Cretu v. Textron Aviation Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Cretu
Defendant: Van Bortel Aircraft, Inc., Does 1 through 20, Textron Aviation Inc., Honeywell International Inc., Bendix Corporation and Cessna Aircraft Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00729
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Larry Alan Burns
Referring Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Airplane Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1446al
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. #13 ). This action is dismissed without prejudice as to all parties. The hearings currently set for 6/29/2020 are vacated. All other pending motions are denied without prejudice as moot. The clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 5/13/2020. (jdt) (sjt).
May 13, 2020 Filing 13 Joint MOTION to Dismiss Action by Van Bortel Aircraft, Inc.. (Worthe, Todd) (jdt).
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Continuing Hearings. The hearings on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, (Dkts. #6 , #8 , #10 ), are continued to 6/29/2020 at 11:30 a.m. The briefing schedule on those motions is modified as follows: Plaintiff shall file her opposition(s) no later than 5/26/2020, and Defendants shall file their replies, if any, no later than 6/8/2020. Signed by Chief Judge Larry Alan Burns on 4/29/2020. (jdt)
April 22, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Textron Aviation Inc. (Saldana, Manuel) (jdt).
April 22, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Textron Aviation Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Affidavit Matthew D. Flesher, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2)(Saldana, Manuel) (jdt).
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honeywell International Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kagan, Joseph). QC email: s/ by nonregistered user. No refile (jdt).
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction (Personal) by Honeywell International Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Bill Gill ISO Motion, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit A to Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Proof of Service)(Kagan, Joseph), QC email: s/ by nonregistered user. No refile (jdt).
April 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Consent to Removal by Textron Aviation Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Saldana, Manuel)Attorney Manuel Saldana added to party Textron Aviation Inc.(pty:dft) (jdt).
April 16, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Van Bortel Aircraft, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Todd C. Worthe, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Todd C. Worthe, #3 Declaration of Howard G. Van Bortel, #4 Exhibit 1 to the Declaration of Howard G. Van Bortel, #5 Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Howard G. Van Bortel)(Worthe, Todd) (jdt).
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Joinder by Honeywell International Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, and Consent (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Kagan, Joseph). QC email to file NOA. Updated docket to add attorney Joseph Kagan pty:dft Honeywell International Inc. (jdt).
April 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Van Bortel Aircraft, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Worthe, Todd) (jdt).
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Van Bortel Aircraft, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Worthe, Todd) (jdt).
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Van Bortel Aircraft, Inc.. (Worthe, Todd) (jdt).
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California County of San Diego, case number 37-2020-00003509-CU-PL-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13753618.), filed by Van Bortel Aircraft, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Complaint, #3 Exhibit)The new case number is 3:20-cv-729-LAB-BGS. Judge Larry Alan Burns and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case.(vxc) (dsn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cretu v. Textron Aviation Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Van Bortel Aircraft, Inc.
Represented By: Todd C. Worthe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Textron Aviation Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bendix Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cessna Aircraft Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Cretu
Represented By: Stuart R. Fraenkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?