Chambers v. San Diego Housing Commission et al
Plaintiff: Diana Cecelia Chambers
Defendant: San Diego Housing Commission, City of San Diego and Does 1 Through 100
Case Number: 3:2020cv00715
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Mitchell D Dembin
Referring Judge: Thomas J Whelan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accommodations
Cause of Action: 42:3601
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2020 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Continue the June 30, 2020 Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, Case Management Conference and Rule 26 Deadlines by City of San Diego. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Manfre, Lucy) (jdt).
May 22, 2020 Filing 12 REPLY TO RESPONSE re #6 Motion to Dismiss filed by City of San Diego. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Manfre, Lucy). QC email: wrong event selected. Edited docket text and link. No refile (jdt).
May 15, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Diana Cecelia Chambers. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice)(Selden, Lynde) (jdt).
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying without prejudice the parties' Joint Motion to Continue the Early Neutral Evaluation/Case Management Conference, #9 . The ENE/CMC is currently scheduled for June 30, 2020. The Court finds the motion premature. The parties may renew their motion closer to the ENE/CMC date if necessary. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 05/07/2020. (no document attached) (atk)
May 6, 2020 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Continue the June 30, 2020 Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, Case Management Conference and Rule 26 Deadlines by City of San Diego. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Manfre, Lucy) (jdt).
April 28, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by San Diego Housing Commission re #5 Answer to Complaint (Mason, Joel). QC email: missing title page (jdt).
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 6/30/2020 at 9:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin. Immediately following the ENE, if no settlement is reached, the Case Management Conference will occur. A Joint Discovery Plan is due 6/23/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin on 4/27/2020. (jdt)
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by City of San Diego. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Proof of Service)(Manfre, Lucy)Attorney Lucy Ann Manfre added to party City of San Diego(pty:dft) (jdt).
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by San Diego Housing Commission.(Mason, Joel) (jdt).
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by San Diego Housing Commission re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court (Mason, Joel) (jdt).
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by San Diego Housing Commission re #1 Notice of Removal, Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal and State Court Filings (Mason, Joel) (jdt).
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Filing of Notice of Removal in State Court by San Diego Housing Commission re #1 Notice of Removal, (Mason, Joel) (jdt).
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from San Diego Superior Court, case number 37-2020-00002938-CU-CR-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13747467.), filed by San Diego Housing Commission. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Amended Complaint)The new case number is 3:20-cv-715-W-MDD. Judge Thomas J. Whelan and Magistrate Judge Mitchell D. Dembin are assigned to the case.(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chambers v. San Diego Housing Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego Housing Commission
Represented By: Joel B. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of San Diego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 Through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Cecelia Chambers
Represented By: Lynde Selden, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?