Alcantara et al v. Archambeault et al
Petitioner: Yasmani Osorio Reyna, Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara, Mary Doe, Flor Calderon Maria Lopez and Maria Flor Calderon Lopez
Respondent: Jesus Reyna, Chad Wolf, Sixto Marrero, James Dobson, Matthew T. Albence, Gregory J. Archambeault, Christopher J. LaRose and Warden LaRose
Case Number: 3:2020cv00756
Filed: April 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Referring Judge: Allison H Goddard
2 Judge: Dana M Sabraw
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions: Civil Detainee: Conditions of Confinement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 fd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2020 Filing 94 NOTICE Regarding Exhibit Attachment by Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara, Mary Doe, Maria Flor Calderon Lopez, Yasmani Osorio Reyna re #84 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal attaching Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support (Hemann, John)
June 15, 2020 Filing 93 NOTICE of Appearance by Betsey Boutelle on behalf of Matthew T. Albence, Gregory J. Archambeault, James Dobson, Jesus Reyna, Chad Wolf (Boutelle, Betsey)Attorney Betsey Boutelle added to party Matthew T. Albence(pty:res), Attorney Betsey Boutelle added to party Gregory J. Archambeault(pty:res), Attorney Betsey Boutelle added to party James Dobson(pty:res), Attorney Betsey Boutelle added to party Jesus Reyna(pty:res), Attorney Betsey Boutelle added to party Chad Wolf(pty:res) (jms).
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Alexandra Eber, re #90 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/15/2020.(rmc)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Denying #87 Ex Parte Application to Shorten Time. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/15/2020. (aef)
June 15, 2020 Filing 90 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice, No payment Submitted. (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Eber, Alexandra) (rmc).
June 15, 2020 Filing 89 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14010133.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Eber, Alexandra) QC mail sent on 6/15/2020 re missing signature, instructed to re-file without re-paying (rmc).
June 15, 2020 Filing 88 RESPONSE in Opposition re #87 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time for briefing and hearing of Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Ex Parte Application for More Definite Statement and for Bifurcation filed by Matthew T. Albence, Gregory J. Archambeault, James Dobson, Jesus Reyna, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Mr. Sixto Marrero)(Bettwy, Samuel) (aef).
June 12, 2020 Filing 87 Ex Parte MOTION to Shorten Time for briefing and hearing of Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara, Mary Doe, Maria Flor Calderon Lopez, Yasmani Osorio Reyna. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Hemann)(Hemann, John) (aef).
June 12, 2020 Filing 86 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara, Mary Doe, Maria Flor Calderon Lopez, Yasmani Osorio Reyna. (Hemann, John) (aef).
June 12, 2020 Filing 85 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #84 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Hemann, John)(aef).
June 12, 2020 Filing 84 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Hemann, John) (aef).
June 12, 2020 Filing 83 Emergency MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and Writ of Habeas Corpus by Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara, Mary Doe, Maria Flor Calderon Lopez, Yasmani Osorio Reyna. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of B.G., #3 Declaration of D.M., #4 Declaration of C.M., #5 Declaration of M. Portillo Gonzalez, #6 Declaration of E. Lopez, Supplemental, #7 Declaration of J. Amon, Second Supplemental, #8 Declaration of R. Greinfinger, #9 Declaration of K. Watkins)(Hemann, John) (aef).
June 10, 2020 Filing 82 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander Galicki on behalf of Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara, Mary Doe, Maria Flor Calderon Lopez, Yasmani Osorio Reyna (Galicki, Alexander)Attorney Alexander Galicki added to party Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara(pty:pet), Attorney Alexander Galicki added to party Mary Doe(pty:pet), Attorney Alexander Galicki added to party Maria Flor Calderon Lopez(pty:pet), Attorney Alexander Galicki added to party Yasmani Osorio Reyna(pty:pet)(jms).
June 10, 2020 Filing 81 NOTICE of Appearance by Eleanor Barczak on behalf of Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara, Mary Doe, Maria Flor Calderon Lopez, Yasmani Osorio Reyna (Barczak, Eleanor)Attorney Eleanor Barczak added to party Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara(pty:pet), Attorney Eleanor Barczak added to party Mary Doe(pty:pet), Attorney Eleanor Barczak added to party Maria Flor Calderon Lopez(pty:pet), Attorney Eleanor Barczak added to party Yasmani Osorio Reyna(pty:pet) (jms).
June 2, 2020 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance of Counsel by John J. Rice on behalf of Sixto Marrero (Rice, John)Attorney John J. Rice added to party Sixto Marrero(pty:res) (jms).
June 1, 2020 Filing 79 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yasmani Osorio Reyna, Mary Doe, Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara, Maria Flor Calderon Lopez. Sixto Marrero served. (Langarica, Monika) (jms).
May 29, 2020 Filing 78 NOTICE of Appearance by John H. Hemann on behalf of Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara, Mary Doe, Maria Flor Calderon Lopez, Yasmani Osorio Reyna (Hemann, John)Attorney John H. Hemann added to party Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara(pty:pet), Attorney John H. Hemann added to party Mary Doe(pty:pet), Attorney John H. Hemann added to party Maria Flor Calderon Lopez(pty:pet), Attorney John H. Hemann added to party Yasmani Osorio Reyna(pty:pet) (aef).
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER Denying Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction. The Court denies Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction. Should circumstances change, Plaintiffs are free to seek relief from the Court. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/26/2020.(aef)
May 22, 2020 Filing 76 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Motion Hearing held on 5/22/2020. All parties appeared telephonically. Court to issue order. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Monika Langarica, Bardis Vakili). (Defendant Attorney Samuel Bettwy, Rebecca Church, Rachel Love, Daniel Struck). (no document attached) (jak)
May 19, 2020 Filing 75 Ex Parte MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages , Unopposed by Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara, Mary Doe, Maria Flor Calderon Lopez, Yasmani Osorio Reyna. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Monika Langarica)(Langarica, Monika) (jms).
May 19, 2020 Filing 74 REPLY - Other re #69 Response to Supplemental Briefing,, #70 Response - Other, Plaintiff-Petitioners' Reply to Defendants' Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara, Mary Doe, Maria Flor Calderon Lopez, Yasmani Osorio Reyna. (Langarica, Monika)(jms).
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER Following Telephonic Status Conference. A telephonic status conference was held on May 15, 2020. On or before 10:30 a.m. on May 21, 2020, Defendants shall submit to the Court, in camera, an updated spreadsheet of the medically vulnerable ICE detainees in OMDC. The May 22, 2020 hearing shall be held at 11:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/15/2020.(aef)
May 15, 2020 Filing 72 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #71 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Bettwy, Samuel) (anh).
May 15, 2020 Filing 71 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Bettwy, Samuel) (anh).
May 15, 2020 Filing 70 RESPONSE re #60 Supplemental Briefing, (re motion for preliminary injunction) filed by Matthew T. Albence, Gregory J. Archambeault, James Dobson, Sixto Marrero, Jesus Reyna, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dr. Malakhova, #2 Declaration Dr. Farabaugh, #3 Declaration AOIC Beckhelm)(Bettwy, Samuel)(jms).
May 15, 2020 Filing 69 RESPONSE TO SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Christopher J. LaRose re #60 Supplemental Briefing, Re: Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Third Declaration of LaRose, #2 Exhibit Index - Attachment 1, #3 Exhibit Attachment 2 - part 1, #4 Exhibit Attachment 2 - part 2, #5 Exhibit Attachment 2 - part 3, #6 Exhibit Attachment 2 - part 4, #7 Exhibit Attachments 3 - 7, #8 Declaration Third Declaration of Ivens, #9 Proof of Service)(Struck, Daniel)(jms).
May 15, 2020 Filing 68 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 5/15/2020. All parties appeared telephonically. Court to issue order. Motion Hearing set for 5/22/2020 is reset to 11:00 AM (time change only). (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Bardis Vakili, Monika Langarica). (Defendant Attorney Sammuel Bettwy, Rebecca Church, Nicholas Acedo, Jacob Lee, Rachel Love). (no document attached) (jak)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 ORDER Following Telephonic Status Conference. A telephonic status conference was held on May 8, 2020. A further telephonic status conference shall be held on May 15, 2020, at 12:00 noon. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/15/2020.(aef)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER. This Court GRANTS the joint motion and orders that Defendants shall have until August 10, 2020, to respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint and that Defendants' waiver of service of process has the same effect as a waiver filed pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d)(4). Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/13/2020. (aef)
May 13, 2020 Filing 65 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #64 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (With attachments)(Grano, Kimberly) (anh).
May 13, 2020 Filing 64 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Grano, Kimberly) (anh).
May 13, 2020 Filing 63 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Matthew T. Albence, Gregory J. Archambeault, James Dobson, Sixto Marrero, Jesus Reyna, Chad Wolf. (Bettwy, Samuel)Attorney Samuel William Bettwy added to party Sixto Marrero(pty:res)(aef).
May 12, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Status Conference) held on 5/8/2020 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 6/2/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/12/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/10/2020. (akr)
May 12, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Status Conference) held on 5/4/2020 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 6/2/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/12/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/10/2020. (akr)
May 11, 2020 Filing 60 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Petitioners Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara, Mary Doe, Maria Flor Calderon Lopez, Yasmani Osorio Reyna in support of Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert L. Cohen M.D., #2 Declaration of Bardis Vakili)(Langarica, Monika) (jms).
May 8, 2020 Filing 59 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jms)
May 8, 2020 Filing 58 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 5/8/2020. All parties appeared telephonically. ( Further Status Conference set for 5/15/2020 12:00 PM in Courtroom 13A before Judge Dana M. Sabraw.)(Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Monika Langarica, Bardis Vakili). (Defendant Attorney Samuel Bettwy, Rebecca Church, Nicholas Acedo, Jacob Lee, Rachel Love, Daniel Struck). (Dr. Sherri Malakhava, Jamison Matuszewski, Kelley Beckhelm).(no document attached) (jak)
May 7, 2020 Filing 57 NOTICE of Supplemental Facts by Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara, Mary Doe, Maria Flor Calderon Lopez, Yasmani Osorio Reyna (Langarica, Monika) (aef).
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Re: Protective Order. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/6/2020.(aef)
May 6, 2020 Filing 55 REPLY to Response to Motion re #51 Ex Parte MOTION re #50 Order,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, #47 Order on Motion for Protective Order for Confirmation of Protective Order, #52 Ex Parte MOTION re #51 Ex Parte MOTION re #50 Order,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, #47 Order on Motion for Protective Order for Confirmation of Protective Order . Plaintiff-Petitioners' Application to Modify Ma (and Response to #52 ) filed by Matthew T. Albence, Gregory J. Archambeault, James Dobson, Jesus Reyna, Chad Wolf. (Bettwy, Samuel) (aef).
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part #49 Warden Larose's Emergency Ex Parte Motion for Reconsideration. The Court grants in part and denies in part Warden Larose's emergency ex parte motion for reconsideration. To the extent Plaintiffs wish to proceed with a preliminary injunction, they shall submit their supplement brief on or before May 11, 2020. Defendants may file any opposition briefs on or before May 15, 2020, and Plaintiffs may file their reply on or before May 19, 2020. That request shall be heard on May 22, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/6/2020. (aef)
May 5, 2020 Filing 53 RESPONSE in Opposition re #49 Ex Parte MOTION for Reconsideration re #41 Order Granting Plaintiff-Petitioners' Emergency Ex Parte Motion for Subclass-Wide Temporary Restraining Order filed by Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara. (Langarica, Monika) (aef).
May 5, 2020 Filing 52 Ex Parte MOTION re #51 Ex Parte MOTION re #50 Order,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, #47 Order on Motion for Protective Order for Confirmation of Protective Order . Plaintiff-Petitioners' Application to Modify May 4 Protective Order and Opposition to Defendants' Ex Parte Application for Confirmation of Protective Order by Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara, Mary Doe, Maria Flor Calderon Lopez, Yasmani Osorio Reyna. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of Bardis Vakili)(Vakili, Bardis) (aef).
May 5, 2020 Filing 51 Ex Parte MOTION re #50 Order,, Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings, #47 Order on Motion for Protective Order for Confirmation of Protective Order by Matthew T. Albence, Gregory J. Archambeault, James Dobson, Jesus Reyna, Chad Wolf. (Church, Rebecca) (aef).
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER Following Telephonic Status Conference. A telephonic status conference was held on May 4, 2020. The deadline for Defendants' opposition brief on the remaining class certification issues is continued to May 15, 2020. Plaintiffs' reply brief shall be filed on or before May 19, 2020. The hearing shall remain as scheduled on May 22, 2020. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/4/2020.(aef)
May 4, 2020 Filing 49 Ex Parte MOTION for Reconsideration re #41 Order Granting Plaintiff-Petitioners' Emergency Ex Parte Motion for Subclass-Wide Temporary Restraining Order by Christopher J. LaRose. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel P. Struck, #2 Declaration (Supplemental) of K. Ivens, M.D., F.A.C.C.P., #3 Declaration (Supplemental) of Warden C. LaRose, #4 Exhibit Index - Supplemental LaRose Declaration, #5 Exhibit 1 - Part 1, #6 Exhibit 1 - Part 2, #7 Exhibit 1 - Part 3, #8 Exhibit 1 - Part 4, #9 Exhibit 1 - Part 5, #10 Exhibit 2-4, #11 Exhibit 5, #12 Exhibit 6, #13 Exhibit 7, #14 Exhibit 8-9, #15 Exhibit 10-12, #16 Proof of Service)(Struck, Daniel)
May 4, 2020 Filing 48 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 5/4/2020. All parties appeared telephonically. Court to issue order. (Further Status Conference set for 5/8/2020 12:00 PM in Courtroom 13A before Judge Dana M. Sabraw.)(Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Bardis Vakili, Monika Langarica). (Defendant Attorney Samuel Bettwy, Rebecca Church, Daniel Struck, Nicholas Acedo, Jacob Lee, Rachel Love). (Dr. Sheri Malakhavo, Jamison Matuszewski, Kelley Beckhelm).(no document attached) (jak)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER Granting #42 Ex Parte Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/4/2020. (aef)
May 4, 2020 Filing 46 RESPONSE in Opposition re #42 Ex Parte MOTION for Protective Order filed by Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara, Mary Doe, Maria Flor Calderon Lopez, Yasmani Osorio Reyna. (Vakili, Bardis) (aef).
May 4, 2020 Filing 45 Ex Parte MOTION to Amend/Correct #38 Order on Motion for TRO by Matthew T. Albence, Gregory J. Archambeault, James Dobson, Jesus Reyna, Chad Wolf. (Church, Rebecca)Attorney Rebecca Grace Church added to party Matthew T. Albence(pty:res), Attorney Rebecca Grace Church added to party Gregory J. Archambeault(pty:res), Attorney Rebecca Grace Church added to party James Dobson(pty:res), Attorney Rebecca Grace Church added to party Jesus Reyna(pty:res), Attorney Rebecca Grace Church added to party Chad Wolf(pty:res) (aef).
May 4, 2020 Filing 44 NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT (Telephonic Status Conference) held on 4/30/2020 before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Lee Ann Pence. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER or the Court Reporter/Transcriber. If redaction is necessary, parties have seven calendar days from the file date of the Transcript to E-File the Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. The following deadlines would also apply if requesting redaction: Redaction Request Statement due to Court Reporter/Transcriber 5/26/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/4/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/3/2020. (akr)
May 4, 2020 Filing 43 NOTICE of Lodgment by Matthew T. Albence, Gregory J. Archambeault, James Dobson, Jesus Reyna, Chad Wolf (Attachments: #1 Exhibit SD Cnty Health Officer Order 4-7-20, #2 Exhibit SD Cnty Health Officer Order 4-17-20)(Bettwy, Samuel)(aef).
May 4, 2020 Filing 42 Ex Parte MOTION for Protective Order by Matthew T. Albence, Gregory J. Archambeault, James Dobson, Jesus Reyna, Chad Wolf. (Bettwy, Samuel) (aef).
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER (1) Granting in Part Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification and (2) Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Subclass-Wide Emergency Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 5/1/2020.(aef)
May 1, 2020 Filing 40 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #39 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Grano, Kimberly) (anh).
May 1, 2020 Filing 39 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Grano, Kimberly) (anh).
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER Granting #2 Plaintiff-Petitioners' Emergency Ex Parte Motion for Subclass-Wide Temporary Restraining Order. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 4/30/2020. (aef)
April 30, 2020 Filing 37 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Status Conference held on 4/30/2020. All parties appeared telephonically. Court to issue order. Further Status Conference set for 5/4/2020 12:00 PM in Courtroom 13A before Judge Dana M. Sabraw.(Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Petitioner Attorney Bardis Vakili, Monika Langarica). (Respondent Attorney Samuel Bettwy, Rebecca Church, Daniel Struck, Nicholas Acedo, Jacob Lee Rachel Love). (Dr. Sherri Malakavo, Acting Director Otay Mesa Detention Center).(no document attached) (jak)
April 29, 2020 Filing 36 RESPONSE re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, #34 Supplemental Briefing filed by Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Jacqueline Ramos)(Langarica, Monika) (aef).
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference for 4/30/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Dana M. Sabraw. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 4/29/2020.(sjt)
April 29, 2020 Filing 34 SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Respondent Christopher J. LaRose re #27 Response in Opposition to Motion for Class Certification Re: Otay Mesa Subclass. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Struck, Daniel) (aef).
April 28, 2020 Filing 33 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Dana M. Sabraw: Motion Hearing held on 4/28/2020 re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Mary Doe, Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara, Maria Flor Calderon Lopez, Yasmani Osorio Reyna. All counsel appeared telephonically. (Court Reporter/ECR Lee Ann Pence). (Plaintiff Attorney Bardis Vakili, Monika Langarica). (Defendant Attorney Samuel Bettwy, Rebecca Church). (For Warden LaRose: Dan Struck, Nicholas Acevedo, Jacob Lee, Rachel Love).(no document attached) (jak)
April 28, 2020 Filing 32 SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara, Mary Doe, Maria Flor Calderon Lopez, Yasmani Osorio Reyna re #31 Reply to Response to Motion Supplemental Declaration of Dr. Joseph J. Amon in suport of Reply to Defendants' Response to Emergency Motion for TRO. (Langarica, Monika) (jms).
April 28, 2020 Filing 31 REPLY to Response to Motion re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara, Mary Doe, Maria Flor Calderon Lopez, Yasmani Osorio Reyna. (Langarica, Monika) (jms).
April 27, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE of Joinder by Christopher J. LaRose re #25 Sealed Lodged Proposed Document, #23 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Struck, Daniel) (jms).
April 27, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE of Joinder by Matthew T. Albence, Gregory J. Archambeault, James Dobson, Jesus Reyna, Chad Wolf re #27 Response in Opposition to Motion, #26 Response in Opposition to Motion, (Church, Rebecca) (jms).
April 27, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Appearance of Matthew M. Mahoney as Counsel of Record for Respondent Warden LaRose by Matthew Miguel Mahoney on behalf of Warden LaRose (Mahoney, Matthew)Attorney Matthew Miguel Mahoney added to party Warden LaRose(pty:res) (jms).
April 27, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order - Motion for Class Certification Re: Otay Mesa Subclass filed by Christopher J. LaRose. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Struck, Daniel) (aef).
April 27, 2020 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Christopher J. LaRose. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of LaRose (with Index and Attachments 01-14 (Part 1), #2 Attachments 15-24 to Declaration of LaRose (Part 2), #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of K. Ivens (with Index and Attachments 01-02), #4 Certificate of Service)(Struck, Daniel) (aef).
April 27, 2020 Filing 25 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #24 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Bettwy, Samuel) (anh).
April 27, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (Bettwy, Samuel) (anh).
April 27, 2020 Filing 23 RESPONSE in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Matthew T. Albence, Gregory J. Archambeault, James Dobson, Jesus Reyna, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Declaration Kelley Beckhelm, #3 Declaration Dr. Philip Farabaugh)(Bettwy, Samuel) (jms).
April 24, 2020 Filing 22 PRO HAC APPROVED: Nicholas D. Acedo appearing for Respondent Christopher J. LaRose (no document attached) (rmc)
April 24, 2020 Filing 21 PRO HAC APPROVED: Jacob Brady Lee appearing for Respondent Christopher J. LaRose (no document attached) (rmc)
April 24, 2020 Filing 20 PRO HAC APPROVED: Rachel Love appearing for Respondent Christopher J. LaRose (no document attached) (rmc)
April 24, 2020 Filing 19 PRO HAC APPROVED: Daniel P Struck appearing for Respondent Christopher J. LaRose (no document attached) (rmc)
April 24, 2020 Filing 18 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-13790689.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Lee, Jacob) (rmc).
April 24, 2020 Filing 17 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-13790639.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Acedo, Nicholas) (rmc).
April 24, 2020 Filing 16 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-13790616.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Love, Rachel) (rmc).
April 24, 2020 Filing 15 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-13790571.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Struck, Daniel) (rmc).
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Setting Hearing and Providing Guidance on Further Briefing. Defendants shall file their responsive brief on or before May 8, 2020, and Plaintiffs shall file their reply on or before May 15, 2020. The Court will hear argument on the Otay Mesa Medically Vulnerable Subclass on April 28, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. Argument on the motion for class certification of the other groups will be heard on May 22, 2020, at 10:30 a.m. Both arguments will be telephonic, and the Court will provide the dial information to Counsel in advance of the hearing. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 4/24/2020.(aef)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Requesting Response. Defendants-Respondents shall file a response on or before 12:00 noon on April 27, 2020. A hearing on the motions, if necessary, shall be scheduled after receipt of Defendants' response. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 4/24/2020.(aef)
April 23, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Supplemental Facts and Authorities by Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara, Mary Doe, Maria Flor Calderon Lopez, Yasmani Osorio Reyna re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Langarica, Monika) (aef).
April 23, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel is no longer assigned. Case randomly reassigned to Judge Dana M. Sabraw for all further proceedings. The new case number is 20cv756 DMS (AHG).(no document attached) (jcj)
April 22, 2020 Filing 10 SEALED LODGED Proposed Document re: #9 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion to Seal is granted. (Grano, Kimberly) (aef).
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal (With attachments)(Grano, Kimberly) (aef).
April 21, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by John David Loy on behalf of Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara, Mary Doe, Flor Calderon Maria Lopez, Yasmani Osorio Reyna (Loy, John)Attorney John David Loy added to party Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara(pty:pet), Attorney John David Loy added to party Mary Doe(pty:pet), Attorney John David Loy added to party Flor Calderon Maria Lopez(pty:pet), Attorney John David Loy added to party Yasmani Osorio Reyna(pty:pet) (jms).
April 21, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan Paul Markovitz on behalf of Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara, Mary Doe, Flor Calderon Maria Lopez, Yasmani Osorio Reyna (Markovitz, Jonathan)Attorney Jonathan Paul Markovitz added to party Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara(pty:pet), Attorney Jonathan Paul Markovitz added to party Mary Doe(pty:pet), Attorney Jonathan Paul Markovitz added to party Flor Calderon Maria Lopez(pty:pet), Attorney Jonathan Paul Markovitz added to party Yasmani Osorio Reyna(pty:pet) (jms).
April 21, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kimberly Robin Grano on behalf of Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara, Mary Doe, Flor Calderon Maria Lopez, Yasmani Osorio Reyna (Grano, Kimberly)Attorney Kimberly Robin Grano added to party Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara(pty:pet), Attorney Kimberly Robin Grano added to party Mary Doe(pty:pet), Attorney Kimberly Robin Grano added to party Flor Calderon Maria Lopez(pty:pet), Attorney Kimberly Robin Grano added to party Yasmani Osorio Reyna(pty:pet) (jms).
April 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Bardis Vakili on behalf of Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara, Mary Doe, Flor Calderon Maria Lopez, Yasmani Osorio Reyna (Vakili, Bardis)Attorney Bardis Vakili added to party Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara(pty:pet), Attorney Bardis Vakili added to party Mary Doe(pty:pet), Attorney Bardis Vakili added to party Flor Calderon Maria Lopez(pty:pet), Attorney Bardis Vakili added to party Yasmani Osorio Reyna(pty:pet) (jms).
April 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara, Mary Doe, Maria Flor Calderon Lopez, Yasmani Osorio Reyna of case(s): 20cv618-BAS-RBB, 20cv658-LAB-MSB, 20cv679-H-BLM, 20cv682-LAB-MDD. (jms)(jrd)
April 21, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara, Mary Doe, Maria Flor Calderon Lopez, Yasmani Osorio Reyna. (jms)(jrd)
April 21, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara, Mary Doe, Maria Flor Calderon Lopez, Yasmani Osorio Reyna. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities In support of Ex Parte Application for TRO, #2 Declaration of Monika Y. Langarica in support of motion for Emergency Temporary)(jms)(jrd)
April 21, 2020 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Against Gregory J. Archambeault, James Dobson, Jesus Reyna, Christopher J. LaRose, Sixto Marrero, Matthew T. Albence, Chad Wolf, filed by Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara, Maria Flor Calderon Lopez, Yasmani Osorio Reyna, Mary Doe, (Filing fee $5 - receipt number ACASDC-13772781 [paid $400.00 for complaint, confirmed petition]) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Motion for Class Certification, #3 Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion for Class Certification, #4 Declaration Bardis Vakili In Support of Motion for Class Certification, #5 Declaration of Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara, #6 Declaration of Yasmani Osorio Reyna, #7 Declaration f Maria Flor Calderon Lopez, #8 Declaration of Mary Doe, #9 Declaration of Dorien Ediger-Seto, #10 Declaration of Luis Gonzalez, #11 Declaration of Elizabeth Lopez, #12 Declaration of Kate Clark, #13 Declaration of Brendan Cassidy, #14 Declaration of Dr. Joseph J. Amon, #15 Declaration f Dr. Katherine C. McKenzie, #16 Declaration f Dr. Jonathan L. Golob)The new case number is 3:20-cv-756-GPC-AHG. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard are assigned to the case. (Langarica, Monika)(jms)(jrd)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alcantara et al v. Archambeault et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jesus Reyna
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Represented By: Rebecca Grace Church
Represented By: Betsey Boutelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad Wolf
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Represented By: Rebecca Grace Church
Represented By: Betsey Boutelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Sixto Marrero
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: John J. Rice
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Dobson
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Represented By: Rebecca Grace Church
Represented By: Betsey Boutelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew T. Albence
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Represented By: Rebecca Grace Church
Represented By: Betsey Boutelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Gregory J. Archambeault
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Samuel William Bettwy
Represented By: Rebecca Grace Church
Represented By: Betsey Boutelle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Christopher J. LaRose
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Jacob Brady Lee
Represented By: Nicholas D. Acedo
Represented By: Rachel Love
Represented By: Matthew Miguel Mahoney
Represented By: Daniel P Struck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden LaRose
Represented By: Matthew Miguel Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Yasmani Osorio Reyna
Represented By: Kimberly Robin Grano
Represented By: Jonathan Paul Markovitz
Represented By: John David Loy
Represented By: Monika Yvette Langarica
Represented By: Bardis Vakili
Represented By: Alexandra Eber
Represented By: Alexander Galicki
Represented By: Eleanor Barczak
Represented By: John H. Hemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Adrian Rodriguez Alcantara
Represented By: Kimberly Robin Grano
Represented By: Jonathan Paul Markovitz
Represented By: John David Loy
Represented By: Monika Yvette Langarica
Represented By: Bardis Vakili
Represented By: Alexandra Eber
Represented By: Alexander Galicki
Represented By: Eleanor Barczak
Represented By: John H. Hemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mary Doe
Represented By: Kimberly Robin Grano
Represented By: Jonathan Paul Markovitz
Represented By: John David Loy
Represented By: Monika Yvette Langarica
Represented By: Bardis Vakili
Represented By: Alexandra Eber
Represented By: Alexander Galicki
Represented By: Eleanor Barczak
Represented By: John H. Hemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Flor Calderon Maria Lopez
Represented By: Kimberly Robin Grano
Represented By: Jonathan Paul Markovitz
Represented By: John David Loy
Represented By: Monika Yvette Langarica
Represented By: Bardis Vakili
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maria Flor Calderon Lopez
Represented By: Kimberly Robin Grano
Represented By: Jonathan Paul Markovitz
Represented By: John David Loy
Represented By: Monika Yvette Langarica
Represented By: Bardis Vakili
Represented By: Alexandra Eber
Represented By: Alexander Galicki
Represented By: Eleanor Barczak
Represented By: John H. Hemann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?