Carter v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Terrance Mack Carter and Terrence Mack Carter
Defendant: United States of America and FCI Mendota
Case Number: 3:2020cv00525
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Houston
Referring Judge: Andrew G Schopler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1346t
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for U.S. Marshal Service by Terrence Mack Carter. Nunc Pro Tunc 4/30/2020(jms)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge John A. Houston Accepting Document: Motion for U.S. Marshal Service, from Plaintiff Terrence Mack Carter. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ. L. Rule 5.1: Missing time and date on motion and/or supporting documentation, Civ. L. Rule 7.1: Lacking memorandum of points and authorities in support as a separate document, OTHER: Motion to Proceed IFP [ECF No. 2] remains pending; Complaint submitted for screening per 28 U.S.C. 1915(e)(2) and 1915A. Nunc Pro Tunc 4/30/2020. Signed by Judge John A. Houston on 5/1/2020.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jms)
March 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Against United States of America, filed by Terrence Mack Carter. ($400.00 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-525-JAH-AGS. Judge John A. Houston and Magistrate Judge Andrew G. Schopler are assigned to the case.[Case in Screening per 28 USC 1915] (jms)(Docket text updated to correct plaintiff name.)(jms)(jrd)
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Terrance Mack Carter. (jms)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Mack Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrence Mack Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCI Mendota
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?