Aton Center, Inc. v. Premera Blue Cross et al
Plaintiff: Aton Center, Inc.
Defendant: Does 1 Through 10 and Premera Blue Cross
Case Number: 3:2020cv00501
Filed: March 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
Referring Judge: William Q Hayes
2 Judge: John A Houston
3 Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1446oc
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Memorandum of Points and Authorities filed by Aton Center, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice Request for Judicial Notice)(Tower, John) (ag).
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Premera Blue Cross. (Lee, Joann) (ag).
April 17, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Premera Blue Cross. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities to Motion to Dismiss, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit 1 to Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit 2 to Request for Judicial Notice)(Lewis, Carol)Attorney Carol Burney Lewis added to party Premera Blue Cross (pty:dft) (ag).
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal for all further proceedings. Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:20-cv-00492-WQH-BGS. The new case number is 20cv501-WQH-BGS. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 3/23/2020. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 3/23/2020.(ag)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #4 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Premera Blue Cross shall answer, move or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before 4/20/2020. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 3/20/2020. (tcf)
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Notice of Removal, Less than 30 days by Premera Blue Cross. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order Granting Extension of Time)(Lee, Joann)Attorney Joann V. Lee added to party Premera Blue Cross (pty:dft) QC mailer sent re: Proposed order attached (tcf).
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Premera Blue Cross of case(s) 3:20-cv-00492-WQH-BGS; 3:20-cv-00496-BEN-AHG; 3:20-cv-00497-LAB-RBB; 3:20-cv-00498-AJB-MDD; 3:20-cv-00500-CAB-MDD . (Lee, Joann) (tcf).
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Premera Blue Cross. No Parties With Financial Interest. (jmr) (jms).
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2019-00068777-CU-BC-NC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13631645.), filed by Premera Blue Cross. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A-1, #3 Exhibit A-2, #4 Exhibit A-3, #5 Exhibit A-4, #6 Exhibit A-5, #7 Exhibit A-6, #8 Declaration of Removal K. Hawthorne, #9 Proof of Service for Notice of Removal)The new case number is 3:20-cv-501-JAH-MDD. Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case.(jmr) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aton Center, Inc. v. Premera Blue Cross et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 Through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Premera Blue Cross
Represented By: William E Von Behren
Represented By: Joann V. Lee
Represented By: Carol Burney Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aton Center, Inc.
Represented By: John W Tower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?