred from California Central on 2/4/2020.]
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER/RETURN TO PETITION by Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani. that Respondents DHS; GEO; ICE; and USA file Answer to the Petition not later than 1/13/2020. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the United States Attorneys Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Petition) (iva) [Transferred from California Central on 2/4/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge George H. Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H. Kewalramani, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV-111 and CV-69) (ghap) Modified on 10/25/2019 (ghap). [Transferred from California Central on 2/4/2020.]
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241) Case assigned to Judge George H. Wu and referred to Magistrate Judge Shashi H Kewalramani.(Filing fee $ 5:FEE DUE), filed by petitioner Marvin Vernardes. (ghap) Modified on 1/14/2020 (hr). [Transferred from California Central on 2/4/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marvin Vernardes v. DHS et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Geo
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ICE
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Hillary Morgan Burrelle
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: DHS
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Hillary Morgan Burrelle
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: USA
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Hillary Morgan Burrelle
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marvin Vernardes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?