Ketayi et al v. Health Enrollment Group et al
Plaintiff: Miryam Ketayi and Eric Ketayi
Defendant: Axis Specialty U.S. Services, Inc., Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings, LLC, Health Insurance Innovations Holdings, Inc., First Health Group, Corp., Juanita Nicolucci, Marc Munoz, Liberty Health, Kevin Romero, Administrative Concepts, Inc., Axis, Health Enrollment Group, Alliance for Consumers USA, Axis a Bermuda corporation doing business as Axis Insurance Company, Cost Containment Group, Inc. and Ocean Consulting Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01198
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen S Crawford
Referring Judge: Gonzalo P Curiel
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 oc
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 176 Ex Parte MOTION to Set Aside Default by Alliance for Consumers USA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of T. Horton)(Horton, Timothy)Attorney Timothy Alan Horton added to party Alliance for Consumers USA(pty:dft) (dlg).
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 175 NOTICE of Vacated Hearing(s) : Motion Hearing set for 11/19/21 - VACATED. Court to issue written order. (no document attached) (ksr)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MOTION Leave To Appear Telephonically or by Videoconference at November 19, 2021 Hearing by Health Enrollment Group. (Eng, Kevin) (dlg).
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER Granting #172 Leave to Non-Arguing Counsel to Attend Motions Hearing by Telephone. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 11/15/21. (dlg)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MOTION to permit non-arguing counsel to attend Nov. 19 hearing by telephone by Axis, Axis Specialty U.S. Services, Inc.. (Baker, Adya)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER Resetting Hearing Date re #153 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint : Motion Hearing reset for 11/19/2021 at 1:30 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel.Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 10/20/21.(dlg)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 170 REPLY to Response to Motion re #153 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by Ocean Consulting Group, Inc.. (McGill, Brenna) (dlg).
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 169 Minute Order Resetting Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference (ENE/CMC). Due to a conflict in the Courts calendar, the ENE/CMC currently set for December 9, 2021 is hereby reset to December 14, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. The parties' Joint Discovery Plan shall be filed, and the parties confidential ENE statements shall be lodged, on or before December 7, 2021. All other instructions and mandatory procedures set forth in the Court's Notice and Order setting the ENE/CMC [Doc. No. 141] remain in effect. Any questions regarding the ENE/CMC may be directed to the Court's staff at 619-446-3964. (Case Management Conference set for 12/14/2021 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford., Early Neutral Evaluation set for 12/14/2021 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford.)(no document attached) (src)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 168 REPLY to Response to Motion re #143 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Cost Containment Group, Inc.. (Ahern, Jared) (dlg).
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 167 REPLY to Response to Motion re #142 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint (Partially) filed by Health Insurance Innovations Holdings, Inc., Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings, LLC. (Roth, Michael) (dlg).
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 166 REPLY to Response to Motion re #142 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint (Partially), #145 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Joinder in Motion to Partially Dismiss [Doc. 142] filed by Administrative Concepts, Inc.. (Lebedev, Gennady) (dlg).
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 165 RESPONSE in Opposition re #153 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by Eric Ketayi. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Fox, Joanna) (dlg).
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 164 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Opposition by Eric Ketayi re #163 Response in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Fox, Joanna) (dlg).
September 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 163 RESPONSE in Opposition re #153 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint filed by Eric Ketayi. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Fox, Joanna) (dlg).
September 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 162 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Alliance for Consumers USA (dlg)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 161 NOTICE for Entry of Default Against Defendant Alliance for Consumers USA by Eric Ketayi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joanna L. Fox, #2 Proof of Service)(Fox, Joanna) (zda). Modified on 9/27/2021 to term motion (dlg).
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER granting #159 Joint Motion for Continuance. Good cause appearing, and pursuant to the parties' stipulation, the Joint Motion for continuance of the deadline to exchange their initial Rule 26 disclosures is GRANTED. The parties shall exchange their initial disclosures by or before November 30, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 9/23/2021. (no document attached) (src)
September 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 159 Joint MOTION Continue the Parties' Rule 26 Disclosures re #141 Notice and Order for Early Neutral Evaluation conference, by Eric Ketayi. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Fox, Joanna) (jmo).
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 158 RESPONSE in Opposition re #143 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Eric Ketayi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joanna L. Fox, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Joanna L. Fox, #3 Proof of Service)(Fox, Joanna) (dlg).
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 157 RESPONSE in Opposition re #145 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Joinder in Motion to Partially Dismiss [Doc. 142] filed by Eric Ketayi. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Fox, Joanna) (jmo).
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 156 RESPONSE in Opposition re #142 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint (Partially) filed by Eric Ketayi. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Fox, Joanna) (jmo).
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #153 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint : Responses due by 10/5/2021, Replies due by 10/19/2021. Motion Hearing set for 12/3/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/7/21.(dlg)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 154 NOTICE of Setting Hearing Date for Motion to Partially Dismiss Third Amended Complaint by Ocean Consulting Group, Inc. re #153 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint (McGill, Brenna)Attorney Brenna Jean McGill added to party Ocean Consulting Group, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MOTION to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint by Ocean Consulting Group, Inc.. (Ahern, Jared) (dlg).
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ANSWER to #140 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Health Enrollment Group.(Eng, Kevin) (dlg).
September 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ANSWER to #140 Answer to Amended Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Health Insurance Innovations Holdings, Inc., Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings, LLC.(Roth, Michael) (dlg).
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Minute Entry Continuing Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference (ENE/CMC). In light of the pendency of several dispositive motions, the Court hereby continues the ENE/CMC currently set for September 27, 2021 to December 9, 2021 at 2:00 p.m. The parties' Joint Discovery Plan shall be filed on or before December 2, 2021. The parties' confidential ENE statements shall be lodged with Chambers on or before December 2, 2021. All other instructions and mandatory procedures set forth in the Court's Notice and Order setting the ENE/CMC remain in effect. Any questions regarding the ENE/CMC may be directed to the Court's staff at 619-446-3964. (Case Management Conference set for 12/9/2021 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford., Early Neutral Evaluation set for 12/9/2021 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford.)(no document attached) (src)
August 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #145 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Joinder in Motion to Partially Dismiss [Doc. 142] : Responses due by 9/16/2021, Replies due by 9/30/2021. A hearing on this matter is scheduled for November 19, 2021 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/27/21.(dlg)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 148 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Ketayi. Alliance for Consumers USA served. (Fox, Joanna) (dlg).
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER Granting #146 Motion for Extension of Time for Ocean Consulting Group, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint to September 3, 2021. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/25/21. (dlg)
August 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 146 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #134 Amended Complaint,, by Ocean Consulting Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Order Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Ocean Consulting Group, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint)(Ahern, Jared)Attorney Jared Michael Ahern added to party Ocean Consulting Group, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings and Joinder in Motion to Partially Dismiss [Doc. 142] by Administrative Concepts, Inc.. (Lebedev, Gennady) (dlg).
August 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule on Motions to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint [Ecf. #142 #143 ]. Responses due by 9/16/2021. Replies due by 10/7/2021. Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2D before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/19/21.(sxa) (dlg).
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Cost Containment Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Robert Hodes, #2 Order Granting Defendant Cost Containment Group, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction)(McGill, Brenna) (zda).
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 142 MOTION to Dismiss the Third Amended Complaint (Partially) by Health Insurance Innovations Holdings, Inc., Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings, LLC. (Roth, Michael) (zda).
August 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 141 NOTICE AND ORDER for Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation set for 9/27/2021 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2021 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford. Joint Discovery Plan due 9/20/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford on 8/13/21.(dlg)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ANSWER to #134 Amended Complaint,, , COUNTERCLAIM against Alliance for Consumers USA, Cost Containment Group, Inc., Health Enrollment Group, Health Insurance Innovations Holdings, Inc., Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings, LLC, Ocean Consulting Group, Inc. by Administrative Concepts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Counterclaim)(Lebedev, Gennady) (dlg).
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ANSWER to #134 Amended Complaint,, (Third) by Axis Specialty U.S. Services, Inc..(Harclerode, Kelsey) (dlg).
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ANSWER to #134 Amended Complaint,, (Third) by Axis.(Harclerode, Kelsey) (dlg).
August 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Ketayi. Ocean Consulting Group, Inc. served. (Fox, Joanna) (dlg).
August 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 136 Order Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant Cost Containment Group, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiffs Third Amended Complaint #133 . IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion is GRANTED. CCGs deadline to respond to the Third Amended Complaint is extended to and through August 18, 2021. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/5/2021. (zda)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 Summons Issued re Third Amended Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (zda)
July 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 134 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Administrative Concepts, Inc., Alliance for Consumers USA, Axis, Axis Specialty U.S. Services, Inc., Cost Containment Group Inc., Health Enrollment Group, Health Insurance Innovations Holdings, Inc., Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings, LLC, filed by Eric Ketayi. (Attachments: #1 Redline Comparison (Second Amended Class Action Complaint / Third Amended Class Action Complaint), #2 Proof of Service)New Summons Requested. (Fox, Joanna) (zda).
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 133 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Cost Containment Group Inc.. (McGill, Brenna)Attorney Brenna Jean McGill added to party Cost Containment Group Inc.(pty:dft) (zda).
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER Granting #131 Health Plain Intermediaries Holdings, LLC and Health Insurance Innovations Holdings, Inc.'s, Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint to August 18, 2021. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/21/21. (dlg)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 131 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #95 Amended Complaint, (Second) by Health Insurance Innovations Holdings, Inc., Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings, LLC. (Roth, Michael)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendant Administrative Concepts, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Counts 1,3,4,5, and 7 of the SAC; and Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings, LLC and Health Insurance Innovations Holdings, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss Counts 1,2,and 3 of the SAC (ECF Nos. #109 , #112 ). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/8/21. (dlg)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 129 Minute ORDER, re #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT - Submitted, re #112 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint (Partially)- Submitted. Motion Hearing set for 7/9/21 - VACATED. (no document attached) (ksr)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 128 REPLY to Response to Motion re #112 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint (Partially) filed by Health Insurance Innovations Holdings, Inc., Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings, LLC. (Roth, Michael) (dlg).
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 127 REPLY to Response to Motion re #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Administrative Concepts, Inc.. (Lebedev, Gennady) (dlg).
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER Granting #125 Third Joint Motion for Extension of Time for Cost Containment Group, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 6/16/21. (dlg)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 125 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #95 Amended Complaint, by Cost Containment Group Inc.. (Ahern, Jared) (dlg).
June 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 124 RESPONSE in Opposition re #112 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint (Partially) filed by Eric Ketayi. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Fox, Joanna) (dlg).
June 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 123 RESPONSE in Opposition re #109 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Eric Ketayi. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Fox, Joanna) (dlg).
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Exhibit to DECLARATION re #121 Declaration CORRECTED EXHIBIT A [ECF 121] by Plaintiff Eric Ketayi. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Fox, Joanna) qc email, and incorrect event selected (dlg).
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 121 DECLARATION re #95 Amended Complaint, by Plaintiff Eric Ketayi. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Declaration of Joanna L. Fox, #2 Proof of Service)(Fox, Joanna)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER Granting Second Joint #119 Motion for Extension of Time to for Defendant to Respond to Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/28/21. (dlg)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 119 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #95 Amended Complaint, by Cost Containment Group Inc.. (Fredricks, Timothy)Attorney Timothy Weston Fredricks added to party Cost Containment Group Inc.(pty:dft) Modified on 5/26/2021 to send QC email for proposed order (dlg). Modified on 5/28/2021 to send QC email for proposed order (dlg).
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 118 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Alliance for Consumers USA (dlg)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #109 , #112 MOTIONS to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint: Responses due by 6/11/2021, Replies due by 6/23/2021. Motion Hearing set for 7/9/2021 01:30 PM before Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/21/21.(dlg)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of David L. Balser, re #111 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/21/2021.(rmc)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ANSWER to #95 Amended Complaint, by Health Enrollment Group.(Eng, Kevin)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ANSWER to #95 Amended Complaint, by Axis Specialty U.S. Services, Inc..(Harclerode, Kelsey)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ANSWER to #95 Amended Complaint, by Axis.(Harclerode, Kelsey) (dlg).
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 112 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint (Partially) by Health Insurance Innovations Holdings, Inc., Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings, LLC. (Roth, Michael) (dlg).
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 213 receipt number ACASDC-15751991.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Balser, David) (rmc).
May 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 110 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against Alliance for Consumers USA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joanna L. Fox, #2 Proof of Service)(Fox, Joanna)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim OF THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT by Administrative Concepts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Proposed Order)(Lebedev, Gennady) qc email re proposed order (dlg).
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Granting Joint #105 Motion for Extension of Time for Cost Containment Group Inc. to Respond to Second Amended Complaint by 6/1/2021. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/18/21. (dlg)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 107 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Ketayi. Alliance for Consumers USA served. (Fox, Joanna)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 106 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Ketayi. Cost Containment Group Inc. served. (Fox, Joanna)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 105 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #95 Amended Complaint, by Cost Containment Group Inc.. (Ahern, Jared)Attorney Jared Michael Ahern added to party Cost Containment Group Inc.(pty:dft)
May 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER Granting Joint Motion #102 to Extend Time for Defendant Administrative Concepts, Inc. to Answer Second Amended Class Action Complaint to 5/21/2021. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/12/21. (dlg)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER granting #101 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Health Enrollment Group's deadline to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint is hereby extended through and including May 21, 2021. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/6/21. (dlg)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 102 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer to Second Amended Complaint by Administrative Concepts, Inc.. (Lebedev, Gennady) Modified on 5/5/2021 to send QC email for proposed order (dlg).
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 101 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond To Second Amended Complaint by Health Enrollment Group. (Eng, Kevin) (dlg).
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 100 Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendants Axis d/b/a Axis Insurance Company and Axis Specialty U.S. Services, Inc. to Answer Second Amended Class Action Complaint #98 . Deadline is 5/21/2021. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/3/21. (jmo)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 99 Order Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time for Defendants Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings, LLC and Health Insurance Innovations Holdings, Inc. to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to the Second Amended Class Action Complaint #97 . Deadline is 5/21/2021. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 5/3/21. (jmo)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 98 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #95 Amended Complaint, (Second) by Axis, Axis Specialty U.S. Services, Inc.. (Baker, Adya)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 97 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #95 Amended Complaint, (Second) by Health Insurance Innovations Holdings, Inc., Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings, LLC. (Roth, Michael) (jmo).
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 96 Summons Issued re Second Amended Complaint. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (dlg)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 95 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Administrative Concepts, Inc., Alliance for Consumers USA, Axis, Axis Specialty U.S. Services, Inc., Health Enrollment Group, Health Insurance Innovations Holdings, Inc., Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings, LLC, filed by Eric Ketayi. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)New Summons Requested. (Fox, Joanna) (dlg).
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER Granting Joint #93 Motion Withdrawing Jurisdictional Discovery to HII and HPI in Exchange for Consent to Personal Jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 3/10/21. (dlg)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Joint MOTION for Discovery Withdrawing Jurisdictional Discovery to HII and HPI in Exchange for Consent to Personal Jurisdiction by Eric Ketayi. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Fox, Joanna) (dlg).
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 92 NOTICE of Appearance by Edward Scott Zusman on behalf of Health Enrollment Group, Marc Munoz, Kevin Romero (Zusman, Edward)Attorney Edward Scott Zusman added to party Health Enrollment Group(pty:dft), Attorney Edward Scott Zusman added to party Marc Munoz(pty:dft), Attorney Edward Scott Zusman added to party Kevin Romero(pty:dft) (dlg).
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER Granting Joint #90 Motion for Extension of Time to File Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/7/21. (dlg)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 90 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Second Amended Complaint, MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #89 Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,, Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,,, by Eric Ketayi. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Fox, Joanna) (dlg).
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part Defendants' Motions to Dismiss; and Granting in Part and Denying in Part Plaintiffs' Request for Jurisdictional Discovery (ECF Nos. #63 , #64 , #65 , #66 , #69 , #76 , #80 ). Plaintiffs may file a second amended complaint within 20 days of the filed date of this order. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 2/1/21. (dlg)
January 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 88 Minute ORDER,re #69 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim -Submitted, #66 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in the First Amended Complaint - Submitted, #65 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint - Submitted, #63 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint - Submitted, #64 MOTION to Dismiss - Submitted. Motion hearing set for 1/29/21 - VACATED. (no document attached) (ksr)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 87 REPLY to Response to Motion re #69 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Health Enrollment Group, Marc Munoz, Kevin Romero. (Eng, Kevin) (dlg).
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 86 REPLY to Response to Motion re #65 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Health Insurance Innovations Holdings, Inc., Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings, LLC. (Roth, Michael) Modi (dlg).
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 85 REPLY to Response to Motion re #66 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in the First Amended Complaint, #70 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #69 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #66 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in the First Am filed by Administrative Concepts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Errata, #2 Amended Declaration of Juanita Nicolucci)(Lebedev, Gennady) (dlg).
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 84 RESPONSE in Support re #63 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Axis, Axis Specialty U.S. Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Reply in Support of its Request for Judicial Notice)(Harclerode, Kelsey) (dlg).
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 83 RESPONSE in Opposition re #64 MOTION to Dismiss to Plaintiff's Objection to the Declaration of Paul Lavin [Docket No. 80-3] filed by First Health Group, Corp.. (Clow, Gillian) (dlg).
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 82 REPLY to Response to Motion re #64 MOTION to Dismiss filed by First Health Group, Corp.. (Clow, Gillian) (dlg).
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER Resetting Hearing Date for Motions to Dismiss. #63 #64 #65 #66 #69 . This case was recently transferred from the Honorable Todd W. Robinson to the Honorable Gonzalo P. Curiel. Due to the Courts schedule, a hearing on this matter will be continued from January 27, 2021 to January 29, 2021 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 1/4/21.(mme)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 RESPONSE in Opposition re #64 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Eric Ketayi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joanna L. Fox, #2 Exhibit A to Declaration of Joanna L. Fox, #3 Objection to Lavin Declaration, #4 Proof of Service)(Fox, Joanna) (dlg).
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 RESPONSE in Opposition re #66 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in the First Amended Complaint filed by Eric Ketayi. (Attachments: #1 Objections to Declaration of Juanita Nicolucci and Accompanying Exhibits, #2 Proof of Service)(Fox, Joanna) (dlg).
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 RESPONSE in Opposition re #69 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Eric Ketayi. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Fox, Joanna) (dlg).
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 RESPONSE in Opposition re #63 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Eric Ketayi. (Attachments: #1 Objections to Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Proof of Service)(Fox, Joanna) (dlg).
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 RESPONSE in Opposition re #65 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint filed by Eric Ketayi. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Fox, Joanna) (dlg).
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 75 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Alliance for Consumers USA (dlg)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 74 Request for Entry of Clerk Default against Alliance for Consumers USA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joanna L. Fox, #2 Proof of Service)(Fox, Joanna) (dlg).
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo is no longer assigned. Case reassigned back to Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge. The new case number is 20cv1198 GPC (KSC).(no document attached) (jcj)
October 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Todd W. Robinson is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo for all further proceedings. The new case number is 20cv1198-CAB-KSC.(no document attached) (smd)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Set Briefing and Hearing Schedule on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss (ECF no. #70 ). Motion Hearing reset for 1/27/2021 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 3A before Judge Todd W. Robinson. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition(s) on or before December 9, 2020, and the Moving Defendants may file their replies, if any, on or before January 8, 2021. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 10/26/2020. (jmr)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #69 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim , #66 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in the First Amended Complaint, #65 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint, #63 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, #64 MOTION to Dismiss by Eric Ketayi. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Fox, Joanna) (jmr).
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Health Enrollment Group, Marc Munoz, Kevin Romero. (Eng, Kevin) (sxa).
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 68 Notice of Document Discrepancies and Order Thereon by Judge Todd W. Robinson Rejecting re #67 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim . Non-compliance with local rule(s), ECF 2(f): Lacking proper signature. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: The document is rejected. It is ordered that the Clerk STRIKE the document from the record, and serve a copy of this order on all parties. (sxa) (Additional attachment(s) added on 10/13/2020: #1 Striken Document) (sxa).
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Health Enrollment Group, Marc Munoz, Kevin Romero. (Eng, Kevin) Modified on 10/13/2020 to Strike per ECF #68 (sxa).
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim in the First Amended Complaint by Administrative Concepts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Greg Ryan, #2 Declaration Declaration of Juanita Nicolucci)(Lebedev, Gennady) (sxa).
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 MOTION to Dismiss the First Amended Class Action Complaint by Health Insurance Innovations Holdings, Inc., Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings, LLC. (Roth, Michael) (sxa).
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 64 MOTION to Dismiss by First Health Group, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul Lavin)(Clow, Gillian) (sxa).
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 63 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Axis, Axis Specialty U.S. Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration of D. Zenzola with Exhibits A-D, #3 Request for Judicial Notice)(Harclerode, Kelsey) (sxa).
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER Granting #61 Motion of Michael Gosling for Leave to Withdraw as Counsel. Signed by Judge Todd W. Robinson on 10/8/20. (dlg)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Eric Ketayi. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael Gosling, #2 Proof of Service)(Gosling, Michael) (sxa).
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Administrative Concepts, Inc. (Lebedev, Gennady) (sxa).
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Eric Ketayi. Alliance for Consumers USA served. (Fox, Joanna) (sxa).
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER OF TRANSFER. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Judge Todd W. Robinson for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge. The new case number is 20cv1198-TWR-KSC. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/25/20.(dlg)
September 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Granting Joint #56 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants Administrative Concepts, Inc., Axis, Axis Specialty U.S. Services, Inc., First Health Group, Corp., Health Enrollment Group, Health Insurance Innovations Holdings, Inc., Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings, LLC, Marc Munoz, Kevin Romero to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Amended Class Action Complaint to October 9, 2020. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/21/20. (dlg)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Health Insurance Innovations Holdings, Inc., Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings, LLC. (Roth, Michael) (dlg).
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion to Deny Pending Motions to Dismiss as Moot ( #35 , #38 , #39 , #46 , #47 , #49 , #54 ). Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/18/20. (dlg)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 Ex Parte MOTION to deny pending motions to dismiss as moot by Eric Ketayi, Miryam Ketayi. (Gosling, Michael) (dlg).
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Miryam Ketayi, Eric Ketayi. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) (Gosling, Michael) QC email for redlined version of Amended Complaint (dlg).
September 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #46 , #47 MOTIONS to Dismiss : Responses due by 9/18/2020, Replies due by 10/2/2020. A hearing on this matter is set for October 23, 2020 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 9/4/20.(dlg)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 51 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Administrative Concepts, Inc.. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Lebedev, Gennady)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE to Withdraw by Axis, Axis Specialty U.S. Services, Inc. re #36 MOTION to Dismiss (Harclerode, Kelsey)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 49 Amended MOTION to Dismiss by Axis, Axis Specialty U.S. Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit Table of Contents to RJN, #4 Exhibit A to RJN, #5 Exhibit B to RJN, #6 Exhibit C to RJN, #7 Exhibit D to RJN, #8 Exhibit E to RJN)(Harclerode, Kelsey)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 NOTICE of Errata by Axis, Axis Specialty U.S. Services, Inc. re #36 MOTION to Dismiss (Harclerode, Kelsey) qc email re Errata. Attorney should withdraw (dlg).
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) by Juanita Nicolucci. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Juanita Nicolucci)(Lebedev, Gennady) (dlg).
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss the Complaint Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(2) and 12(b)(6) by Administrative Concepts, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Juanita Nicolucci)(Lebedev, Gennady) (dlg).
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Frederick Gosling on behalf of Eric Ketayi, Miryam Ketayi (Gosling, Michael)Attorney Michael Frederick Gosling added to party Eric Ketayi(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Frederick Gosling added to party Miryam Ketayi(pty:pla) (dlg).
August 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting Joint #43 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants Administrative Concepts Inc., and Juanita Nicolucci to Respond to Complaint to August 31, 2020. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/25/20. (dlg)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 43 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, #2 Summons Issued by Administrative Concepts, Inc., Juanita Nicolucci. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lebedev, Gennady)Attorney Gennady L. Lebedev added to party Administrative Concepts, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Gennady L. Lebedev added to party Juanita Nicolucci(pty:dft) (dlg).
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Adya Baker, re #40 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/24/2020.(rmc)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Setting Briefing Schedule re #35 , #36 , #38 , #39 . Any response to the Motions to Dismiss shall be filed on or before September 18, 2020. Any reply shall be filed on or before October 2, 2020. A hearing on this matter is reset for October 23, 2020 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 2D. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/24/20.(dlg)
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14379586.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Baker, Adya) (rmc).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Health Enrollment Group, Marc Munoz, Kevin Romero. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities Memorandum of Points & Authorities In Support, #2 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Eng, Kevin) (dlg).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MOTION to Dismiss the Complaint by Health Insurance Innovations Holdings, Inc., Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings, LLC. (Roth, Michael) (dlg).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Health Insurance Innovations Holdings, Inc., Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings, LLC. No Corporate Parents/Interested Parties. (Roth, Michael) (dlg).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION to Dismiss by Axis, Axis Specialty U.S. Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit Table of Contents to RJN, #4 Exhibit A to RJN, #5 Exhibit B to RJN, #6 Exhibit C to RJN, #7 Exhibit D to RJN, #8 Exhibit E to RJN)(Harclerode, Kelsey) (dlg).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion ( by First Health Group, Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul Lavin)(Clow, Gillian) (dlg).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by First Health Group, Corp. . Identifying Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Corporate Parent Aetna Health Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation, Corporate Parent Aetna Inc. for First Health Group, Corp.. (Clow, Gillian) (dlg).
August 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Corporate Disclosure Statement by First Health Group, Corp. identifying Corporate Parent Aetna, Inc., Corporate Parent CVS Pharmacy, Corporate Parent Aetna Health Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent CVS Health Corporation for First Health Group, Corp... (Clow, Gillian) (dlg).
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Jeffrey Landis, re #27 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/19/2020.(rmc)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Jacob Sommer, re #28 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/19/2020.(rmc)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER granting #29 Motion for substitution of counsel. Current counsel of record, David D. Cardone and Adam J. Yarbrough of the firm of Dunn DeSantis Walt & Kendrick, LLP shall be removed from the docket, service list, and the Courts CM/ECF system for this matter. In their place, the following attorneys shall be substituted as counsel of record for Defendants: Edward S. Zusman, Kevin K. Eng. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 8/18/2020. (jpp)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION to Substitute Attorney (Unopposed) by Health Enrollment Group, Marc Munoz, Kevin Romero. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Proof of Service)(Eng, Kevin)Attorney Kevin Eng added to party Health Enrollment Group(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Eng added to party Marc Munoz(pty:dft), Attorney Kevin Eng added to party Kevin Romero(pty:dft) (jpp).
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14349443.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Sommer, Jacob) (rmc).
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14347513.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Landis, Jeffrey) (rmc).
August 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexei Klestoff on behalf of Axis, Axis Specialty U.S. Services, Inc. (Klestoff, Alexei)Attorney Alexei Klestoff added to party Axis(pty:dft), Attorney Alexei Klestoff added to party Axis Specialty U.S. Services, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Axis, Axis Specialty U.S. Services, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AXIS Capital Holdings Limited for Axis, Axis Specialty U.S. Services, Inc... (Harclerode, Kelsey) (dlg).
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by Eric Ketayi of case(s) 20-cv-00630 . (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Fox, Joanna) Modified on 8/11/2020 LNO not created, nothing related in this court (dlg).
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Kelsey Kingsbery, re #19 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/30/2020.(rmc)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Timothy H. Lee, re #20 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/29/2020.(rmc)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of David B. Carpenter, re #18 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/29/2020.(rmc)
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14237475.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Lee, Timothy) (rmc).
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14236485.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Kingsbery, Kelsey) (rmc).
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number BCASDC-14232834.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Carpenter, David) (rmc).
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Eric Ketayi, Miryam Ketayi re #1 Complaint,, Civil Case Cover Sheet, Summons (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Proof of Service, #4 Proof of Service, #5 Proof of Service, #6 Proof of Service, #7 Proof of Service, #8 Proof of Service)(Fox, Joanna) (dlg).
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Approving the Pro Hac Vice Application of Zachary A. McEntyre, re #13 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/22/2020.(dsn)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time for Health Enrollment Group, Marc Munoz and Kevin Romero to Respond tom Complaint to August 21,2020. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/22/20. (dlg)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time for Health Insurance Innovations Holdings, Inc. and Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings, LLC Respond to Complaint to August 21/20. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/22/20. (dlg)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14200098.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (McEntyre, Zachary) (dsn)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Health Enrollment Group, Marc Munoz, Kevin Romero. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Cardone, David)Attorney David D. Cardone added to party Health Enrollment Group(pty:dft), Attorney David D. Cardone added to party Marc Munoz(pty:dft), Attorney David D. Cardone added to party Kevin Romero(pty:dft)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Health Insurance Innovations Holdings, Inc., Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings, LLC. (Roth, Michael)Attorney Michael D. Roth added to party Health Insurance Innovations Holdings, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Michael D. Roth added to party Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings, LLC(pty:dft)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney M. Vasquez on behalf of Eric Ketayi, Miryam Ketayi (Vasquez, Courtney)Attorney Courtney M. Vasquez added to party Eric Ketayi(pty:pla), Attorney Courtney M. Vasquez added to party Miryam Ketayi(pty:pla)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Joint Motion for Defendant First Health Group Corp. to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint to August 31, 2020. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/17/20. (dlg)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Joint #5 Motion for Extension of Time for Axis and Axis Specialty U.S. Services, Inc. to Respond to Complaint. Signed by Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel on 7/17/20. (dlg)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kelsey Harclerode on behalf of Axis, Axis Specialty U.S. Services, Inc. (Harclerode, Kelsey)Attorney Kelsey Harclerode added to party Axis Specialty U.S. Services, Inc.(pty:dft) (dlg).
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by First Health Group, Corp.. (Clow, Gillian)Attorney Gillian H. Clow added to party First Health Group, Corp.(pty:dft) (dlg).
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,, by Axis. (Harclerode, Kelsey)Attorney Kelsey Harclerode added to party Axis(pty:dft) (dlg).
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Russell A. Gold on behalf of Eric Ketayi, Miryam Ketayi (Gold, Russell)Attorney Russell A. Gold added to party Eric Ketayi(pty:pla), Attorney Russell A. Gold added to party Miryam Ketayi(pty:pla)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Joanna Fox on behalf of Eric Ketayi, Miryam Ketayi (Fox, Joanna)Attorney Joanna Fox added to party Eric Ketayi(pty:pla), Attorney Joanna Fox added to party Miryam Ketayi(pty:pla)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (vxc) (dsn)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Administrative Concepts, Inc., Alliance for Consumers USA, Axis, Axis Specialty U.S. Services, Inc., First Health Group, Corp., Health Enrollment Group, Health Insurance Innovations Holdings, Inc., Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings, LLC, Liberty Health, Marc Munoz, Juanita Nicolucci, Kevin Romero ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14073399.), filed by Miryam Ketayi, Eric Ketayi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1198-GPC-KSC. Judge Gonzalo P. Curiel and Magistrate Judge Karen S. Crawford are assigned to the case. (Fox, David)(vxc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ketayi et al v. Health Enrollment Group et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axis Specialty U.S. Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Landis
Represented By: Jacob A. Sommer
Represented By: Kelsey Harclerode
Represented By: Adya S. Baker
Represented By: Alexei Klestoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Plan Intermediaries Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Hyun Lee
Represented By: Zachary A. McEntyre
Represented By: Michael D. Roth
Represented By: David L. Balser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Insurance Innovations Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Timothy Hyun Lee
Represented By: Zachary A. McEntyre
Represented By: Michael D. Roth
Represented By: David L. Balser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Health Group, Corp.
Represented By: Kelsey Kingsbery
Represented By: David Baird Carpenter
Represented By: Gillian H. Clow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juanita Nicolucci
Represented By: Gennady L. Lebedev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Munoz
Represented By: David D. Cardone
Represented By: Kevin Eng
Represented By: Edward Scott Zusman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Health
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Romero
Represented By: David D. Cardone
Represented By: Kevin Eng
Represented By: Edward Scott Zusman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Administrative Concepts, Inc.
Represented By: Gennady L. Lebedev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Enrollment Group
Represented By: David D. Cardone
Represented By: Kevin Eng
Represented By: Edward Scott Zusman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alliance for Consumers USA
Represented By: Timothy Alan Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axis a Bermuda corporation doing business as Axis Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey G. Landis
Represented By: Jacob A. Sommer
Represented By: Kelsey Harclerode
Represented By: Adya S. Baker
Represented By: Alexei Klestoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cost Containment Group, Inc.
Represented By: Brenna Jean McGill
Represented By: Jared Michael Ahern
Represented By: Timothy Weston Fredricks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocean Consulting Group, Inc.
Represented By: Brenna Jean McGill
Represented By: Jared Michael Ahern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miryam Ketayi
Represented By: David Adam Fox
Represented By: Courtney M. Vasquez
Represented By: Russell A. Gold
Represented By: Joanna Fox
Represented By: Michael Frederick Gosling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Ketayi
Represented By: David Adam Fox
Represented By: Courtney M. Vasquez
Represented By: Russell A. Gold
Represented By: Joanna Fox
Represented By: Michael Frederick Gosling
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?