Love v. Madden et al
Petitioner: Davaughn Love
Respondent: Raymond Madden and X. Becca
Case Number: 3:2020cv00447
Filed: March 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen S Crawford
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER reopening case setting Briefing Schedule: Motion to Dismiss Deadline 6/29/2020. Opposition Motion to Dismiss due 7/29/2020. Answer by Respondent due 6/29/2020 Traverse by Petitioner due 7/29/2020. Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 4/21/2020.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (dlg).
April 17, 2020 Filing 4 Fee for Habeas Petition: Paid on 4/17/2020. (jms)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER denying #2 Application to Proceed in forma pauperis and dismissing Petition without prejudice. To have this case reopened, Petitioner may submit a copy of this Order along with the requisite $5.00 filing fee no later than 5/15/2020. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 3/17/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
March 9, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Davaughn Love. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(jms) (Main Document 2 replaced on 3/10/2020) (jms). MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Davaughn Love. (jms)(jrd)
March 9, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Against Raymond Madden, X. Becca, filed by Davaughn Love. ($5.00 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-447-JLS-KSC. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.[Case in Screening] (jms)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Love v. Madden et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Raymond Madden
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: X. Becca
Represented By: Attorney General
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Davaughn Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?