Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc. v. Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.
Defendant: Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc, John Doe #1, Ventex Co., Ltd., Man-Sik (Paul) Park, Scott Denike, Kyung-Chan Go, John Doe #5, John Doe #3, Robert (Bob) Murphy, John Doe #2, Wendy M. Carey, John Doe 4 and Michael J Carey
Not Classified By Court: Troutman Sanders
Case Number: 3:2020cv00709
Filed: April 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Office: San Diego Office
Presiding Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 317 ORDER granting #316 Joint Motion for continuance of hearing on Plaintiffs Ex Parte Motion to Transfer or, in the Alternative, Vacate Dkts. 299 and 300 be continued to July 9, 2020. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/29/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (dlg).
May 28, 2020 Filing 316 Joint MOTION to Continue Hearing by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) (jpp).
May 18, 2020 Filing 315 Amended MOTION Ex Parte to Transfer or, in the Alternative, Vacate Dkts. 299 and 300 by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) (jpp).
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 314 ORDER setting briefing schedule for #311 Plaintiff's ex parte motion to transfer, or in the alternative, vacated Dkts. 299 and 300. Any responses to Plaintiffs Ex Parte Motion shall be filed on or before June 4, 2020, and any replies may be filed on or before June 11, 2020. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/18/2020.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (dlg).
May 15, 2020 Filing 313 Letter from Christopher S. Marchese. NUNC PRO TUNC 5/14/2020 (jpp) (dlg).
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 312 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Janis L. Sammartino Accepting Document: Letter, from Defendants Michael J Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Robert (Bob) Murphy. Non-compliance with local rule(s), OTHER: Ex parte communication prohibited, Local Rule 83.9. Nunc Pro Tunc 5/14/2020. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/15/2020.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (dlg).
May 15, 2020 Filing 311 Ex Parte MOTION to Transfer or, in the Alternative, Vacate Dkts. 299 and 300 by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas)Attorney Nicholas F. Aldrich, Jr added to party Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.(pty:pla) (jpp).
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 310 ORDER re: Plaintiff's Status Report (ECF No. #309 ). Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 05/13/2020.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
May 12, 2020 Filing 309 STATUS REPORT by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-4)(Aldrich, Nicholas) (jpp).
May 11, 2020 Filing 308 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Aldrich, Nicholas) (rmc).
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 307 ORDER Denying the Pro Hac Vice Application of Nicholas Aldrich, re #304 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/1/2020.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(rmc)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 306 ORDER granting #305 Plaintiff's ex parte Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report to on or before 5/14/2020. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 4/28/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (dlg).
April 28, 2020 Filing 305 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Joint Status Report by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) (jpp).
April 24, 2020 Filing 304 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-13790775.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Aldrich, Nicholas) (rmc).
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 303 ORDER Ordering parties to file joint status report. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/15/2020.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (dlg).
April 14, 2020 Filing 302 Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt assigned to transfer case from District of Oregon. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (mme)
April 14, 2020 Filing 301 Case transferred in from District of Oregon; Case Number 3:19-cv-00137. Original file received electronically
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 300 JUDGMENT AND ORDER OF TRANSFER: In light of my Order [ECF 299] GRANTING Seirus Defendants Motion for Reconsideration [ECF 254], Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion to Transfer [ECF 103] is GRANTED. This case is DISMISSED against the Seirus Defendants, and the remainder of the case is TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of California. Signed on 4/14/2020 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 299 Opinion and Order: For the reasons stated in this opinion, the Seirus Defendants Motion for Reconsideration #254 is GRANTED, and I GRANT Defendants Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Motion to Transfer #103 . As a result, this case is DISMISSED against the Seirus Defendants, and the remainder of the case is TRANSFERRED to the Southern District of California. Signed on 4/14/2020 by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Filing 298 Declaration of Tucker N. Terhufen in Support of Seirus Defendants Motion to Strike Columbia Motion to Compel Troutman (ECF 285) and for Protective Order. Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Scott Denike, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion to Strike, #297 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Tucker N. Terhufen in Support of Seirus Defendants Motion to Strike Columbias Motion to Compel Troutman (ECF 285) and for Protective Order) (Thornburgh, John) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Filing 297 Motion to Strike Seirus Defendants Motion to Strike Columbia Motion to Compel Troutman (ECF 285) and for Protective Order. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Scott Denike, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Thornburgh, John) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 296 Response in Opposition Non-Party Troutman Sanders LLP's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Compel (Non-Party Troutman Sanders LLP) to Motion to Compel #285 . Filed by Troutman Sanders. (Hernandez, Roman) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Filing 295 Response in Opposition to Motion to Strike the Seventh and Eighth Affirmative Defenses in the Seirus Defendants' Second Amended Answer Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) Answer, #277 , Answer, #276 #281 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Scott Denike, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Thornburgh, John) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Filing 294 Response re Notice #293 Columbia Sportswear's Response to Notice (ECF 293) Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc. (Related document(s): Notice #293 .) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 7, 2020 Filing 293 Notice of Filing: 1) Seirus' Opening Brief in the Ninth Circuit; and 2) Columbia's Notice Concerning Venue Issue in the Southern District Court of California Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Scott Denike, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Thornburgh, John) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 292 ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice #291 . Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Clerk's Review of Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney(s) Roman D. Hernandez,Roman D. Hernandez,Jaime Theriot for Troutman Sanders Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC- #291 : Reviewed and Ready for Ruling. (ecp) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 291 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Pro Hac Vice admission requested by attorney(s) Jaime Theriot for Troutman Sanders Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-6480559. Filed by Troutman Sanders. (Hernandez, Roman) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 290 ORDER: Defendants Motion to Withdraw #289 is GRANTED. Defense counsel for Defendant Ventex is permitted to withdraw his representation. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 289 Motion to Withdraw as Counsel by Rylander & Associates PC. Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Ventex Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Attachment Certificate of Service) (Rylander, Kurt) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 288 Exhibits 4 to the Declaration of Samantha Burnside in Support of Columbia Sportswear's Motion to Compel (Non-Party Troutman Sanders LLP) re Declaration, #287 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 4) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 287 Declaration of Samantha Burnside in Support of Columbia Sportswear's Motion to Compel (Non-Party Troutman Sanders LLP). Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion to compel #285 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 286 Redaction to Motion to Compel (Non-Party Troutman Sanders LLP) #285 by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 285 Motion to Compel (Non-Party Troutman Sanders LLP). (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Oral Argument requested. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 284 Notice re Motion to Dismiss, #246 Notice Concerning Service on Ventex Co., Ltd. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss, #246 .) (Attachments: #1 Attachment Ventex Service Documents) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 283 Declaration of Samantha Burnside in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Strike the Seventh and Eighth Affirmative Defenses in the Seirus Defendants' Second Amended Answer Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f). Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Related document(s): Redacted Document, #282 , Motion to Strike, #281 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3A-K, #4 Exhibit 4A-D, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7A-B, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 282 Redaction to Motion to Strike the Seventh and Eighth Affirmative Defenses in the Seirus Defendants' Second Amended Answer Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) Answer, #277 , Answer, #276 #281 by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 281 Motion to Strike the Seventh and Eighth Affirmative Defenses in the Seirus Defendants' Second Amended Answer Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(f) Answer, #277 , Answer, #276 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Oral Argument requested. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 20, 2020 Filing 280 Notice Plaintiff Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.'s Notice Concerning Amendments to Second Amended Complaint Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 19, 2020 Filing 279 Reply to Motion for Reconsideration of Personal Jurisdiction of Opinion and Order, #156 #254 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Scott Denike, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Thornburgh, John) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 13, 2020 Filing 278 Reply to Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(2)-(5) Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 #246 . Filed by Ventex Co., Ltd.. (Rylander, Kurt) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 277 Amended Answer to Amended Complaint, #91 [REDACTED PUBLIC VERSION]. Filed by Scott Denike, Michael J. Carey, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Wendy M. Carey, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Related document(s): Amended Complaint, #91 .) (Thornburgh, John) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 276 Amended Answer to Amended Complaint, #91 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Scott Denike, Michael J. Carey, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Wendy M. Carey, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Related document(s): Amended Complaint, #91 .) (Thornburgh, John) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 275 Joint Stipulation for Seirus Defendants to File Second Amended Answer. Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Scott Denike, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc. (Terhufen, Tucker) Modified on 3/5/2020 to correct event (jn). [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 274 Declaration of Samantha Burnside in Support of Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.'s Opposition to Seirus Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of Personal Jurisdiction. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion, #272 , Redacted Document, #273 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 273 Redaction to Response in Opposition to Motion, #272 Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.'s Response in Opposition to Seirus Defendants' Motion for Reconsideration of Personal Jurisdiction (ECF 156) PUBLIC, REDACTED by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 272 Response in Opposition to Motion for Reconsideration of Personal Jurisdiction of Opinion and Order, #156 #254 Oral Argument requested. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 5, 2020 Filing 271 OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Telephone Conference held on February 5, 2020 before Judge Michael H. Simon, Court Reporter Dennis W. Apodaca, telephone number (503) 326-8182 or dennis_apodaca@ord.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through PACER. See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 3/12/2020. Redaction Request due 3/26/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/6/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/3/2020. (Apodaca, Dennis) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 270 Transcript Designation and Order Form for the hearing held on February 5, 2020 before Judge Michael Simon. Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. . Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 269 Declaration of Samantha Burnside in Support of Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.'s Response in Opposition to Ventex Co., Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(2-5). Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Related document(s): Redacted Document, #268 , Response in Opposition to Motion, #267 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 268 Redaction to Response in Opposition to Motion, #267 Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.'s Response in Opposition to Ventex Co., Ltd.'s Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(2-5) - PUBLIC, REDACTED by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 267 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(2)-(5) Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 #246 Oral Argument requested. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 266 Order from USCA for the 9th Circuit, USCA # 19-36047 re Notice of Appeal #165 . Appellee's motion to dismiss this appeal for lack of jurisdiction (Docket Entry No. #11 ) is denied without prejudice to renewing the arguments in the answering brief. See Nat'l Indus. v. Republic Nat'l Life Ins. Co., 677 F.2d 1258, 1262 (9th Cir. 1982) (merits panel may consider appellate jurisdiction despite earlier denial of motion to dismiss). On January 24, 2020, the district court entered an order staying all proceedings that relate to the claims at issue in this interlocutory appeal, and postponing trial on all claims, pending this court's resolution of the appeal. Accordingly, appellants' motion to stay the district court action (Docket Entry No. #6 ) is denied in part as unnecessary. To the extent the motion seeks to stay additional proceedings pending appeal that the district court has not stayed, the motion is denied. See Hilton v. Braunskill, 481 U.S. 770, 776 (1987). Appellants' motion to expedite this appeal (Docket Entry No. #6 ) is denied. Appellee's motion to file document under seal (Docket Entry No. #10 ) is granted. See 9th Cir. R. 27-13. The Clerk shall maintain the unredacted version of the second amended complaint (Docket Entry No. #10 -2) under seal. The opening brief and excerpts of record are due April 7, 2020; the answering brief is due May 6, 2020; and the optional reply brief is due within 21 days after service of the answering brief. (jtj) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 28, 2020 Filing 265 Notice of Appearance of Jason A. Wrubleski appearing on behalf of Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc. Filed by on behalf of Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Wrubleski, Jason) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 264 ORDER: The court ACCEPTS Plaintiffs Notice of Withdrawal #260 with respect to its Motion for Default Judgment #172 , #173 . Pursuant to the Notice, Plaintiffs Motion is DENIED as moot, with leave to refile. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 263 Amended Answer to Amended Complaint, #91 . Filed by Scott Denike, Michael J. Carey, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Wendy M. Carey, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Related document(s): Amended Complaint, #91 .) (Thornburgh, John) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 262 Amended Answer to Amended Complaint, #91 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Scott Denike, Michael J. Carey, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Wendy M. Carey, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Related document(s): Amended Complaint, #91 .) (Thornburgh, John) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 261 OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Status Conference held on 2/12/2020 before Judge Michael W. Mosman, Court Reporter Bonita J. Shumway, telephone number 503-326-8188 or bonita_shumway@ord.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER. See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 3/3/2020. Redaction Request due 3/17/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/27/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/26/2020. (Shumway, Bonita) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Filing 260 Notice re Motion for default judgment #173 , Motion for default judgment, #172 Notice of Temporary Withdrawal Without Prejudice of Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.'s Motion for Default Judgment Against Man-Sik (Paul) Park Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion for default judgment #173 , Motion for default judgment, #172 .) (Forbes, Erin) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 259 ORDER: Defendant Ventexs Motion for Protective Order #247 is DENIED. Discovery will proceed as discussed at the status conference held on 2/12/2020 250 . Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 258 Declaration of Samantha Burnside in Support of Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.'s Response in Opposition to Ventex Co., Ltd.'s Motion for Protective Order from Discovery. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion #257 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 24, 2020 Filing 257 Response in Opposition to Motion for Protective Order From Discovery #247 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER: The court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a response to the Seirus Defendants Motion for Reconsideration #254 . The response is due 3/5/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER: Consistent with its usual practice on motions for reconsideration, the court ORDERS the following briefing schedule for the Seirus Defendants Motion for Reconsideration #254 : no response brief will be required unless or until the court orders Plaintiff to file a response. The court may deny the motion #254 without benefit of a response, but it will not grant the motion without ordering a response brief. If a response brief is ordered, Plaintiff will have 14 days in which to file. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 18, 2020 Filing 254 Motion for Reconsideration of Personal Jurisdiction of Opinion and Order, #156 . Oral Argument requested. Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Scott Denike, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Thornburgh, John) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 253 Notice of Appearance of Scott D. Eads appearing on behalf of Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc. Filed by on behalf of Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Eads, Scott) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 252 Transcript Designation and Order Form for the hearing held on 02/12/2020 before Judge Michael W. Mosman. Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway. . Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Scott Denike, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Terhufen, Tucker) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Filing 251 Transcript Designation and Order Form for the hearing held on February 12, 2020 before Judge Michael W. Mosman. Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway. . Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 12, 2020 Filing 250 MINUTES of Proceedings: Status conference held. The court ADOPTS the following schedule: the deadline to amend pleads to add claims, defenses, or parties is 3/20/2020; deadline to confer regarding ADR procedures is 3/20/2020; deadline for completion of discovery pursuant to FRCP 33 & 34 is 8/3/2020; briefing on issues of privileged documents is due 8/30/2020; close of fact discovery is 11/2/2020; deadline to complete ADR is 10/1/2020; discovery motions are due 30 days before the close of fact discovery. The court also ADOPTS modified briefing schedule as to Defendant Ventex's Motion to Dismiss #246 . Plaintiff's response is due 3/2/2020, and Defendant Ventex's reply is due 3/23/2020. The court advised the parties that sur-replies would not be accepted and that multiple and frequent motions for extension of time would be disfavored. Nicholas F. Aldrich, Jr. and Erin Forbes present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Christopher S. Marchese, Paul S. Bierly, Seth M. Sproul, Tucker N. Terhufen, John W. Thornburgh and Kurt M. Rylander present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Bonita Shumway. Judge Michael W. Mosman presiding. (dls) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 11, 2020 Filing 249 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Ventex Co., Ltd.. (Rylander, Kurt) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 248 Declaration of Kurt M. Rylander . Filed by Ventex Co., Ltd.. (Related document(s): Motion for Protective Order #247 , Motion to Dismiss, #246 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Attachment Certificate of Service by ECF Filing) (Rylander, Kurt) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 247 Motion for Protective Order From Discovery. Filed by Ventex Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Service by ECF Filing) (Rylander, Kurt) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 246 Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(2)-(5) Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Ventex Co., Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Certificate of Service by ECF Filing) (Rylander, Kurt) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 245 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael W. Mosman. Status Conference is set for 2/12/2020 at 10:30AM in Portland Courtroom 16 before Judge Michael W. Mosman. The parties who wish to participate by phone should call the conference line. Ordered by Judge Michael W. Mosman. (kms) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Filing 244 Answer to #92 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand Seirus Defendants Answer to Second Amended Complaint. Filed by Scott Denike, Michael J. Carey, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Wendy M. Carey, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Thornburgh, John) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Filing 243 Answer to #91 Amended Complaint, with Jury Demand Seirus Defendants Answer to Second Amended Complaint. Filed by Scott Denike, Michael J. Carey, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Wendy M. Carey, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) (Thornburgh, John) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Filing 242 MINUTES OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: Recusal of Judge Michael Simon discussed as stated on the record. David W. Axelrod, Nicholas F. Aldrich, Jr., and Erin Forbes present as counsel for Plaintiff. Christopher S. Marchese, Paul S. Bierly, Seth M. Sproul, Harry B. Wilson, John Thornburgh, Kurt M. Rylander, and Mark E. Beatty present as counsel for Defendants. Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Filing 241 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Michael H. Simon to Judge Michael W. Mosman. (eo) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 240 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael H. Simon. ORDER - Setting a Telephone Conference for 2/5/2020 at 01:30PM. The Court will provide the parties with a call-in number by separate sealed entry. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER - Based on information brought to the Court's attention by counsel for Defendant Ventex Co., Ltd. on February 4, 2020, U.S. District Judge Michael H. Simon recuses himself from any further proceedings in this matter and directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case pursuant to the District of Oregon's Case Management Plan. The Court strikes the telephone conference previously scheduled for February 5, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 238 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael H. Simon. ORDER - At the Plaintiff's unopposed request, the Court is setting a Telephone Conference to discuss a discovery matter for 2/5/2020 at 01:30PM. The Court will provide the parties with a call-in number by separate sealed entry. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 31, 2020 Filing 237 Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Paul S. Bierly is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Renee E. Rothauge Filed by Scott Denike, Michael J. Carey, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Wendy M. Carey, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Wilson, Harry) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 236 Case Management Order. Signed on 1/30/2020 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER - For the reasons stated in this Order, the Court: (a) STRIKES Plaintiff Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc's First Motion to Compel (ECF #219 ) without prejudice and with leave to renew; (b) NOTES Plaintiff's withdrawal of Plaintiff Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc's Second Motion to Compel (ECF #223 ); (c) GRANTS the Seirus Defendants' Motion to Strike Columbia's First Motion to Compel (ECF #226 ); and (d) DENIES the Seirus Defendants' Motion to Strike Columbia's Annotated Second Amended Complaint (ECF #227 ). Signed on 1/30/2020 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 234 Response in Opposition to Motion to Strike Seirus Defendants' Motion to Strike Columbia's Annotated Second Amended Complaint #227 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 30, 2020 Filing 233 Notice re Motion to compel #223 Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.'s Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Compel Non-Party Troutman Sanders Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion to compel #223 .) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Filing 232 Declaration of Oliver J. Richards in Support of Seirus Reply to Motion to Strike Columbia's First Motion to Compel Seirus. Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Scott Denike, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion, #231 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Oliver J. Richards in Support of Seirus Reply to Motion to Strike Columbia's First Motion to Compel Seirus) (Richards, Oliver) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Filing 231 Reply Seirus Defendants Reply in Support of Motion to Strike Columbias First Motion to Compel Seirus to Motion to Strike Seirus Defendants' Motion to Strike Columbia's First Motion to Compel Seirus Motion to Compel Plaintiff Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.'s First Motion to Compel (Seirus) #219 #226 . Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Scott Denike, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Richards, Oliver) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Filing 230 Declaration of Samantha Burnside in Support of Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.'s Opposition to Seirus Defendants' Motion to Strike Columbia's First Motion to Compel Seirus. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion, #229 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Filing 229 Response in Opposition to Motion to Strike Seirus Defendants' Motion to Strike Columbia's First Motion to Compel Seirus Motion to Compel Plaintiff Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.'s First Motion to Compel (Seirus) #219 #226 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER - Columbia Sportswear shall respond to the Seirus Defendants' two motions strike (ECF #226 and ECF #227 ) not later than February 6, 2020. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 28, 2020 Filing 227 Motion to Strike Seirus Defendants' Motion to Strike Columbia's Annotated Second Amended Complaint. Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Scott Denike, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 28, 2020 Filing 226 Motion to Strike Seirus Defendants' Motion to Strike Columbia's First Motion to Compel Seirus Motion to Compel Plaintiff Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.'s First Motion to Compel (Seirus) #219 . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Scott Denike, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 225 Order from USCA for the 9th Circuit, USCA # 19-73247 re Notice of Appeal #165 . Real party in interest's opposed motion to strike petitioners' stay motion and mandamus petition (Docket Entry No. #2 ) is denied. Petitioners have not demonstrated that this case warrants the intervention of this court by means of the extraordinary remedy of mandamus. See Bauman v. U.S. Dist. Court, 557 F.2d 650 (9th Cir. 1977). Accordingly, the petition is denied. Petitioners' motion for a stay, included in the mandamus petition, is denied as moot. DENIED. (jtj) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 224 Declaration of Samantha Burnside in Support of Plaintiff Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.'s Second Motion to Compel (Non-Party Troutman Sanders LLP). Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion to compel #223 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 223 Motion to Compel Plaintiff Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.'s Second Motion to Compel (Non-Party Troutman Sanders LLP). Oral Argument requested. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 222 Redaction to Motion to Compel Plaintiff Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.'s First Motion to Compel (Seirus) #219 by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 221 Exhibits 1, 3-12, and 15 to the Declaration of Samantha Burnside in Support of Plaintiff Columbia Sportswear North America Inc.'s First Motion to Compel (Seirus) re Declaration, #220 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 9, #7 Exhibit 10, #8 Exhibit 11, #9 Exhibit 12, #10 Exhibit 15) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 220 Declaration of Samantha Burnside in Support of Plaintiff Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.'s First Motion to Compel (Seirus). Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion to compel, #219 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3-12, #4 Exhibit 13, #5 Exhibit 14, #6 Exhibit 15, #7 Exhibit 16, #8 Exhibit 17) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 219 Motion to Compel Plaintiff Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.'s First Motion to Compel (Seirus). (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Oral Argument requested. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 218 Opinion and Order - Defendants Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc., Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Robert Murphy, and Scott DeNike's Motion to Stay and Request for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal (ECF #182 ) is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. The Court denies the Seirus Defendants' motion for certification under 1292(b), the Court stays all proceedings in this action that are specifically related to Plaintiff's state claims (Oregon and Virginia) until the Ninth Circuit has resolved the pending interlocutory appeal, discovery may proceed on Plaintiff's federal RICO claims, and the Court will refrain from setting a trial date until the Ninth Circuit has resolved the pending interlocutory appeal. Signed on 1/24/2020 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 217 Redaction to Notice, #215 Notice of Entry of Annotated Second Amended Complaint, Public Redacted Version by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 216 Annotated Second Amended Complaint re Notice #215 Annotated SAC Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc. (Related document(s): Notice, #215 .) (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) (Attachments: #1 SAC001-SAC020, #2 SAC021-SAC040, #3 SAC041-SAC060, #4 SAC061-SAC073, #5 SAC100-SAC120, #6 SAC121-SAC140, #7 SAC141-SAC156, #8 SAC200-SAC210, #9 SAC300-SAC326, #10 SAC400, #11 SAC401, #12 SAC402-SAC419, #13 SAC420-SAC432) (Aldrich, Nicholas) Modified on 1/27/2020 to correct docket text (jn). [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 24, 2020 Filing 215 Notice of Entry of Annotated Second Amended Complaint Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) (Attachments: #1 Appendix A) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 23, 2020 Filing 214 Notice Concerning Denial of Mandamus Petition Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 213 ORDER - Defendant Ventex Co., LTD.'s Motion to Enlarge Time (ECF #211 ) is GRANTED. Initial disclosures are due by February 5, 2020. Answer or other responsive pleading is due by February 5, 2020. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 212 Declaration of Counsel Kurt M. Rylander In Support of Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Second Amended Complaint and serve Initial Disclosures. Filed by Ventex Co., Ltd.. (Related document(s): Amended Complaint, #91 , Amended Complaint, #92 .) (Rylander, Kurt) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Filing 211 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Second Amended Complaint. Filed by Ventex Co., Ltd.. (Rylander, Kurt) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 210 ORDER - On January 9, 2020, the Court granted the Seirus Defendants' Amended Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Second Amended Complaint (ECF #200 ), giving the Seirus Defendants until February 5, 2020 to answer. See ECF 201 . Since then, the Court received and reviewed Plaintiff's Response in Opposition (ECF #205 ) and the Seirus Defendants' Reply (ECF #209 ). The Court stands by its ruling but notes that, absent the entry of a stay by either this Court or the Ninth Circuit, any further requests for additional time to answer the Second Amended Complaint will be disfavored and likely denied. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Filing 209 Reply and Response to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Amended Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Second Amended Complaint, #91 #200 . Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Scott Denike, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Filing 208 Notice of Entry of Order Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Filing 207 Exhibits 15 to the Declaration of David Aldred in Support of Columbias Opposition To Defendants Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc., Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Robert Murphy, And Scott Denikes Motion For Extension Of Time To Respond To Complaint re Declaration,, #206 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 15) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Filing 206 Declaration of David Aldred in Support of Columbia's Opposition to Defendants Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc., Michael J Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Robert Murphy, and Scott Denike's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion #205 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Filing 205 Response in Opposition to Amended Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Second Amended Complaint, #91 #200 . Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default Against Kyung-Chan Go (ECF #203 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Filing 203 Motion for Entry of Default Against Kyung-Chan Go. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER - Defendants Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc., Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Robert Murphy, and Scott Denike's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Second Amended Complaint (ECF #199 ) is DENIED as moot in light of ECF #200 . Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER - Defendants Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc., Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Robert Murphy, and Scott Denike's Amended Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Second Amended Complaint (ECF #200 ) is GRANTED. The Seirus Defendants' answer to the Second Amended Complaint are due by 2/5/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 8, 2020 Filing 200 Amended Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Second Amended Complaint, #91 . Filed by Scott Denike, Michael J. Carey, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Wendy M. Carey, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 8, 2020 Filing 199 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Second Amended Complaint, #91 . Filed by Scott Denike, Michael J. Carey, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Wendy M. Carey, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER - The Parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ECF #197 ) is GRANTED. Defendant Ventex Co., Ltd's answer or other responsive pleading is due by 1/15/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 8, 2020 Filing 197 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Amended Complaint, #91 , Amended Complaint, #92 . Filed by Ventex Co., Ltd.. (Rylander, Kurt) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 196 Notice to the Court Concerning Appeals and Other Developments Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 195 Notice of Appearance of Kurt M. Rylander appearing on behalf of Ventex Co., Ltd. Filed by on behalf of Ventex Co., Ltd.. (Rylander, Kurt) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Filing 194 Declaration of Christopher S. Marchese in Support of Reply to Motion for Stay and Request for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal. Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Scott Denike, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion #193 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Marchese, Christopher) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Filing 193 Reply to Motion for Stay and Request for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal #182 . Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Scott Denike, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Marchese, Christopher) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 31, 2019 Filing 192 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #4 , Summons Issued, #144 upon Kyung-Chan Go served on 12/18/2019; Ventex Co., Ltd. served on 12/18/2019 Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 191 Exhibits 1 to the Declaration of Samantha Burnside in Support of Columbia's Response in Opposition to Defendants Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc., Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Robert Murphy and Scott Denike's Motion to Stay and Request for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal re Declaration, #190 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 190 Declaration of Samantha Burnside in Support of Columbia's Response in Opposition to Defendants Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc., Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Robert Murphy and Scott Denike's Motion to Stay and Request for Interlocutory Appeal. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion #189 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 23, 2019 Filing 189 Response in Opposition to Motion for Stay and Request for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal #182 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 188 Notice of Filing of Seirus Defendants Petition of Writ of Mandamus and Motion to Stay Under Ninth Circuit Rule 27-3 Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Scott Denike, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit to Seirus Defendants Notice of Filing of Petition of Writ of Mandamus and Motion to Stay) (Thornburgh, John) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Filing 187 Joint Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan . Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 186 Order for Administrative Correction of the Record pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 60(a) regarding #185 Stipulated Order. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The incorrect PDF was attached. The following corrections were made to the record: ECF #185 was entered in this case in error and is stricken from the record. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 185 Second Stipulated Order for Injunctive Relief. Signed on 12/16/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) Modified on 12/16/2019 (mja). [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Alternate Service on Defendants Ventex Co., Ltd. and Kyung-Chan Go. (ECF #178 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 16, 2019 USCA Case Number and Notice confirming Docketing Record on Appeal re Notice of Appeal #165 . Case Appealed to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals Case Number 19-36047 assigned. (jtj) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 183 Declaration of Seth M. Sproul in Support of Seirus Defendants' Motion to Stay and Request for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal. Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Scott Denike, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion for Stay #182 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 182 Motion for Stay and Request for Certification for Interlocutory Appeal. Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Scott Denike, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 181 Exhibits 1, 2, 4, and 18 to the Declaration of David Aldred in Support of Columbia's Motion for Alternate Service on Defendants Ventex Co., Ltd. and Kyung-Chan Go re Declaration,, #180 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 18) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 180 Declaration of David Aldred in Support of Columbia's Motion for Alternate Service on Defendants Ventex Co., Ltd. and Kyung-Chan Go. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous #178 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13a, #14 Exhibit 13b, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17, #19 Exhibit 18, #20 Exhibit 19) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 179 Declaration of John Motley in Support of Columbia's Motion for Alternate Service on Defendants Ventex Co., Ltd. and Kyung-Chan Go. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous #178 .) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 178 Motion Plaintiff Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.'s Motion for Alternate Service on Defendants Ventex Co., Ltd. and Kyung-Chan Go. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 177 Exhibits 2-18 to the Declaration of David Aldred in Support of Columbia's Motion for Default Judgment Against Man-Sik (Paul) Park re Declaration, #176 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3, #3 Exhibit 4, #4 Exhibit 5, #5 Exhibit 6, #6 Exhibit 7, #7 Exhibit 8, #8 Exhibit 9, #9 Exhibit 10, #10 Exhibit 11, #11 Exhibit 12, #12 Exhibit 13, #13 Exhibit 14, #14 Exhibit 15, #15 Exhibit 16, #16 Exhibit 17, #17 Exhibit 18) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 176 Declaration of David Aldred in Support of Columbia's Motion for Default Judgment Against Man-Sik (Paul) Park. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion for default judgment #173 , Motion for default judgment, #172 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2-18) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 175 Exhibits 2 and 4 to the Declaration of John Motley in Support of Columbia's Motion for Default Judgment Against Man-Sik (Paul) Park re Declaration,, #174 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 4) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 174 Declaration of John Motley in Support of Columbia's Motion for Default Judgment Against Man-Sik (Paul) Park. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion for default judgment #173 , Motion for default judgment, #172 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 173 Redacted Motion for Default Judgment Against Man-Sik (Paul) Park. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A) (Aldrich, Nicholas) Modified on 12/13/2019 to correct event (jn). [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 172 Motion for Default Judgment Against Man-Sik (Paul) Park. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Oral Argument requested. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Filing 171 Notice of Entry of Order Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Entry of Default Against Man-Sik (Paul) Park (ECF #167 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of John W. Thornburgh for Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Scott Denike, Robert (Bob) Murphy, and Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc. Signed on 12/11/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (jn) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Filing 168 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney John W. Thornburgh . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-6117906. Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Scott Denike, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Rothauge, Renee) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Filing 167 Motion for Entry of Default Against Man-Sik (Paul) Park. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Filing 166 Representation Statement re Notice of Appeal, #165 . Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Scott Denike, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Marchese, Christopher) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 10, 2019 Filing 165 Notice of Appeal to the 9th Circuit from Opinion and Order, #156 Filing fee $505 collected; Agency Tracking ID 0979-6116751: . Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Scott Denike, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Marchese, Christopher) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER - Seirus Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint (ECF #163 ) is GRANTED. Answer is due by 1/13/2020. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 6, 2019 Filing 163 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Amended Complaint, #91 . Filed by Scott Denike, Michael J. Carey, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Wendy M. Carey, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER - The Parties' Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Rule 16(f) Report and Discovery Plan (ECF #160 ) is GRANTED. Rule 26(f) Report is due by 12/16/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 161 Notice of Change of Address. Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Scott Denike, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 160 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 5, 2019 Filing 159 Supplemental Return of Service Executed (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 3, 2019 Filing 158 Notice of Entry of Orders Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 157 SCHEDULING ORDER - The parties are directed to confer regarding an appropriate case management schedule through the filing of dispositive motions and, not later than December 16, 2019, to file either a stipulated proposed case management schedule or separately proposed schedules. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 156 Opinion and Order - Scott DeNike's motion to dismiss (ECF #101 ) is DENIED; Michael Carey, Wendy Carey, and Robert Murphy's motion to dismiss (ECF #103 ) is DENIED; Seirus Defendants' motion to strike (ECF #110 ) is DENIED; and Seirus' motion to dismiss (ECF #111 ) is DENIED. Signed on 12/2/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER - The Parties' Stipulated Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan (ECF #154 ) is GRANTED. The Joint Rule 26(f) Report and Discovery Plan are due by 12/10/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Filing 154 Joint Motion for Extension of Time . Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Scott Denike, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
November 27, 2019 Filing 153 Corrected Certificate of Service by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc. of Notice #152 Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 152 Second Notice Concerning Dismissal of Underlying IPR Appeals Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
November 26, 2019 Filing 151 Seirus Defendants' Response in Support of its Notice of Supplemental Authority re Notice #148 Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Scott Denike, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Related document(s): Notice #148 .) (Sproul, Seth) Modified on 12/2/2019 to correct docket text (jn). [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
November 25, 2019 Filing 150 OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Oral Argument held on 11/6/2019 before Judge Michael H. Simon, Court Reporter Bonita J. Shumway, telephone number 503-326-8188 or bonita_shumway@ord.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through the Court Reporter or PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 12/2/2019. Redaction Request due 12/16/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/26/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/24/2020. (Shumway, Bonita) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
November 22, 2019 Filing 149 Notice re Notice #148 Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.'s Response to the Seirus Defendants' Notice of Supplemental Authority Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Related document(s): Notice #148 .) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Filing 148 Notice of Supplemental Authority Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Scott Denike, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 147 MINUTES OF ORAL ARGUMENT HEARING: ORDER - Seirus Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Motion to Strike (ECF #101 , #102 , #103 , #110 & #111 ) are taken under advisement on November 6, 2019. David W. Axelrod and Nicholas F. Aldrich, Jr. present as counsel for Plaintiff. Harry B. Wilson, Seth M. Sproul, and Christopher S. Marchese present as counsel for Defendants. Court Reporter: Bonita Schumway. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 146 Notice Concerning Dismissal of Underlying IPR Appeals Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 145 Notice re Notice #142 of Supplemental Authority Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Related document(s): Notice #142 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
November 6, 2019 Filing 144 Amended Summons Issued Electronically as to Kyung-Chan Go, Ventex Co., Ltd NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jn) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
November 5, 2019 Filing 143 Amended Proposed Summons to Ventex Co. Ltd. and to Kyung-Chan Go Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
November 4, 2019 Filing 142 Notice of Supplemental Authority Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Scott Denike, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1) (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 141 Sur-Reply Response to Sur-Reply to Motion, #137 , Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants Michael Carey, Wendy Carey, and Robert Murphys Rule 12(b)(2) & (b)(3) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Improper Venue and Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss for Failure t #103 . Filed by Robert (Bob) Murphy. (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER - Seirus Defendants' Motion for Leave to File a Response to Plaintiff's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants Michael Carey, Wendy Carey, and Robert Murphy's Rule 12(b)(2) & (b)(3) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Improper Venue and Rule 12(b)(6) (ECF #138 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) Modified on 10/25/2019 (mja). [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 139 Declaration of Seth M. Sproul in Support of Seirus Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Sur-Reply (Dkt.137). (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Robert (Bob) Murphy. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave, #138 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3) (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
October 25, 2019 Filing 138 Motion for Leave to File a Response to Plaintiff's Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants Michael Carey, Wendy Carey, and Robert Murphy's Rule 12(b)(2) & (b)(3) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Improper Venue and Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Dkt. 137). Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Robert (Bob) Murphy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document Response to Sur-Reply) (Sproul, Seth) Modified on 10/25/2019 to correct event from motion for Leave to Motion for Extension of time (mja). [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 137 Sur-Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants Michael Carey, Wendy Carey, and Robert Murphys Rule 12(b)(2) & (b)(3) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Improper Venue and Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss for Failure t #103 . Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER - Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants Michael Carey, Wendy Carey, and Robert Murphy's Rule 12(b)(2) and (b)(3) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Improper Venue and Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim g Motion for Leave (ECF #134 ) is GRANTED. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
October 11, 2019 Filing 135 Response in Opposition to Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants Michael Carey, Wendy Carey, and Robert Murphy's Rule 12(b)(2) and (b)(3) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Improper Venue and Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismi #134 . Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Scott Denike, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Marchese, Christopher) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
October 10, 2019 Filing 134 Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Opposition to Defendants Michael Carey, Wendy Carey, and Robert Murphy's Rule 12(b)(2) and (b)(3) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Improper Venue and Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Dkt. 103). Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Document - Sur-Reply) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael H. Simon. ORDER - Setting Oral Argument on Defendant Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc., Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Robert Murphy, and Scott DeNike's pending motions (ECF #101 , #102 , #103 , #110 ,& #111 ) for 11/6/2019 at 01:30PM in Portland, Courtroom 15B, before Judge Michael H. Simon. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 132 Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Seirus Innovative Accessories Inc.s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, for Lack of Venue, and for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted #111 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Scott Denike, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 131 Reply to Motion to Strike Columbia's State-Law Claims Pursuant to Anti-SLAPP Law #110 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 130 Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants Michael Carey, Wendy Carey, and Robert Murphys Rule 12(b)(2) & (b)(3) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Improper Venue and Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss for Failure t #103 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Robert (Bob) Murphy. (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 129 Redacted Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on Behalf of Scott DeNike #101 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Scott Denike, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
September 23, 2019 Filing 128 Reply to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on Behalf of Scott DeNike #101 Oral Argument requested. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Scott Denike, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
September 13, 2019 Filing 127 Corrected Certificate of Service by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc. of Declaration,,, #122 , Response in Opposition to Motion, #119 , Response in Opposition to Motion, #118 , Exhibits,,, #123 , Response in Opposition to Motion, #125 , Response in Opposition to Motion, #121 , Response in Opposition to Motion, #124 , Response in Opposition to Motion, #120 , Response in Opposition to Motion, #126 Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 126 Response in Opposition to Scott Denike's Motion to Dismiss Columbia's Federal and Oregon RICO Claims Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim [Dkt. 101] to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on Behalf of Scott DeNike #101 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 125 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Seirus Innovative Accessories Inc.s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, for Lack of Venue, and for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted #111 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 124 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants Michael Carey, Wendy Carey, and Robert Murphys Rule 12(b)(2) & (b)(3) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Improper Venue and Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss for Failure t #103 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 123 Exhibits 3, 7-10, and 15-19 to the Declaration of Nika Aldrich in Support of Columbia's Response in Opposition to Michael Carey, Wendy Carey, and Robert Murphy's Rule 12(b)(2) & (b)(3) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Improper Venue and Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Dkt. 103] re Response in Opposition to Motion, #118 , Declaration,,, #122 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 3, #2 Exhibit 7, #3 Exhibit 8, #4 Exhibit 9, #5 Exhibit 10, #6 Exhibit 15, #7 Exhibit 16, #8 Exhibit 17, #9 Exhibit 18, #10 Exhibit 19) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 122 Declaration of Nika Aldrich in Support of Columbia's Response in Opposition to Michael Carey, Wendy Carey, and Robert Murphy's Rule 12(b)(2) & (b)(3) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Improper Venue and Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim [Dkt. 103]. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion, #118 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3 - slip sheet, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7-10 slip sheets, #8 Exhibit 11, #9 Exhibit 12, #10 Exhibit 13, #11 Exhibit 14, #12 Exhibit 15-19 slip sheets, #13 Exhibit 20, #14 Exhibit 21, #15 Exhibit 22) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 121 Response in Opposition to Seirus Defendants' Motion - to Motion to Strike Columbia's State-Law Claims Pursuant to Anti-SLAPP Law #110 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 120 Response in Opposition to Scott Denike's Motion to Dismiss Columbia's Federal and Oregon RICO Claims Under Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) for Failure to State a Claim to Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on Behalf of Scott DeNike #101 Oral Argument requested. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 119 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Seirus Innovative Accessories Inc.s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, for Lack of Venue, and for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted #111 Oral Argument requested. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
September 9, 2019 Filing 118 Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants Michael Carey, Wendy Carey, and Robert Murphys Rule 12(b)(2) & (b)(3) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Improper Venue and Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss for Failure t #103 Oral Argument requested. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER - Defendant Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.'s motion to file overlength brief and to extend time for Plaintiff to file responses (ECF #116 ) is GRANTED. Plaintiff's responses to Seirus Defendants' Rule 12 and anti-SLAPP motions are due by 9/9/2019 and Seirus Defendants' replies are due by 9/23/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
August 13, 2019 Filing 116 Unopposed Motion to File Excess Pages and Extend the Time for Columbia to File Responses re Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, #111 . Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 115 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #113 Exhibits,. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The document was missing a case caption cover page. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment.The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
August 12, 2019 Filing 114 Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding #105 Exhibits,,. A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The document was missing a case caption cover page. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment.The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 113 Exhibits 2 to Declaration of Seth M. Sproul re Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Seirus Innovative Accessories Inc.s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, for Lack of Venue, and for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted #111 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Sproul, Seth) (Main Document 113 replaced on 8/12/2019) (cw). [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 112 Declaration of Seth M. Sproul . Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, #111 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2 (REDACTED), #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6) (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 111 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Seirus Innovative Accessories Inc.s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction, for Lack of Venue, and for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 110 Motion to Strike Columbia's State-Law Claims Pursuant to Anti-SLAPP Law. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Scott Denike, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 109 Declaration of Scott DeNike . Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, #103 .) (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 108 Declaration of Bob Murphy . Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, #103 .) (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 107 Declaration of Wendy Carey . Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, #103 .) (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 106 Declaration of Michael Carey . Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, #103 .) (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 105 Exhibits 1 to Declaration of Seth M. Sproul re Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants Michael Carey, Wendy Carey, and Robert Murphys Rule 12(b)(2) & (b)(3) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Improper Venue and Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss #103 . (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc. (Sproul, Seth) (Main Document 105 replaced on 8/12/2019) (cw). [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 104 Declaration of Seth M. Sproul . Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction, #103 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (REDACTED)) (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 103 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendants Michael Carey, Wendy Carey, and Robert Murphys Rule 12(b)(2) & (b)(3) Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction and for Improper Venue and Rule 12(b)(6) Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Michael J. Carey, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Wendy M. Carey, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 102 Redacted Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on Behalf of Scott DeNike. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Scott Denike, Michael J. Carey, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Wendy M. Carey, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
August 9, 2019 Filing 101 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim on Behalf of Scott DeNike. (DOCUMENT RESTRICTED ACCORDING TO PROTECTIVE ORDER) Oral Argument requested. Filed by Scott Denike, Michael J. Carey, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Wendy M. Carey, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
August 1, 2019 Filing 100 Certificate of Service by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc. of Amended Complaint, #91 Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
July 24, 2019 Filing 99 Notice of Change of Address. Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Rothauge, Renee) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER - The parties' joint amended motion for extension of time (ECF #97 ) is GRANTED as follows: (1) Seirus Defendants' Rule 12 and anti-SLAPP motions are due by 8/9/2019; (2) Plaintiff's responses are due by 9/3/2019; and (3) Seirus Defendants' replies are due by 9/20/2019. The parties' joint motion for extension of time (ECF #95 ) is DENIED as MOOT. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 97 Amended Joint Motion for Extension of Time . Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Sproul, Seth) Modified on 7/24/2019 to add amended to title (mja). [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 96 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued #94 upon Scott Denike served on 7/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 95 Joint Motion for Extension of Time . Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
July 23, 2019 Filing 94 Summons Issued Electronically as to Scott Denike. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jn) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 93 Certificate of Service by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc. of Amended Complaint, #92 on Defendant Man-Sik (Paul) Park Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 92 Redacted Second Amended Complaint for Fraud, Racketeering, Abuse of Process, and Civil Conspiracy. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc. against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Appendix A-E, #2 Proposed Summons Scott Denike). (Aldrich, Nicholas) Modified on 7/24/2019 to correct docket text (jn). [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
July 19, 2019 Filing 91 Second Amended Complaint. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc. against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Appendix A, #2 Appendix B, #3 Appendix C, #4 Appendix D, #5 Appendix E). (FILED UNDER SEAL) (jn) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
July 5, 2019 Filing 90 Return of Service Executed as to Man-Sik (Paul) Park served on 5/7/2019, answer due on 5/28/2019. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
May 13, 2019 Filing 89 OFFICIAL COURT TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS FILED Motion Hearing held on April 29, 2019 before Judge Michael H. Simon, Court Reporter Dennis W. Apodaca, telephone number (503) 326-8182 or dennis_apodaca@ord.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at Court's public terminal or purchased from the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. Afterwards it may be obtained through PACER-See Policy at ord.uscourts.gov. Notice of Intent to Redact Transcript is due by 5/20/2019. Redaction Request due 6/3/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/13/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/12/2019. (Apodaca, Dennis) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
May 8, 2019 Filing 88 Notice of Non-Filing of Scheduled Motion Concerning Restricted Facts Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 87 Transcript Designation and Order Form for the hearing held on April 29, 2019 before Judge Michael Simon. Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. . Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 86 Transcript Designation and Order Form for the hearing held on 4/29/2019 before Judge Michael Simon. Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. . Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Rothauge, Renee) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 85 Interim Protective Order. Signed on 4/29/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER ON PENDING MOTIONS AND PRELIMINARY CASE SCHEDULE. Signed on 4/29/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 83 MINUTES ORAL ARGUMENT HEARING: ORDER - The Court ruled on the parties' pending motions as stated on the record. Formal order to follow. Nicholas F. Aldrich and Erin Forbes present as counsel for Plaintiff. Christopher S. Marchese, Seth M. Sproul, and Harry B. Wilson present as counsel for Defendants. Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 29, 2019 Filing 82 Notice of Appearance of Erin Forbes appearing on behalf of Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc. Filed by on behalf of Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Forbes, Erin) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 81 Declaration of Seth M. Sproul in Support of the Seirus Defendants' Opposition to Columbia's Notice of Intent to File a Second Amended Complaint and Motion to Stay Briefing on Seirus's Two Motions to Dismiss until after the Further Amended Complaint is Filed. Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion, #80 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 26, 2019 Filing 80 Response in Opposition to Motion for Stay Plaintiff Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.'s Notice of Intent to File a Second Amended Complaint and Motion to Stay Briefing on Seirus's Two Motions to Dismiss Until After the Further Amended Complaint is Filed #76 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 79 Joint Status Report . Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 78 Declaration of Seth M. Sproul in Support of The Seirus Defendants Special Motion to Strike Columbias State-Law Claims Pursuant to Anti-Slapp Law. Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion to Strike #77 .) (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 77 Motion to Strike Columbia's State-Law Claims Pursuant to Anti-Slapp Law. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 23, 2019 Filing 76 Motion for Stay Plaintiff Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.'s Notice of Intent to File a Second Amended Complaint and Motion to Stay Briefing on Seirus's Two Motions to Dismiss Until After the Further Amended Complaint is Filed. Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER - Defendant Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.'s Corrected Motion to Seal the Complaint, Amended Complaint, and Exhibits (ECF #45 ) is DENIED as MOOT. This motion has been replaced by Corrected Motion, ECF #50 . Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER - Defendant Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.'s Motion to Seal The Complaint, Amended Complaint, and Exhibits (ECF #37 ) is DENIED as MOOT. This motion has been replaced by Corrected Motion, ECF #45 . Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 73 Reply to Motion to File Documents Under Seal #31 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 72 Declaration of Seth M. Sproul in Support of Seirus' Reply in Support of its Corrected Motion to Seal the Complaint, Amended Complaint, and Exhibits. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion #71 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2) (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 71 Reply to Corrected Motion to Seal the Complaint, Amended Complaint, and Exhibits #45 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 70 Supplement - Notice of Supplemental Authority in Opposition to Seirus's Motion to Seal the Complaint, Amended Complaint, and Exhibits. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous #45 , Response in Opposition to Motion, #57 , Motion to Seal Document,, (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL), #50 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 69 Reply in Support of Motion for an Interim Protective Order to Motion for Protective Order #6 . Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 68 Declaration of Seth M. Sproul in Support of Defendant Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion to Stay Ruling on Columbia's Motion for an Interim Protective Order, or in the Alternative for an Extension of Time. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion, #67 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Rothauge, Renee) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 16, 2019 Filing 67 Reply Defendant Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion to Stay Ruling on Columbia's Motion for an Interim Protective Order, or in the Alternative for an Extension of Time, to Motion for Stay Ruling on Plaintiff Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.s Motion for an Interim Protective Order, or in the Alternative for an Extension of Time #29 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Rothauge, Renee) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 15, 2019 Filing 66 Response in Opposition Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.'s Limited Response to Defendants Wendy Carey's and Robert Murphy's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Sufficient Process to Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal), for Lack of Venue, for Insufficient Service and for Failure to State a Claim #59 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 65 Declaration of Seth M. Sproul in Support of Seirus' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal), for Lack of Venue, and for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction #64 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 64 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal), for Lack of Venue, and for Failure to State a Claim Upon Which Relief Can Be Granted. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 63 Declaration of Bob Murphy in Support of Seirus' Motion to Dismiss for No Personal Jurisdiction. Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Robert (Bob) Murphy. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction #59 .) (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 62 Declaration of Wendy Carey in Support of Seirus' Motion to Dismiss for No Personal Jurisdiction. Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Robert (Bob) Murphy. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction #59 .) (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 61 Declaration of Michael Carey in Support of Seirus' Motion to Dismiss for no Personal Jurisdiction. Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Robert (Bob) Murphy. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction #59 .) (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 60 Declaration of Seth M. Sproul in support of Seirus Individuals' Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal), for Lack of Venue, for Insufficient Service and for Failure to State a Claim. Filed by Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Robert (Bob) Murphy. (Related document(s): Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction #59 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3) (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 12, 2019 Filing 59 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal), for Lack of Venue, for Insufficient Service and for Failure to State a Claim. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Michael J. Carey, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Wendy M. Carey. (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 58 Declaration of Nika Aldrich in Support of Columbia's Response in Opposition to Defendant Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.'s Motion to Seal the Complaint, Amended Complaint, and Exhibits. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion, #57 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 57 Response in Opposition to Defendant Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.'s to Corrected Motion to Seal the Complaint, Amended Complaint, and Exhibits #45 Oral Argument requested. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 9, 2019 Filing 56 Withdrawal of Motion to Strike, #52 Columbia Sportswear's Withdrawal of Motion to Strike, or in the Alternative, to File an Over-Length Response Brief Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion to Strike, #52 .) (Aldrich, Nicholas) Modified on 4/11/2019 to correct event/text (jn). Modified on 4/18/2019 (mja). [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 2, 2019 Filing 55 Notice of Appearance of Harry B. Wilson appearing on behalf of Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc. Filed by on behalf of Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Wilson, Harry) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
April 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER - The Court will hear oral argument on all pending motions on Monday, April 29, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 15B. To the extent that a pending motion has not yet been fully briefed, the non-moving party may file a response (if one has not yet been filed) not later than April 9, not to exceed 20 pages. To the extent that a moving party desires to file a reply, that party may file a reply not later than April 16, not to exceed 15 pages. All responses and replies filed pursuant to this Order may be provisionally filed under seal. This Order supersedes all filing deadlines, permitted filings, and page limits provided by the Local Rules. In addition, not later than April 23, the parties (after having conferred in good faith) shall jointly file a single document that succinctly states what motions, issues, and questions the parties believe need resolution by the Court and should be discussed during the hearing on April 29. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 53 Declaration of Erin Forbes in Support of Columbia's Motion to Strike. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion to Strike, #52 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 52 Motion to Strike or in the Alternative, to File an Over-Length Response Brief Corrected Motion to Seal the Complaint, Amended Complaint, and Exhibits #45 . Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) Modified on 4/18/2019 (mja). [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 48 Response in Opposition to Defendant Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.'s to Motion to File Documents Under Seal #31 . Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 47 Declaration of Nika Aldrich in Support of Columbia's Response in Opposition to Defendant Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.'s Motion to Stay Ruling on Columbia's Motion for an Interim Protective Order, or in the Alternative for an Extension of Time. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion, #46 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-L) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 28, 2019 Filing 46 Response in Opposition to Motion for Stay Ruling on Plaintiff Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.s Motion for an Interim Protective Order, or in the Alternative for an Extension of Time #29 . Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 51 Declaration of Scott DeNike in Support of Defendant's Motion to Seal the Complaint, Amended Complaint, and Exhibits. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc. (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL). (sb) (Filed Under Seal Per Order #42 ). [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 50 Motion to File Documents Under Seal Re Seirus' Motion to Seal the Complaint, Amended Complaint, and Exhibits. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc. (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL). Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc. (sb) (Filed Under Seal Per Order #42 ). [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 49 Exhibits M, P, S, T, and U re: Declaration of Seth M. Sproul #44 . (DOCUMENT FILED UNDER SEAL) Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit M, #2 Exhibit P, #3 Exhibit S, #4 Exhibit T, #5 Exhibit U) (Filed Under Seal Per Order #42 ). Modified on 3/28/2019 to add Docket Text (sb). [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 27, 2019 Filing 45 Corrected Motion to Seal the Complaint, Amended Complaint, and Exhibits. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Rothauge, Renee) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 44 Declaration of Seth M. Sproul . Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Related document(s): Response in Opposition to Motion #43 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E) (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 25, 2019 Filing 43 Response in Opposition to Motion for Protective Order #6 . Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Sproul, Seth) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER - Defendant Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.'s Motion to File Documents Under Seal Re: Seirus' Motion to Seal Complaint, Amended Complaint, and Exhibits (ECF #40 ) is GRANTED. Signed on 3/25/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 41 Declaration of Seth M. Sproul in Support of Defendant's Motion to File Documents Under Seal Re Seirus' Motion to Seal the Complaint, Amended Complaint, and Exhibits. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous #40 .) (Rothauge, Renee) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 40 Motion to File Documents Under Seal Re Seirus' Motion to Seal the Complaint, Amended Complaint, and Exhibits. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rothauge, Renee)[Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 39 Declaration of Seth M. Sproul in Support of Defendant's Motion to Seal the Complaint, Amended Complaint, and Exhibits. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous #37 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X) (Rothauge, Renee) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 38 Declaration of Scott DeNike in Support of Defendant's Motion to Seal the Complaint, Amended Complaint, and Exhibits. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous #37 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Rothauge, Renee) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 37 Motion to Seal the Complaint, Amended Complaint, and Exhibits. Oral Argument requested. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Rothauge, Renee) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 36 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Tucker N. Terhufen (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: tnterhufen. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Tucker N. Terhufen for Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5779919 issued. Signed on 3/20/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 19, 2019 Filing 34 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tucker N. Terhufen . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5779919. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Rothauge, Renee) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 33 Declaration of Seth M. Sproul in Support of Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion - Miscellaneous #31 .) (Rothauge, Renee) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 32 Proposed Form of Order Submitted - Granting Motion to File Under Seal. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Rothauge, Renee) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 31 Motion to File Documents Under Seal. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Rothauge, Renee) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 30 Declaration of Seth M. Sproul . Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion for Stay, #29 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Rothauge, Renee) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 14, 2019 Filing 29 Motion for Stay Ruling on Plaintiff Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.s Motion for an Interim Protective Order, or in the Alternative for an Extension of Time. Oral Argument requested.Expedited Hearing requested. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Rothauge, Renee) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER - Defendants Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc., Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, and Robert (Bob) Murphy's Motion for Extension of Time to Answer (ECF #27 ) is GRANTED. Answer or other responsive pleading is due by 4/15/2019. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 27 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Amended Complaint #26 . Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Rothauge, Renee) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 28, 2019 Filing 26 First Amended Complaint for Fraud, Racketeering, Abuse of Process, and Civil Conspiracy. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc. against All Defendants. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 25 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction regarding the Affidavits of Service (#'s #21 , #22 , #23 , & #24 ) filed on 2/20/19. The service date entered in these entries at filing were incorrect. The service date was 2/19/19, not 2/20/19. The Clerk's Office has modified the docket text of these entries to reflect the correct service date. (eo) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 24 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #4 upon Robert (Bob) Murphy served on 2/19/2019 Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) Modified service date on 2/20/2019. (eo) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 23 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #4 upon Wendy M. Carey served on 2/19/2019 Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) Modified service date on 2/20/2019. (eo) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 22 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #4 upon Michael J. Carey served on 2/19/2019 Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) Modified service date on 2/20/2019. (eo) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 20, 2019 Filing 21 Affidavit of Service of Summons Issued, #4 upon Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc. served on 2/19/2019 Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) Modified service date on 2/20/2019. (eo) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 20 MINUTES OF TELEPHONE CONFERENCE: Order - Any Defendant who files an appearance in this case shall also file a response to Plaintiff's Motion for Interim Protective Order (ECF #6 ) within 14 days of their appearance. Nicholas F. Aldrich, Jr, David W. Axelrod, and Erin Forbes present as counsel for Plaintiff. Christopher S. Marchese, Oliver J. Richards, Seth M. Sproul, and Renee Rothauge present as counsel for Defendant Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc., by Special Appearance. Scott DeNike Present as outside counsel for Defendant Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc. Court Reporter: Dennis Apodaca. Judge Michael H. Simon presiding. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 19 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Oliver J. Ricahrds (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: ojrichards. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Oliver J. Richards for Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-573806 issued. Signed on 2/14/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 17 Notification of CM/ECF Account for Seth M. Sproul (Pro Hac Vice admission). Your login is: smsproul. Go to #the CM/ECF login page to set your password. (ecp) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Seth M. Sproul for Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5738054 issued. Signed on 2/14/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Granting Application for Special Admission Pro Hac Vice of Christopher S. Marchese for Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. Application Fee in amount of $300 collected. Receipt No. 0979-5738021 issued. Signed on 2/14/2019 by Judge Michael H. Simon. (ecp) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 14, 2019 Filing 14 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction regarding #10 Attorney Appearance, #12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. At the time of docketing the individual defendants, Michael Carey, Wendy Carey, and Robert (Bob) Murphy), were selected as filers and represented by Ms. Rothauge. Ms. Rothauge only represents defendant Serius Innovative Accessories. The docket text and the attached PDF documents are corrected to reflect the correct filers and representation. A corrected PDF has been uploaded and has replaced the incorrect attachment. The Notice of Electronic Filing will be regenerated to all parties. (cw) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 13 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Oliver J. Richards . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5738065. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Rothauge, Renee) (Main Document 13 replaced on 2/14/2019) (cw). Modified on 2/14/2019 to remove names of individual defendants who are not related to this filing (cw). [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Seth M. Sproul . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5738054. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Rothauge, Renee) (Main Document 12 replaced on 2/14/2019) (cw). Modified on 2/14/2019 to remove names of individual defendants who are not related to this filing (cw). [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Christopher S. Marchese . Filing fee in the amount of $300 collected; Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5738021. Filed by Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Rothauge, Renee) (Main Document 11 replaced on 2/14/2019) (cw). Modified on 2/14/2019 to remove names of individual defendants who are not related to this filing (cw). [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 13, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance of Renee E. Rothauge appearing on behalf of Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc. Filed by on behalf of Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc.. (Rothauge, Renee) Modified on 2/14/2019 to correct representation by removing individual defendants (cw). (Main Document 10 replaced on 2/14/2019) (cw). [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 8, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Entry of Order Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Scheduling Order by Judge Michael H. Simon. Order - Setting a Telephone Status Conference for 2/14/2019 at 01:30PM. The Court will provide the parties with a call-in number by separate sealed entry. Ordered by Judge Michael H. Simon. (mja) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 7 Declaration of Nika Aldrich in Support of Plaintiff Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.'s Motion for an Interim Protective Order. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion for Protective Order #6 .) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 7, 2019 Filing 6 Motion for Protective Order . Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You to Judge Michael H. Simon. (eo) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued Electronically as to Michael J. Carey, Wendy M. Carey, Kyung-Chan Go, Robert (Bob) Murphy, Man-Sik (Paul) Park, Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc., Ventex Co., Ltd.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (jtj) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
February 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 6/4/2019. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/5/2019. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Youlee Yim You. (jtj) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.. (Aldrich, Nicholas) [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]
January 29, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint. for Fraud, Racketeering, Abuse of Process and Civil Conspiracy Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-5718143 Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc. against All Defendants (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Civil Cover Sheet, #13 Proposed Summons Proposed Summonses). (Aldrich, Nicholas) Modified on 7/24/2019 (mja). [Transferred from Oregon on 4/14/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc. v. Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Columbia Sportswear North America, Inc.
Represented By: Erin Forbes
Represented By: Jason A. Wrubleski
Represented By: Nicholas F. Aldrich, Jr.
Represented By: David W. Axelrod
Represented By: Scott D. Eads
Represented By: Jason A. Wrubleski (CA Inactive)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seirus Innovative Accessories, Inc
Represented By: Tucker Nephi Terhufen
Represented By: John W Thornburgh
Represented By: Renee E. Rothauge
Represented By: Oliver J. Richards
Represented By: Seth M Sproul
Represented By: Paul S. Bierly
Represented By: Christopher S. Marchese
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ventex Co., Ltd.
Represented By: Kurt M. Rylander
Represented By: Mark E. Beatty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Man-Sik (Paul) Park
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Denike
Represented By: Oliver J. Richards
Represented By: John W Thornburgh
Represented By: Renee E. Rothauge
Represented By: Seth M Sproul
Represented By: Paul S. Bierly
Represented By: Tucker Nephi Terhufen
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kyung-Chan Go
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert (Bob) Murphy
Represented By: Tucker Nephi Terhufen
Represented By: John W Thornburgh
Represented By: Renee E. Rothauge
Represented By: Oliver J. Richards
Represented By: Seth M Sproul
Represented By: Paul S. Bierly
Represented By: Christopher S. Marchese
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy M. Carey
Represented By: Tucker Nephi Terhufen
Represented By: John W Thornburgh
Represented By: Renee E. Rothauge
Represented By: Oliver J. Richards
Represented By: Seth M Sproul
Represented By: Paul S. Bierly
Represented By: Christopher S. Marchese
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael J Carey
Represented By: Tucker Nephi Terhufen
Represented By: John W Thornburgh
Represented By: Renee E. Rothauge
Represented By: Oliver J. Richards
Represented By: Seth M Sproul
Represented By: Paul S. Bierly
Represented By: Christopher S. Marchese
Represented By: Harry B. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Troutman Sanders
Represented By: Jaime Theriot
Represented By: Roman D. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?