Dumke v. Southside Realty Investments, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Andrew B. Dumke
Defendant: Does 1 to 100 and Southside Realty Investments, LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00935
Filed: May 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Referring Judge: Linda Lopez
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by Southside Realty Investments, LLC.(Smylie, Scott)Attorney Scott A Smylie added to party Southside Realty Investments, LLC(pty:dft)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Second Joint Motion to Extend Deadline for Defendant to Respond to Complaint to July 20, 2020. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/14/20. (dlg)
July 10, 2020 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Second Motion) by Southside Realty Investments, LLC. (Brody, David) (dlg).
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by Andrew B. Dumke (Thompson, James) (dlg).
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting Joint #4 Motion for Extension of Time for Southside Reality Investments, LLC to Respond to Complaint to July 13, 2020. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/10/20. (dlg)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Southside Realty Investments, LLC. (Brody, David)Attorney David W Brody added to party Southside Realty Investments, LLC(pty:dft) (dlg).
May 28, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrew B. Dumke. Southside Realty Investments, LLC served. (Thompson, James) (dlg).
May 19, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jmr) (jms).
May 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Does 1 to 100, Southside Realty Investments, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number BCASDC-13891960.), filed by Andrew B. Dumke. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A)The new case number is 3:20-cv-935-GPC-LL. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case. (Thompson, James)(jmr) (jms).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dumke v. Southside Realty Investments, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southside Realty Investments, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew B. Dumke
Represented By: James Renfro Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?