Massaro v. Beyond Meat, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Nazrin Massaro
Defendant: People for the Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc. and Beyond Meat, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv00510
Filed: March 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony J Battaglia
Referring Judge: Michael S Berg
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Filing 27 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Nazrin Massaro. (Hiraldo, Manuel)
May 13, 2020 Filing 26 DECLARATION re #24 MOTION to Stay Pending the FCC's Definition of ATDS by Defendant People for the Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc.. (Lee, Sieun) (jrm).
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA, ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #23 MOTION to Dismiss or Strike Plaintiff's Nationwide Class Claims, #24 MOTION to Stay Pending the FCC's Definition of ATDS : Responses due by 5/27/2020, Replies due by 6/3/2020, sur-replies will not be accepted.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (sc)
May 13, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Stay Pending the FCC's Definition of ATDS by People for the Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Jeffrey S. Kerr)(Petersen, Shannon) (jrm).
May 13, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss or Strike Plaintiff's Nationwide Class Claims by People for the Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Jeffrey S. Kerr)(Petersen, Shannon) (jrm).
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Beyond Meat, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to Answer Beyond Meat, Inc. Defendant Beyond Meat, Inc.'s time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's original Complaint is extended by forty-six days, from 4/9/2020 to 5/25/2020. Signed by Judge Anthony J. Battaglia on 4/2/2020. (jrm)
April 2, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance by Sieun J. Lee on behalf of People for the Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc. (Lee, Sieun)Attorney Sieun J. Lee added to party People for the Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc.(pty:dft) (jrm).
April 2, 2020 Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by People for the Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Petersen, Shannon)(jrm).
April 2, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by People for the Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc. (Lee, Sieun) (jrm).
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER BY JUDGE BATTAGLIA granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer.; granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to all Defendants. Answers to Complaint due by 5/13/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (sc)
April 2, 2020 Filing 17 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by People for the Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc.. (Petersen, Shannon)Attorney Shannon Z. Petersen added to party People for the Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc.(pty:dft) (jrm).
April 1, 2020 Filing 16 PRO HAC APPROVED: Nicholas L. Schlossman appearing for Defendant Beyond Meat, Inc. (no document attached) (rmc)
April 1, 2020 Filing 15 PRO HAC APPROVED: Andrew Prins appearing for Defendant Beyond Meat, Inc. (no document attached) (rmc)
April 1, 2020 Filing 14 PRO HAC APPROVED: Susan E. Engel appearing for Defendant Beyond Meat, Inc. (no document attached) (rmc)
April 1, 2020 Filing 13 PRO HAC APPROVED: Andrew Brian Clubok appearing for Defendant Beyond Meat, Inc. (no document attached) (rmc)
April 1, 2020 Filing 12 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-13696512.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Schlossman, Nicholas) (rmc).
April 1, 2020 Filing 11 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-13696477.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Prins, Andrew) (rmc).
April 1, 2020 Filing 10 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-13696454.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Engel, Susan) (rmc).
April 1, 2020 Filing 9 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-13696429.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Clubok, Andrew) (rmc).
April 1, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Beyond Meat, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Justman, Patrick)(jrm).
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Beyond Meat, Inc.. (Justman, Patrick)Attorney Patrick C. Justman added to party Beyond Meat, Inc. (pty:dft) (jrm).
March 25, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nazrin Massaro. People for the Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc. served. (Hiraldo, Manuel) (jrm).
March 20, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nazrin Massaro. Beyond Meat, Inc. served. (Hiraldo, Manuel)(jrm).
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 PRO HAC APPROVED: Manuel Santiago Hiraldo appearing for Plaintiff Nazrin Massaro (no document attached) (rmc)
March 18, 2020 Filing 3 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-13642261.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Hiraldo, Manuel) (rmc).
March 18, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmr) (jms).
March 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Beyond Meat, Inc., People for the Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13640551.), filed by Nazrin Massaro. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-510-AJB-MSB. Judge Anthony J. Battaglia and Magistrate Judge Michael S. Berg are assigned to the case. (Nicholas, Craig)(jmr) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massaro v. Beyond Meat, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: People for the Ethical Treatment of Animals, Inc.
Represented By: Shannon Z. Petersen
Represented By: Sieun J. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beyond Meat, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick C. Justman
Represented By: Andrew Brian Clubok
Represented By: Susan E. Engel
Represented By: Nicholas L. Schlossman
Represented By: Andrew Prins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nazrin Massaro
Represented By: Manuel Santiago Hiraldo
Represented By: Craig McKenzie Nicholas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?