Trim v. CMRE Financial Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Martin Trim
Defendant: CMRE Financial Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00451
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Withdrawal by CMRE Financial Services, Inc. re #11 Notice of Related Case (Kaminski, David)(jrm).
May 5, 2020 Filing 11 **Document withdrawn per Doc. No. #12 ** NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by CMRE Financial Services, Inc. of case(s) 8:20-cv-00532-DOC-ADS . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kaminski, David)(jrm). Modified to withdraw on 5/7/2020 (jrm).
May 1, 2020 Filing 10 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Strike Class Allegations filed by CMRE Financial Services, Inc.. (Kaminski, David) (jrm).
April 21, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Strike Class Allegations filed by Martin Trim. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Kazerounian, Abbas) (jrm).
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA: Setting Briefing Schedule re #5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Strike Class Allegations : Responses due by 4/24/2020; Replies due by 5/1/2020; sur-replies will not be accepted.(no document attached) (sc)
April 10, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by CMRE Financial Services, Inc. . No Parties With Financial Interest. (Kaminski, David) (jrm).
April 10, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by CMRE Financial Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kaminski, David) (jrm).
April 10, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Dismiss Complaint and Strike Class Allegations by CMRE Financial Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities)(Kaminski, David)Attorney David J Kaminski added to party CMRE Financial Services, Inc.(pty:dft)(jrm).
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Martin Trim. CMRE Financial Services, Inc. served. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hart, Yana) (jrm).
March 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel G. Shay on behalf of Martin Trim (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Shay, Daniel)Attorney Daniel G. Shay added to party Martin Trim(pty:pla) (sjm).
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jxv)(jrd)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against CMRE Financial Services, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13601736.), filed by Martin Trim. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-451-AJB-LL. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case. (Hart, Yana)(jxv)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trim v. CMRE Financial Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMRE Financial Services, Inc.
Represented By: David J Kaminski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Trim
Represented By: Daniel G. Shay
Represented By: Yana A. Hart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?