Calel et al v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Marta Carolina Barrie Calel, J.V.C.B. and A.S.D.J.Y.B.
Respondent: Greg Archambeault, Matthew T. Albence, Rodney S. Scott, William P. Barr and Chad F. Wolf
Case Number: 3:2020cv00443
Filed: March 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Allison H Goddard
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:2241fd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting Motion to Withdraw Petition for Habeas Corpus (Dkt. #3 ). That Petition is dismissed without prejudice. The hearing currently set for 3/17/2020 is vacated. The clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 3/13/2020. (jdt)
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by A.S.D.J.Y.B., Marta Carolina Barrie Calel, J.V.C.B. (Yoon, Sung) (jdt).
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss Voluntary Dismissal by A.S.D.J.Y.B., Marta Carolina Barrie Calel, J.V.C.B.. (Yoon, Sung) (jdt).
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 Minute Order. Respondents shall file a Return to the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus no later than Monday, March 16, 2020 at 5:00 p.m. The Court will hear oral argument on the Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus on Tuesday, March 17, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. (ceh)
March 9, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Against William P. Barr, Greg Archambeault, Chad F. Wolf, Matthew T. Albence, Rodney S. Scott, filed by Marta Carolina Barrie Calel, J.V.C.B., A.S.D.J.Y.B. (Filing fee $5.00 - receipt number ACASDC-13597271) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Appendix)The new case number is 3:20-cv-443-LAB-AHG. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case. (Yoon, Sung)(jms)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calel et al v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Marta Carolina Barrie Calel
Represented By: Sung Soo Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: J.V.C.B.
Represented By: Sung Soo Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: A.S.D.J.Y.B.
Represented By: Sung Soo Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Greg Archambeault
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew T. Albence
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Rodney S. Scott
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P. Barr
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?