Kipperman v. Golden
In Re: Lisa Kaye Golden
Appellee: Lisa Golden
Appellant: Richard Kipperman
Case Number: 3:2020cv01044
Filed: June 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen S Crawford
Referring Judge: William Q Hayes
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:1334
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Requiring Payment of Filing Fees or Motion to Proceed IFP. Appellant to pay the filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(a) by 8/17/20. If Appellant fails to do so, the Court will dismiss the case without prejudice. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 7/31/20.(jmo)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Dana M. Sabraw and Magistrate Judge Nita L. Stormes for all further proceedings. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:18-cv-02089-DMS-NLS. The new case number is 20cv1044-DMS-NLS. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 6/15/2020. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 6/10/2020.(ag)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Partially Granting Plaintiff's Application for Order Allowing CM/ECF Access. The Court grants Plaintiff access to the CM/ECF system for cases pertaining to this matter that are assigned to Judge Dana M. Sabraw. However, the Court does not grant Plaintiff access to file documents in these cases electronically. Signed by Judge Dana M. Sabraw on 2/7/2020. (aef)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Michael M. Anello is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge William Q. Hayes for all further proceedings. The new case number is 20cv1044-WQH-KSC.(no document attached) (vxc)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT and Statement of Election. Bankruptcy Court case number: 1706928MM7. Adversary Number: 1890021MM. BK Internal Control Appeal Number: 14., filed by Lisa Golden. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Referral, #3 Transmittal Memorandum)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1044-MMA-KSC. Judge Michael M. Anello and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case.(vxc) (dsn).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kipperman v. Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Lisa Kaye Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Lisa Golden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Richard Kipperman
Represented By: Gary Edward Slater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?