Winters v. Two Towns Ciderhouse Inc.
Plaintiff: Richard Winters
Defendant: Two Towns Ciderhouse Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00468
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Referring Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 21:0348
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint (ECF No. #5 ). Defendant shall respond to the Complaint by 5/28/2020. Signed by Judge Cynthia Bashant on 4/28/20. (jmo)
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Two Towns Ciderhouse Inc. (Hall, Scott) (jmo).
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Two Towns Ciderhouse Inc.. (Hall, Scott)Attorney Scott C Hall added to party Two Towns Ciderhouse Inc. (pty:dft)**QC MAILER sent re: plaintiff attorney signature not attorney of record in case** (jmo). Modified on 4/28/2020 to term motion. (jmo).
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Richard Winters. Two Towns Ciderhouse Inc. served. (Friedman, Todd) (jmo).
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jxv)(jrd)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT With Jury Demand Against Two Towns Ciderhouse Inc. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13612667.), filed by Richard Winters. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-468-BAS-BGS. Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Friedman, Todd)(jxv)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winters v. Two Towns Ciderhouse Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Two Towns Ciderhouse Inc.
Represented By: Scott C Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Winters
Represented By: Todd M. Friedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?