Burns v. Nazhand et al
Plaintiff: F. Shaun Burns
Defendant: Roes 1 to 10 and Siamak Nazhand
Case Number: 3:2020cv00927
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Referring Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Rent Lease & Ejectment
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2020 Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by F. Shaun Burns. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Russ Eskilson, Real Estate Broker, in support of Plaintiff's response to Order to Show Cause entered 5/22/20, #2 Proof of Service)(jpp)
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Service re Ex Parte Motion to Enlarge Time, by Plaintiff F. Shaun Burns. NUNC PRO TUNC 6/04/2020. (jpp)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Janis L. Sammartino Accepting Document: Declaration of Service, from Plaintiff F. Shaun Burns. Non-compliance with local rule(s), Civ.L. Rule 5.1 Improper Format.. Nunc Pro Tunc 6/04/2020. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/08/2020.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Plaintiff's ex parte Motion to enlarge time to respond to Order to Show Cause entered 5/22/2020. Plaintiff shall respond to the Courts May 22, 2020 Order to Show Cause (ECF No. 3) on or before June 15, 2020.Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 6/08/2020. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (dlg).
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 Ex Parte MOTION to enlarge time to respond to Order to Show Cause entered 5/22/20; Supporting Affidavit, by F. Shaun Burns. (jpp)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE as to the Court's subject matter jurisdiction. Order to Show Cause Response due by 6/5/2020. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 5/22/2020.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(jpp) (dlg).
May 19, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiffs not receiving notice electronically (jmr) (jms).
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Siamak Nazhand, Roes 1 to 10 ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number CAS121504.), filed by F. Shaun Burns. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-927-JLS-JLB. Judge Janis L. Sammartino and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.(jmr)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burns v. Nazhand et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roes 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siamak Nazhand
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: F. Shaun Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?