Elizondo v. Seaworld Parks & Entertainment, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Artemisa Elizondo
Defendant: Seaworld Parks & Entertainment, Inc., Steven Melanese and DOES 1 through 100
Case Number: 3:2020cv00829
Filed: May 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
2 Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Continue All Discovery Deadlines Issued in the Superior Court of the State of California, County of San Diego by Seaworld Parks & Entertainment, Inc.. (Marrero, Guillermo) (dlg).
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 7/20/2020 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Case Management Conference set for 7/20/2020 at 1:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Joint Discovery Plan due 7/6/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 5/11/20.(dlg)
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Roger T. Benitez is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel for all further proceedings. The new case number is 20cv0829-GPC-BGS.(no document attached) (mme)
May 1, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Seaworld Parks & Entertainment, Inc. (smd)
May 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from San Diego Superior Court, case number 37-2018-00057261-CU-PO-CTL. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-13820272.), filed by Seaworld Parks & Entertainment, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration State Court Complaint Included, #3 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:20-cv-829-BEN-BGS. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case.(smd) (sjt).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elizondo v. Seaworld Parks & Entertainment, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seaworld Parks & Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Guillermo Marrero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steven Melanese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Artemisa Elizondo
Represented By: Raymond Ghermezian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?