Crossley et al v. State of California et al
Plaintiff: Discovery Petition Management LLC., Michael Crossley, PIR Data Processing Inc., Let the Voters Decide, LLC., Valley Direct Marketing LLC., Carolyn Ostic, Chris Brentlinger, Bart Bailey, In the Field, Inc., Carolyn Ostic doing business as Voter Direct and Chris Brentlinger doing business as Bay Area Petitions
Defendant: Xavier Becerra, State of California and John Doe
Case Number: 3:2020cv00284
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Referring Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331ss
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint; Memorandum of Points and Authorities by State of California. (Grabarsky, Todd) (dlg).
February 27, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Discovery Petition Management LLC., Bart Bailey, Valley Direct Marketing LLC., Carolyn Ostic, In the Field, Inc., Michael Crossley, Chris Brentlinger, PIR Data Processing Inc., Let the Voters Decide, LLC.. Xavier Becerra served. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Xavier Becerra)(Baxter, Daniel) (dlg).
February 27, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Discovery Petition Management LLC., Bart Bailey, Valley Direct Marketing LLC., Carolyn Ostic, In the Field, Inc., Michael Crossley, Chris Brentlinger, PIR Data Processing Inc., Let the Voters Decide, LLC.. State of California served. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Proof of Service on State of California)(Baxter, Daniel) (dlg).
February 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE to Withdraw Filing of Summons by Bart Bailey, Chris Brentlinger, Michael Crossley, Discovery Petition Management LLC., In the Field, Inc., Let the Voters Decide, LLC., Carolyn Ostic, PIR Data Processing Inc., Valley Direct Marketing LLC. re #3 Summons Returned Executed, (Baxter, Daniel) (dlg).
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance Defendant's Notice of Appearance by Todd Grabarsky on behalf of Xavier Becerra, John Doe, State of California (Grabarsky, Todd)Attorney Todd Grabarsky added to party Xavier Becerra(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Grabarsky added to party John Doe(pty:dft), Attorney Todd Grabarsky added to party State of California(pty:dft) (dlg).
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 *** WITHDRAWN PER ECF 5 *** SUMMONS Returned Executed by Valley Direct Marketing LLC.. All Defendants served. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Proof of Service on State of California, #2 Summons in Civil Action, #3 Proof of Service Proof of Service on Xavier Becerra)(Baxter, Daniel) qc email, each summons returned executed should be filed separately on the docket (dlg). Modified on 2/28/2020 (dlg).
February 14, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jxv)(jrd)
February 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against State of California, Xavier Becerra, John Doe, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-13486291.), filed by Michael Crossley, Bart Bailey, Let the Voters Decide, LLC, Valley Direct Marketing LLC, In the Field, Inc., Discovery Petition Management LLC., PIR Data Processing Inc., Carolyn Ostic, Chris Brentlinger, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-00284-GPC-JLB. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case. (Baxter, Daniel)(jxv)(jxv)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crossley et al v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Todd Grabarsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Represented By: Todd Grabarsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Represented By: Todd Grabarsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Discovery Petition Management LLC.
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Crossley
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PIR Data Processing Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Let the Voters Decide, LLC.
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Valley Direct Marketing LLC.
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Ostic
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Brentlinger
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bart Bailey
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: In the Field, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Ostic doing business as Voter Direct
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Brentlinger doing business as Bay Area Petitions
Represented By: Daniel Lawrence Baxter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?