G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Parker et al
Plaintiff: G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC
Defendant: Timothy Parker and Diego & Dante, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00801
Filed: April 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Ruben B Brooks
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:0605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Attorney Fees and Costs by G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Thomas P. Riley, #2 Proof of Service)(Riley, Thomas) (mme).
June 16, 2020 Filing 11 Minute Order for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks:A telephonic early neutral evaluation conference was held. A continued telephonic early neutral evaluation conference is set for July 2, 2020, at 8:30 a.m. to further discuss resolution of Plaintiffs attorneys fees and costs. All parties and counsel shall participate in the conference. The Court will begin the conference on its teleconference line. The parties shall use the call-in information previously provided by the Court.(Plaintiff Attorney Thomas P. Riley).(Defendant Attorney Trevor B. McCann). (mme)
June 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Diego & Dante, LLC, Timothy Parker (McCann, Trevor) (mme).
June 4, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Defendants' Counterclaim for Lack of Subject Matter Jurisdiction; Memorandum of Points and Authorities by G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Riley, Thomas) (mme).
June 4, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. IT IS SO ORDERED AND ADJUDGED Judgment in favor of plaintiff G & G CLOSED CIRCUIT EVENTS, LLC and against Defendants, in the sum of twelve-thousand dollars ($12,000.00) plus allowable costs (excluding any prevailingattorneys' fees) and reasonable attorneys' fees. (Attachments: #1 (mme)
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment by G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC (Riley, Thomas) (mme).
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Teleconference Information Sheet, re #5 Notice and Order for Early Neutral Evaluation conference. Teleconference set for 6/16/2020 at 8:45 A.M. (mme)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Telephonic Early Neutral Evaluation set for 6/16/2020 08:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 5/18/2020.(mme)
May 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Diego & Dante, LLC, Timothy Parker (McCann, Trevor) (mme).
May 14, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Timothy Parker, Diego & Dante, LLC.(McCann, Trevor)Attorney Trevor Brandt McCann added to party Diego & Dante, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Trevor Brandt McCann added to party Timothy Parker(pty:dft) (mme).
April 29, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmr) (jms).
April 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Diego & Dante, LLC, Timothy Parker ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13806405.), filed by G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-801-BEN-RBB. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks are assigned to the case. (Riley, Thomas)(jmr) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC v. Parker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diego & Dante, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: G&G Closed Circuit Events, LLC
Represented By: Thomas P. Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?