Parks et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Donna Parks and Delbert Parks
Defendant: Ethicon Inc and Johnson & Johnson
Case Number: 3:2020cv00989
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Cynthia Bashant
Referring Judge: Ruben B Brooks
2 Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
3 Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 94 NOTICE of Change of Hearing: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 8/21/20 VACATED AND RESET TO 10/2/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. The parties shall dial the toll-free number: 1-877-848-7030, and enter the Access Code: 7030611.(no document attached) (ksr)
August 18, 2020 Filing 93 NOTICE of Hearing: TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 8/21/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. The parties shall dial the toll-free number: 1-877-848-7030, and enter the Access Code: 7030611.(no document attached) (ksr)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 Minute Order. An early neutral evaluation conference was held. The case did not settle. A telephonic settlement conference is set for October 20, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. The Court will begin the settlement conference on its teleconference line (the parties shall use the same call-in information previously provided). Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 8/5/20 (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
July 7, 2020 Filing 91 NOTICE of Teleconference Information. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 7/7/20 (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. An early neutral evaluation of your case will be held by telephone before United States Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on August 5, 2020, at 9:00 a.m. Signed by Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks on 7/7/20.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
July 2, 2020 Filing 89 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel: TELEPHONIC Status Conference held on 7/2/2020, Court refers to Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks for early neutral evaluation., ( TELEPHONIC Status Conference set for 8/21/2020 01:30 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel.)(Court Reporter/ECR Chari Bowery). (Plaintiff Attorney Christopher Cantrell and William Doyle). (Defendant Attorney Mollie Benedict). (no document attached) (ksr)
June 30, 2020 Filing 88 NOTICE of Change of Hearing: TELEPHONIC Status Conference RESET TO 7/2/2020 01:45 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. The parties shall dial the toll-free number: 1-877-848-7030, and enter the Access Code: 7030611. (no document attached) (ksr)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER Granting Application for Substitution of Attorney ( #84 ). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/10/20.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference set for 7/2/2020 at 1:30 PM. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/10/20.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(dlg)
June 5, 2020 Filing 85 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Thomas J. Whelan is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel for all further proceedings. The new case number is 20CV0989-GPC-RBB.(no document attached) (sjt)
June 2, 2020 Filing 84 NOTICE /Application for Substitution of Attorney by Ethicon Inc, Johnson & Johnson (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Benedict, Mollie)Attorney Mollie F Benedict added to party Ethicon Inc(pty:dft), Attorney Mollie F Benedict added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft). QC email: incorrect judge initial; proposed order. No refile (jdt).
June 2, 2020 Filing 83 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Jeffrey T. Miller is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Thomas J. Whelan for all further proceedings. The new case number is 20cv0989-W.(no document attached) (sjt)
June 1, 2020 Filing 82 MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. Judge Cynthia Bashant is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Jeffrey T. Miller for all further proceedings. The new case number is 20-cv-989-JM-RBB.(no document attached) (dsn)
June 1, 2020 Filing 81 MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Ruben B. Brooks for all further proceedings. The new case number is 20-cv-989-BAS-RBB.(no document attached) (dsn)
May 29, 2020 Filing 80 Judge Cynthia Bashant and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt assigned to transfer case from Southern District of West Virginia. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (mme)
May 29, 2020 Filing 79 Case transferred in from District of West Virginia Southern; Case Number 2:14-cv-10221. Original file received electronically
May 27, 2020 Filing 78 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (9119) ORDER Granting Plaintiffs #39 Motion to Strike Defendants Experts in Excess of Five, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (9120) ORDER Granting Plaintiffs #39 Motion to Strike Defendants Experts in Excess of Five)(Cantrell, Christopher) (Modified on 5/28/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 77 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (3545) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER on Plaintiffs 2417 MOTION to Exclude the General Opinion Testimony of Dr. Robert M. Rogers, M.D in the Wave 2 Cases, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3766) ORDER ADOPTING prior Daubert ruling on Robert M. Rogers, M.D. at 3545 in the Wave 2 Cases, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (4190) ORDER ADOPTING prior Daubert ruling on Robert M. Rogers, M.D. at 3545 in the Wave 3 Cases, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (6536) ORDER ADOPTING prior Daubert ruling on Robert M. Rogers, M.D. at 3545 in the Wave 7 Cases)(Cantrell, Christopher) (Modified on 5/28/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 76 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (2703) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER on Plaintiffs 2022 MOTION to Exclude Certain Opinions and Testimony of Douglas Grier, M.D. in the Wave 1 Cases, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3309) ORDER ADOPTING prior Daubert ruling on Douglas Grier, M.D. at 2703 in the Wave 2 Cases, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (4160) ORDER ADOPTING prior Daubert ruling on Douglas Grier, M.D. at 2703 in the Wave 3 Cases)(Cantrell, Christopher) (Modified on 5/28/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 75 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (3553) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER on Plaintiffs 2425 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Peter L. Rosenblatt in the Wave 2 Cases, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (6463) ORDER ADOPTING prior Daubert ruling on Dr. Peter L. Rosenblatt at 3553 in the Wave 6 Cases)(Cantrell, Christopher) (Modified on 5/28/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 74 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (2723) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER on Plaintiffs 2039 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Shelby Thames in the Wave 1 Cases, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3563) ORDER ADOPTING prior Daubert ruling on Shelby Thames, M.D. at 2723 in the Wave 2 Cases, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (4201) ORDER ADOPTING prior Daubert ruling on Shelby Thames, M.D. at 2723 in the Wave 3 Cases, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (6518) ORDER ADOPTING prior Daubert ruling on Shelby Thames, M.D. at 2723 in the Wave 7 Cases)(Cantrell, Christopher) (Modified on 5/28/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 73 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (2649) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER on Plaintiffs 2060 MOTION to Exclude the Opinions of FDA Expert Timothy Ulatowski in the Wave 1 Cases, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3536) ORDER ADOPTING prior Daubert ruling on Timothy Ulatowski, M.D. at 2649 in the Wave 2 Cases, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (4195) ORDER ADOPTING prior Daubert ruling on Timothy Ulatowski, M.D. at 2649 in the Wave 3 Cases, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (6846) ORDER ADOPTING prior Daubert ruling on Timothy Ulatowski, M.D. at 2649 in the Wave 6 Cases)(Cantrell, Christopher) (Modified on 5/28/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 72 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (2712) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER on Defendants 2270 MOTION to Exclude General Causation Testimony of Dionysios K. Veronikis, M.D. in the Wave 1 Cases, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3537) ORDER ADOPTING prior Daubert ruling on Dionysios K. Veronikis, M.D. at 2712 in the Wave 2 Cases, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (6479) ORDER ADOPTING prior Daubert ruling on Dionysios K. Veronikis, M.D. at 2712 in the Wave 6 Cases, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (6533) ORDER ADOPTING prior Daubert ruling on Dionysios K. Veronikis, M.D. at 2712 in the Wave 7 Cases)(Cantrell, Christopher) (Modified on 5/28/2020 to add party files) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 71 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (2698) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER on Defendants 1977 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Scott A. Guelcher, Ph.D. in Wave 1 Cases, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3559) ORDER ADOPTING prior Daubert ruling on Scott Guelcher, Ph.D. at 2698 in the Wave 2 Cases, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (4166) ORDER ADOPTING prior Daubert ruling on Scott Guelcher, Ph.D. at 2698 in the Wave 3 Cases, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (6431) ORDER ADOPTING prior Daubert ruling on Scott Guelcher, Ph.D. at 2698 in the Wave 6 Cases)(Cantrell, Christopher) (Modified on 5/28/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 70 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (2683) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER on Defendants 1996 MOTION to Exclude the General Causation Testimony of Donald R. Ostergard, M.D. in Certain Wave 1 Cases, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3511) ORDER ADOPTING prior Daubert ruling on the General Causation Testimony of Donald R. Ostergard, M.D. at 2683 in the Wave 2 Cases, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (6496) ORDER ADOPTING prior Daubert ruling on the General Causation Testimony of Donald R. Ostergard, M.D. at 2683 in the Wave 6 Cases)(Cantrell, Christopher) (Modified on 5/28/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 69 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (2646) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER on Defendants 2071 Motion to Exclude the Opinions and Testimony of Dr. Jimmy W. Mays in the Wave 1 Cases, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (3514) ORDER ADOPTING prior Daubert ruling on Jimmy Mays, Ph.D. at 2646 in the Wave 2 Cases, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (4185) ORDER ADOPTING prior Daubert ruling on Jimmy Mays, Ph.D. at 2646 in the Wave 7 Cases, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (6459) ORDER ADOPTING prior Daubert ruling on Jimmy Mays, Ph.D. at 2646 in the Wave 6 Cases)(Cantrell, Christopher) (Modified on 5/28/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 68 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (2666) MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER on Defendants MOTION to Exclude Certain General Opinions of Daniel Elliott, M.D. in the Wave 1 cases, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (6522) ORDER ADOPTING prior Daubert ruling on certain General Opinions of Daniel Elliott, MD at 2666 in the Wave 7 Cases)(Cantrell, Christopher) (Modified on 5/28/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 27, 2020 Filing 67 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (622) Stipulated Agreed Order Regarding Delayed Filing and Application to the Statute of Limitations, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (774) Amended Order Regarding Delayed Filing and Application to the Statute of Limitations Amending and superseding PTO #49, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (842) Order Amending PTO #65 Regarding Copies of Complaints Filed Under Delayed Filing Agreements, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (1001) Third Amended Order Regarding Delayed Filing and Application to the Statute of Limitations, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (1069) Order Granting in part and denying in part Plaintiffs' Motion for a Finding of Spoliation and for Sanctions, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (4299) ORDER Granting Leave to Conduct a de bene esse Deposition of Scott Guelcher, Ph.D., #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8417) Docket Control Order for Ethicon, Inc. Wave 13 Cases, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (8662) Amended Docket Control Order for Ethicon, Inc. Wave 13 Cases)(Cantrell, Christopher) (Modified on 5/28/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 66 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #56 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2060) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2065) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2134) - Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2232) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (7346) Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2910) Defs Supp Resp and Notice of Adoption of Resp Regarding Timothy Ulatowski, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (8960) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (9051) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Timothy Ulatowski)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/27/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 65 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #56 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2039) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2042) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2187) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2247) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2455) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2458) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 1 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 2 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (2553) Part 3 - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (2621) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (2839) Part 1 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (2839) Part 2 - Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (2841) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (2957) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (3037) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (8071) Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #18 Exhibit MDL ECF (8073) Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #19 Exhibit MDL ECF (8958) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames, #20 Exhibit MDL ECF (9061) Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Shelby Thames)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/27/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 64 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #56 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (7349) Pls Mot to Exclude Edward Stanford, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (7462) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Edward Stanford, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (8957) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Edward Stanford, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (9062) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Edward Stanford)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/27/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 63 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #56 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2425) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Peter Rosenblatt, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2428) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Peter Rosenblatt, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2535) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Peter Rosenblatt, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2625) Pls Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Peter Rosenblatt, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (8947) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Peter Rosenblatt, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (9055) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Peter Rosenblatt)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/27/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 62 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #56 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2417) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Robert Rogers, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2466) Pls Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Robert Rogers, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2488) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Robert Rogers, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (8946) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Robert Rogers, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (9050) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Robert Rogers)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/27/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 61 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #56 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2022) - Pls' Mot to Exclude Douglas Grier, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2024) - Pls' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Douglas Grier, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2179) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Douglas Grier, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2921) - Defs' Resp to Pls' Mot to Exclude Douglas Grier, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2982) - Pls' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Douglas Grier, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (8932) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Mot to Exclude Douglas Grier, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (9035) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Resp to Mot to Exclude Douglas Grier)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/27/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 60 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #56 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2270) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2271) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2284) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2313) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2820) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2821) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2890) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3033) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (6964) - Notice of Adoption of Pls Resp to Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (8993) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (9018) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Dionysios Veronikis)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/27/2020 to add party filer) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 59 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #56 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1996) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1997) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2167) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2222) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2814) - Defs' Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2816) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2950) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3011) Defs Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (8992) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (9012) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Donald Ostergard)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/27/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 58 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #56 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (2071) Part 1 - Defs Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (2071) Part 2 - Defs Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (2071) Part 3 - Defs Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (2074) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2144) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2209) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (3031) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (3642) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (3642) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (3647) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (3751) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (3847) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (8976) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (9009) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Jimmy Mays)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/27/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 57 CONTINUED JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit ECF #56 CONTINUED, MDL ECF (1977) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (1977) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (1977) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (1981) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (2100) - Defs' Mot to Substitute Amended Exhibit A to Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #6 Exhibit MDL ECF (2164) - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #7 Exhibit MDL ECF (2210) - Defs' Reply in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #8 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 1 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #9 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 2 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #10 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 3 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #11 Exhibit MDL ECF (4573) Part 4 - Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #12 Exhibit MDL ECF (4574) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #13 Exhibit MDL ECF (4675) Part 1 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #14 Exhibit MDL ECF (4675) Part 2 - Pls' Resp to Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #15 Exhibit MDL ECF (4692) - Defs' Mem in Support of Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #16 Exhibit MDL ECF (8973) - Notice of Adoption of Defs' Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher, #17 Exhibit MDL ECF (9004) - Notice of Adoption of Pls' Resp to Mot to Exclude Scott Guelcher)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/27/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 26, 2020 Filing 56 JOINT DESIGNATION OF RECORD for MDL transfers re: 2:12-md-02327 - Ethicon, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit MDL ECF (238) First Amended Master Long Form Complaint, #2 Exhibit MDL ECF (239) Master Answer of Ethicon, Inc. to First Amended Master Complaint, #3 Exhibit MDL ECF (241) Master Answer of Johnson & Johnson to First Amended Master Complaint, #4 Exhibit MDL ECF (262) - Short Form Complaint, #5 Exhibit MDL ECF (263) Amended Short Form Complaint)(Gage, William) (Modified on 5/27/2020 to add party filers) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 TRANSFER ORDER FOR CASES ON EXHIBIT A directing that on 5/28/2020 the cases identified on Exhibit A that are still pending shall be transferred to the United States District Courts identified on Exhibit A pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a); on or before 5/27/2020 the parties are DIRECTED to confer and to file in each pending individual member case identified in Exhibit A, all documents from the main MDL that the parties jointly deem relevant to constitute an appropriate record for the receiving court to consider; the Clerk is DIRECTED to use the appropriate function in CM/ECF to extract each member case listed on Exhibit A that remains pending and transfer it to the corresponding United States District Court listed on Exhibit A; after transfer of each member case listed in Exhibit A that is not dismissed prior to the Transfer Date, the Clerk is DIRECTED to formally close the case and strike it from the docket of this court. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/14/2020. (cc: Clerk of the JPMDL; counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (maw) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #38 MOTION by Delbert Parks, Donna Parks to Strike Ethicon, Inc.'s Designation of Experts for Violation of the Court's Pretrial Order #328, and #39 MOTION by Delbert Parks, Donna Parks to Exclude Ethicon Inc.'s Retained and Non-Retained Expert Witnesses for Violation of Pretrial Order #346 and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, as more fully set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/12/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (ts) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
February 14, 2020 Filing 53 TRANSCRIPT OF PROCEEDINGS of Telephonic Motions Hearing held on 01/14/2020, before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert. Court Reporter Kimberly Kaufman, Telephone number 304-347-3188. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due 2/24/2020. Redaction Request due 3/6/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/16/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/14/2020. (klc) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
January 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #33 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Compel Dr. Daniel Elliott to Produce Compensation Records Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 1/15/2020. (cc: counsel of record) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
January 14, 2020 Filing 51 TELEPHONIC MOTION HEARING held by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 1/14/2020, re: #33 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Compel Dr. Daniel Elliott to Produce Compensation Records; Court Reporter: Kim Kaufman. (hkl) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 50 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #43 Response In Opposition. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 49 REPLY by Delbert Parks, Donna Parks to #42 Response In Opposition. (Cantrell, Christopher) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
January 10, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by Christopher W. Cantrell (Cantrell, Christopher) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Filing 47 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #44 Opposition. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
January 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER directing that a telephonic hearing is set for 1/14/2020 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert re: #33 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Compel Dr. Daniel Elliott to Produce Compensation Records. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert on 1/8/2020. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 45 REPLY by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #41 OPPOSITION by Delbert Parks. (Gage, William) (Modified on 1/7/2020 to remove link to #33 motion and add link to #41 opposition) (msa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Filing 44 OPPOSITION by Delbert Parks, Donna Parks to #34 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Cantrell, Christopher) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Filing 43 OPPOSITION by Delbert Parks, Donna Parks to #36 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude Certain Case Specific Opinions of Daniel Elliott, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Elliott Specific Causation Report)(Cantrell, Christopher) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Filing 42 OPPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to #38 MOTION by Delbert Parks, Donna Parks to Strike Ethicon, Inc.'s Designation of Experts for Violation of the Court's Pretrial Order #328, and #39 MOTION by Delbert Parks, Donna Parks to Exclude Ethicon Inc.'s Retained and Non-Retained Expert Witnesses for Violation of Pretrial Order #346 and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Gage, William) (Modified on 1/13/2020 to add link to #39 motion) (ts). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
December 30, 2019 Filing 41 OPPOSITION by Delbert Parks, Donna Parks to #33 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Compel Dr. Daniel Elliott to Produce Compensation Records (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs' Responses and Objections to Documents Requests, #2 Exhibit B - Curriculum Vitae of Daniel Elliott, MD)(Cantrell, Christopher) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
December 20, 2019 NOTICE OF DOCKET CORRECTION re: #39 MOTION to Exclude, #40 MEMORANDUM in support. ERROR: Exhibits A-I attached to memorandum. CORRECTION: Exhibits A-I removed from memorandum and attached to motion. (msa) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 40 MEMORANDUM by Delbert Parks, Donna Parks in support of #39 MOTION by Delbert Parks, Donna Parks to Exclude Defendants' Retained and Non-Retained Expert Witnesses for Violation of Pretrial Order No. 346 and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Cantrell, Christopher) (Modified on 12/27/2019 to remove Exhibits A-I) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION by Delbert Parks, Donna Parks to Exclude Ethicon Inc.'s Retained and Non-Retained Expert Witnesses for Violation of Pretrial Order #346 and the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Cantrell, Christopher) #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (Modified on 12/27/2019 to add Exhibits A-I) (msa). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION by Delbert Parks, Donna Parks to Strike Ethicon, Inc.'s Designation of Experts for Violation of the Court's Pretrial Order #328. (Cantrell, Christopher) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 37 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #36 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude Certain Case Specific Opinions of Daniel Elliott, M.D. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
December 20, 2019 Filing 36 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Exclude Certain Case Specific Opinions of Daniel Elliott, M.D. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 35 MEMORANDUM OF LAW by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson in support of #34 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
December 19, 2019 Filing 34 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Summary Judgment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
December 16, 2019 MOTION REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cheryl A. Eifert: #33 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Compel Dr. Daniel Elliott to Produce Compensation Records. (kew) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
December 16, 2019 Filing 33 MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Compel Dr. Daniel Elliott to Produce Compensation Records (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H)(Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
December 13, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Friends and Family on on a date to be determined at at a time to be determined (Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER granting #30 JOINT MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Donna Parks, Delbert Parks for Extension of Deadlines to Complete Discovery and Motions Practice. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 12/12/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
December 11, 2019 Filing 30 JOINT MOTION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Donna Parks, Delbert Parks for Extension of Deadlines to Complete Discovery and Motions Practice (Gage, William) (Modified on 12/12/2019 to add party filers)(slr). [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
November 28, 2019 Filing 29 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Delbert Parks, Donna Parks for Responses and Objections to Defendants' Deposition Subpoena to Daniel Elliott, MD. (Cantrell, Christopher) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
November 21, 2019 Filing 28 NOTICE OF DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Daniel Elliott, M.D. on 12/1/2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
November 8, 2019 Filing 27 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Designation and Disclosure of General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses and Defendants Non-Retained Expert Disclosures. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
October 30, 2019 Filing 26 AMENDED NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Delbert Parks, Donna Parks of Shawn Menefee, MD on December 4, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Cantrell, Christopher) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
October 9, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Delbert Parks, Donna Parks for Designation and Disclosure of Certain General and Case Specific Expert Witnesses. (Cantrell, Christopher) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF VIDEO DEPOSITION by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson of Donna Parks on 10/18/2019 at 9:00 a.m. PT (Attachments: #1 Appendix Subpoena)(Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
September 18, 2019 Filing 23 SUGGESTION OF DEATH UPON THE RECORD as to Delbert Parks by Donna Parks (Cantrell, Christopher) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
September 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PRETRIAL ORDER # 346 (Docket Control Order - Ethicon, Inc. Wave 13 Cases) The Pretrial Order # 341 is AMENDED to correct a typographical error in Paragraph A (Scheduling Deadlines); the court has removed cases from the original Exhibit A that have since closed; the remaining provisions related to Wave 13 remain in effect and are set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/10/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases Listed on Exhibit A) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
September 8, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION by Delbert Parks, Donna Parks of Shawn Menefee, MD on November 5, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. (Cantrell, Christopher) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
September 5, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson for Responses to Plaintiffs Interrogatories, Requests for Production, and Requests for Admission. (Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
August 30, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Delbert Parks, Donna Parks for Plaintiff's Responses and Objections to Defendants' First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission and Requests for Production. (Cantrell, Christopher) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
August 11, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Donna Parks for Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, First Set of Requests for Admission and First Set of Requests for Production. (Cantrell, Christopher) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
July 30, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Ethicon, Inc. for First Set of Interrogatories, Requests for Admission, and Requests for Production. (Modak-Truran, Anita) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
July 9, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Taylor B. Mayes on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Mayes, Taylor) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PRETRIAL ORDER # 341 (Docket Control Order Ethicon, Inc. Wave 13 Cases) The court ORDERS as follows for the cases on Exhibit A: (1) The cases are no longer eligible for placement or return to the inactive docket nor may notices of settlement be filed to relieve the parties from these scheduling deadlines; (2) To the extent any other defendants are named in the cases on Exhibit A, the deadlines below also apply to them; and (3) The following deadlines immediately apply in all Wave 13 cases with one important exception, as more fully set forth herein. SCHEDULING DEADLINES. The following deadlines shall apply in all Ethicon Wave 13 cases: Plaintiff Fact Sheets due by 07/01/2019. Defendant Fact Sheets due by 07/11/2019. Deadline for written discovery requests due by 08/09/2019. Expert disclosures served by plaintiffs pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 10/08/2019. Expert disclosure served by defendants pursuant to Fed. R. Civ P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 11/07/2019. Expert disclosure served for rebuttal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26 as limited by 3.a. of this order due by 11/14/2019. Deposition deadline and close of discovery due by 12/13/2019. Filing of dispositive motions due by 12/20/2019. Response to dispositive motions due by 01/03/2020. Reply to response to dispositive motions due by 01/10/2020. Filing of Daubert motions due by 12/20/2020. Responses to Daubert motions due by 01/03/2020. Reply to response to Daubert motions due by 01/10/2020. Confidential Documents. Issues related to sealing of confidential documents that the parties are unable to resolve, must be brought to the court's attention in a consolidated manner as follows: Any consolidated motion to seal is due by 11/4/2019, and any response is due by 11/18/2019. Any reply is due by 11/25/2019. Venue Recommendations. The parties shall meet and confer concerning the appropriate venue for each of the cases no late than 11/5/2019, and are ORDERED to file joint venue recommendations by 11/15/2019. The Clerk is directed to remove any existing wave or inactive flags from the cases on Exhibit A and place the Ethicon Wave 13 flag. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 6/20/2019. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Ethicon Wave 13 cases on Exhibit A) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
October 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting the Motions filed in MDL 2327 by Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson to Substitute Susan M. Robinson as Counsel in lieu of David B. Thomas, and to Substitute William M. Gage as Counsel in lieu of Christy D. Jones; the Clerk is directed to terminate Christy D. Jones and to substitute William M. Gage as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which Christy D. Jones is associated, and to terminate David B. Thomas and to substitute Susan M. Robinson as counsel of record, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which David B. Thomas is associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 5/24/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (ts) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #11 Motion to Reinstate; the Clerk is DIRECTED to remove the inactive docket flag and reinstate this case to the active docket. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 7/25/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (brn) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER (CHANGE TO CHARACTERIZATION BY CLERK'S OFFICE OF CASES ON INACTIVE DOCKET) It is directed that in all cases with an inactive docket order which resulted in "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flags on the docket sheet, the Clerk is directed to update the docket by removing the "Closed" flag from the docket sheet and leaving the "MDL Ethicon Inactive" flag, for reasons set forth herein. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 4/26/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Member Cases Flagged "Closed" and "MDL Ethicon Inactive") (kp) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
May 3, 2018 Filing 11 MOTION by Delbert Parks, Donna Parks to be Moved to the Active Docket (Attachment: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Donna Parks)(Cantrell, Christopher) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 8/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 3/16/2018. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (st) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
October 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER The deadline to submit joint motions of dismissal is extended to 3/31/2018 for all cases in MDL 2327 currently on an inactive docket. All remaining provisions of Inactive Docket Orders entered in MDL 2327 and individual cases remain in effect. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 10/19/2017. (cc: counsel of record; any unrepresented party) (REF: MDL 2327; Cases on inactive docket) (brn) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
September 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 INACTIVE DOCKET ORDER: The court has been advised that the plaintiff(s) and Ethicon, Inc. have reached a settlement with regard to Ethicon. All discovery deadlines are continued until further order of the court. The Clerk is directed to retire this case from the active docket. Plaintiff(s) and Ethicon may submit an agreed order of dismissal with prejudice on or before 10/31/2017; if settlements are not finalized and dismissal orders are not submitted by then the Court will have a hearing to determine the appropriate action pertaining to any remaining cases on the inactive docket. Counsel for plaintiffs and defendant(s) are directed to provide quarterly reports as to their progress in dismissing cases on the inactive docket. The court will reinstate the case to the active docket if one of the parties shows good cause for such reinstatement. This Order is related to the Proposed Inactive Docket Order filed at ECF No. 4422 in MDL Case No. 2327 Ethicon. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 9/27/2017. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (mek) (ADI) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
April 17, 2017 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Kari L. Sutherland on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Sutherland, Kari) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
September 30, 2016 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by William M. Gage on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Gage, William) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
January 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER on Motions filed in MDL 2327: denying, as moot, MOTION by Doyle Lowther LLP for Change of Address in MDL No. 2327 and each individual member case in which Doyle Lowther LLP is associated; granting AMENDED MOTION by William J. Doyle II, John Lowther, Christopher W. Cantrell of Doyle Lowther LLP for Change of Address. The Clerk is DIRECTED to update William J. Doyle II, John Lowther, and Chris Cantrell's information, as set forth in the Motion, both on the main master docket and for each individual member case in MDL 2327 with which said attorneys are associated. Signed by Judge Joseph R. Goodwin on 1/29/2016. (cc: attys; any unrepresented party) (kp) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
February 6, 2015 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by Christy D. Jones on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Jones, Christy) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
March 17, 2014 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE AND COUNSEL CONTACT INFORMATION FORM by David B. Thomas on behalf of Ethicon, Inc., Johnson & Johnson. (Thomas, David) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
February 20, 2014 Filing 2 TRANSMITTED PRETRIAL ORDER # 101 (SHOW CAUSE ORDER RE: MOTION TO APPOINT LIEN RESOLUTION ADMINISTRATOR) entered on 02/18/2014 in MDL 2327 to attorneys in member case. (cbo) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]
February 13, 2014 Filing 1 SHORT FORM COMPLAINT. Filing Fee $400.00. Receipt # 0425-3011946. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Service Under Delayed Filing Agreement, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (tmh) [Transferred from West Virginia Southern on 5/29/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parks et al v. Ethicon, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Parks
Represented By: Christopher Cantrell
Represented By: Christopher W. Cantrell
Represented By: William J. Doyle, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delbert Parks
Represented By: Christopher Cantrell
Represented By: Christopher W. Cantrell
Represented By: William J. Doyle, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ethicon Inc
Represented By: Taylor B. Mayes
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Anita Modak-Truran
Represented By: Joshua J Wes
Represented By: Nicholas V. Janizeh
Represented By: Mollie F Benedict
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Taylor B. Mayes
Represented By: Kari L. Sutherland
Represented By: William M. Gage
Represented By: David B. Thomas
Represented By: Susan M. Robinson
Represented By: Christy D. Jones
Represented By: Anita Modak-Truran
Represented By: Joshua J Wes
Represented By: Nicholas V. Janizeh
Represented By: Mollie F Benedict
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?