R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company et al v. County of San Diego et al
Plaintiff: R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company and Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc.
Defendant: Helen N. Robbins-Meyer and County of San Diego
Petitioner: Mental and Public Health Organizations
Amicus Curiae: Public Health Law Center, African American Tobacco Control Leadership Council, American Lung Association, American Medical Association, American Heart Association, Americans for Nonsmokers Rights, Parents Against Vaping e-cigarettes, Truth Initiative, Campaign for Tobacco-Free Kids, American Academy of Pediatrics California, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network and California School Nurses Organization
Case Number: 3:2020cv01290
Filed: July 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: Roger T Benitez
Referring Judge: William V Gallo
2 Judge: Linda Lopez
3 Judge: Janis L Sammartino
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 24 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE by County of San Diego, Helen N. Robbins-Meyer Defendants' Supplemental Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Their Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Heinlein, Joshua)Attorney Joshua Michael Heinlein added to party Helen N. Robbins-Meyer(pty:dft) (jpp).
August 31, 2020 Filing 23 Amicus Curiae Appearance entered by African American Tobacco Control Leadership Council, American Academy of Pediatrics California, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, American Medical Association, Americans for Nonsmokers Rights, California School Nurses Organization, Campaign for Tobacco-Free Kids, Parents Against Vaping e-cigarettes, Public Health Law Center, Truth Initiative. (jpp)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #21 unopposed Motion by Amici Curiae to file brief in opposition to Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction. The Clerk of Court shall docket the amici curiae brief attached as an Exhibit to the Motion at ECF No. 21 and shall add African American Tobacco Control Leadership Council, American Academy of Pediatrics California, American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network, American Heart Association, American Lung Association, American Medical Association, Americans for Nonsmokers Rights, California School Nurses Organization, Campaign for Tobacco-Free Kids, Parents Against Vaping e-cigarettes, Public Health Law Center, and Truth Initiative to the docket as amici curiae. Any response to the amici curiae brief shall be filed on or before September 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/31/2020. (jpp)
August 27, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION for Leave to File Brief of Amici Curiae in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Mental and Public Health Organizations. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Raphael, Jordan)Attorney Jordan Raphael added to party Mental and Public Health Organizations(pty:mov) (jpp).
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER setting hearing re #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Motion hearing set for 9/24/2020 at 1:30pm. Signed by Judge Janis L. Sammartino on 8/20/2020.(jpp)
August 14, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE County of San Diego's Notice of Supplemental Authority by County of San Diego (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Heinlein, Joshua)Attorney Joshua Michael Heinlein added to party County of San Diego(pty:dft)(jpp).
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER OF RECUSAL: Judge Marilyn L. Huff recuses from this case. This case has been reassigned to Judge Janis L. Sammartino for all further proceedings. Judge Marilyn L. Huff is no longer assigned to this case. All pending hearings previously set before Judge Marilyn L. Huff have been vacated. The new case number is 20-cv-1290-JLS-WVG. SO ORDERED by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 8/4/2020. (no document attached) (smy)
August 3, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc. re #16 Reply to Response to Motion, (Geise, Steve) (sxa).
August 3, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY to Response to Motion re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or Summary Judgment filed by R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Geise, Steve) (sxa).
July 27, 2020 Filing 15 RESPONSE in Opposition re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or Summary Judgment Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by County of San Diego, Helen N. Robbins-Meyer. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice In Support of Their Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motio for Preliminary Injunction, #2 Proof of Service)(Heinlein, Joshua) (sxa).
July 17, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc. re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or Summary Judgment (Geise, Steve) (sxa).
July 17, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc., as to All Defendants. (Geise, Steve) (sxa).
July 17, 2020 Filing 12 PRO HAC APPROVED: Ryan Jeffrey Watson appearing for Plaintiffs R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc. (no document attached) (rmc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 11 PRO HAC APPROVED: Christian Vergonis appearing for Plaintiffs R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc. (no document attached) (rmc)
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 PRO HAC APPROVED: Andrew Bentz appearing for Plaintiffs R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc. (no document attached) (rmc)
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14172951.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Watson, Ryan) (rmc).
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14172899.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Vergonis, Christian) (rmc).
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 Request to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee received: $ 206 receipt number ACASDC-14172815.) (Application to be reviewed by Clerk.) (Bentz, Andrew) (rmc).
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction or Summary Judgment by R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Memo of Points and Authorities, #2 Statutory Addendum, #3 Declaration of C. Canary-Garner, #4 Declaration of L. Huckabee)(Geise, Steve) (sxa).
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF TRANSFER PURSUANT TO LOW NUMBER RULE. Case reassigned to Judge Marilyn L. Huff and Magistrate Judge William V. Gallo for all further proceedings. Judge Roger T. Benitez, Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez no longer assigned to case. Create association to 3:20-cv-01124-H-WVG. The new case number is 20cv1290-H-WVG. Signed by Judge Roger T. Benitez on 7/15/2020. Signed by Judge Marilyn L. Huff on 7/14/2020.(mme)
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE(S) by R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc. of case(s) 3:20cv01124 . (Geise, Steve) (mme).
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Party With Financial Interest by R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc. . Identifying Corporate Parent R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Reynolds American Inc., Corporate Parent British American Tobacco, p.l.c. for R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company; Corporate Parent Reynolds American Inc., Corporate Parent British American Tobacco, p.l.c. for R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc. (Geise, Steve) (mme) (dsn)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (vxc) (dsn)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against County of San Diego, Helen N. Robbins-Meyer ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-1413415.), filed by R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company, R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company, Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1290-BEN-LL. Judge Roger T. Benitez and Magistrate Judge Linda Lopez are assigned to the case. (Geise, Steve)(vxc) (dsn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company et al v. County of San Diego et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helen N. Robbins-Meyer
Represented By: Joshua Michael Heinlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of San Diego
Represented By: Joshua Michael Heinlein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company
Represented By: Steve N. Geise
Represented By: Ryan Jeffrey Watson
Represented By: Andrew Bentz
Represented By: Christian Vergonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.J. Reynolds Vapor Company
Represented By: Steve N. Geise
Represented By: Ryan Jeffrey Watson
Represented By: Andrew Bentz
Represented By: Christian Vergonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santa Fe Natural Tobacco Company, Inc.
Represented By: Steve N. Geise
Represented By: Ryan Jeffrey Watson
Represented By: Andrew Bentz
Represented By: Christian Vergonis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Public Health Law Center
Represented By: Jordan Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: African American Tobacco Control Leadership Council
Represented By: Jordan Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Lung Association
Represented By: Jordan Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Medical Association
Represented By: Jordan Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Heart Association
Represented By: Jordan Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Americans for Nonsmokers Rights
Represented By: Jordan Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Parents Against Vaping e-cigarettes
Represented By: Jordan Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Truth Initiative
Represented By: Jordan Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Campaign for Tobacco-Free Kids
Represented By: Jordan Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Academy of Pediatrics California
Represented By: Jordan Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: American Cancer Society Cancer Action Network
Represented By: Jordan Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: California School Nurses Organization
Represented By: Jordan Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mental and Public Health Organizations
Represented By: Jordan Raphael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?