Diaz et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Carmen Diaz and Robert Diaz
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and Does 1 through 20
Case Number: 3:2020cv01071
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jill L Burkhardt
Referring Judge: William Q Hayes
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 9 Transfer Letter Received from CENTRAL DISTRICT OF CALIFORNIA. Case number in other court is 2:20-cv-05919 (mme)
July 1, 2020 Filing 8 Case transferred to District of Central District of California. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Central District of California*. (jdt) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/1/2020: #1 MDL 2814 CTO-52). NEF regenerated (jdt).
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation Conference; and Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. An Early Neutral Evaluation Conference will be held by video conference on 7/22/2020 at 1:45 PM before Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt. In the event the case not does settle at the ENE, a Case Management Conference is set for 7/22/2020, and will be held at the conclusion of the ENE. A Joint Discovery Plan is due by 7/13/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt on 6/15/2020.(ag)
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) (ag).
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy Maclear on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Maclear, Amy)Attorney Amy Maclear added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft) (ag).
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Ford Motor Company of case(s) 2:18-ml-2814-AB-FFMx . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - MDL Order, #2 Exhibit B - List of Associated Cases, #3 Proof of Service)(Hugret, Spencer) Modified on 6/15/2020 to note that no proposed low number order was prepared; no pending case in Southern District (ag).
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by Ford Motor Company. Identifying Other Affiliate Evercore Trust Company, N.A., Other Affiliate Black Rock, Inc. and certain affiliates, Other Affiliate The Vanguard Group and certain affiliates for Ford Motor Company. (vxc) (dsn)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ford Motor Company. (vxc) (dsn)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of California, County of Imperial-El Centro, case number ECU001339. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14000333.), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Amy Maclear, #3 Declaration of Spencer P. Hugret, #4 Exhibit A - R. Diaz TransUnion Report, #5 Exhibit B - C. Diaz TransUnion Report, #6 Exhibit C - State Court Summons, #7 Exhibit D - State Court Complaint, #8 Exhibit E - ADR Information, #9 Exhibit F - Stipulation to Use of ADR Process, #10 Exhibit G - Notice of Case Management, #11 Exhibit I - POS of State Court Complaint, #12 Exhibit J - Ford's 10-K, #13 Proof of Service)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1071-WQH-JLB. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.(vxc) (dsn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diaz et al v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen Diaz
Represented By: David Neal Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Diaz
Represented By: David Neal Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Represented By: Amy Maclear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?