Sladeck v. Ford Motor Company et al
Plaintiff: Timothy Sladeck
Defendant: Ford Motor Company and Does 1 through 20
Case Number: 3:2020cv01364
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of California
Presiding Judge: William Q Hayes
Referring Judge: Bernard G Skomal
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2020 Filing 8 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by Timothy Sladeck (Barry, David) (ag).
August 20, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 9/14/2020 is CONTINUED to 9/28/2020 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Counsel for the parties will receive an invitation to the video conference no later than 9/24/2020. No other requirements or deadlines set in the Court's Order setting the ENE/CMC (ECF 6) are changed. (no document attached) (rxa)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE AND ORDER: (1) For Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, (2) Settling Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. Video Conference Early Neutral Evaluation set for 9/14/2020 at 01:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Case Management Conference set for 9/14/2020 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Joint Discovery Plan due 8/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 7/22/20.(jmo)
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties by Ford Motor Company (Proudfoot, Matthew) (ag).
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION re #1 Notice of Removal, by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Proudfoot, Matthew) (ag).
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew Millard Proudfoot on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Proudfoot, Matthew) (ag).
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by Ford Motor Company. (vxc) (dsn)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with Jury Demand from Superior Court of the State of California, County of San Diego, case number 37-2020-00020075-CU-BC-NC. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ACASDC-14178511.), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit)The new case number is 3:20-cv-1364-WQH-BGS. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case.(vxc) (dsn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sladeck v. Ford Motor Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Matthew Millard Proudfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy Sladeck
Represented By: David Neal Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?